Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2792604


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
18.10.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  20.11.2019 [2019/47]
23.08.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  25.09.2019  [2019/39]
28.06.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  31.07.2019  [2019/31]
12.10.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  14.11.2018  [2018/46]
21.09.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  24.10.2018  [2018/43]
01.12.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  03.01.2018  [2018/01]
11.08.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  13.09.2017  [2017/37]
03.03.2017 No opposition filed within time limit published on  05.04.2017  [2017/14]
24.02.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  29.03.2017  [2017/13]
10.02.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  15.03.2017  [2017/11]
03.02.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  08.03.2017  [2017/10]
27.01.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  01.03.2017  [2017/09]
13.01.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  15.02.2017  [2017/07]
25.11.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  28.12.2016  [2016/52]
18.11.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  21.12.2016  [2016/51]
11.11.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  14.12.2016  [2016/50]
04.11.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  07.12.2016  [2016/49]
14.10.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  16.11.2016  [2016/46]
30.09.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  02.11.2016  [2016/44]
25.03.2016 (Expected) grant published on  27.04.2016  [2016/17]
14.03.2016 New entry: Renewal fee paid
11.03.2016 New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
09.03.2016 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
09.03.2016 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
10.12.2015 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
04.12.2015 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
26.11.2015 Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit
26.11.2015 New entry: Reply to examination report
26.10.2015 New entry: Reply to examination report
15.07.2015 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
03.07.2015 First examination report
24.04.2015 Change - designated states published on  27.05.2015  [2015/22]
24.04.2015 Change - request for examination published on  27.05.2015  [2015/22]
22.04.2015 Amendment by applicant
21.10.2014 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  22.10.2014  [2014/43]
19.09.2014 Request for examination filed published on  22.10.2014  [2014/43]