Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2792605

EP2792605 - Table for container treatment machines [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  28.04.2017
Database last updated on 16.10.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  19.01.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip28.04.2017Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 31.05.2017  [2017/22]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Krones AG
Böhmerwaldstrasse 5
93073 Neutraubling / DE
[2014/43]
Inventor(s)01 / Hafner, Dieter
Böhmerwaldstrasse 5
93073 Neutraubling / DE
02 / Eichhammer, Tobias
Böhmerwaldstrasse 5
93073 Neutraubling / DE
03 / Högl, Bernhard
Böhmerwaldstrasse 5
93073 Neutraubling / DE
04 / Bergers, Andreas
Böhmerwaldstrasse 5
93073 Neutraubling / DE
 [2014/43]
Representative(s)Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB
Leopoldstraße 4
80802 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2014/43]Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser
Leopoldstrasse 4
80802 München / DE
Application number, filing date14161652.426.03.2014
[2014/43]
Priority number, dateDE20131020666715.04.2013         Original published format: DE102013206667
[2014/43]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2792605
Date:22.10.2014
Language:DE
[2014/43]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP04.08.2014
ClassificationInternational:B65C9/00, B65B65/06, B65G47/84
[2014/43]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/22]
Former [2014/43]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:Tischplatten für Behälterbehandlungsmaschinen[2014/43]
English:Table for container treatment machines[2014/43]
French:Table pour machines de traitement de récipients[2014/43]
Examination procedure17.04.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
17.04.2015Examination requested  [2015/22]
03.07.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
11.11.2015Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.01.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
20.05.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.06.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
21.12.2016Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2017/22]
20.01.2017Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2017/22]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  03.07.2015
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.03.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
Documents cited:Search[XY]DE102005041531  (KRONES AG [DE]) [X] 1,2,4,7-9 * paragraphs [0023] - [0025] - [0 27]; figures 1-3 * [Y] 5,6,16-18;
 [Y]DE202007017932U  (KRONES AG [DE]) [Y] 5,6 * paragraphs [0028] , [0 31] , [0 33] , [0 37]; figures 1, 2, 7 *;
 [XY]DE202010011097U  (SIDEL SPA CON SOCIO UNICO [IT]) [X] 15 * paragraphs [0026] , [0 29] , [0 31] , [0 38] , [0 39]; figures 1, 3 * [Y] 16-18;
 [XI]DE20103071U  (KRONES AG [DE]) [X] 10,11,14 * page 3, paragraph 2 * * page 4, paragraph 8 - page 5, paragraph 1 * [I] 12,13;
 [X]EP0539735  (ELPATRONIC AG [CH]) [X] 1-3 * column 2, line 51 - column 3, line 16; figures 1, 2 *;
 [XA]WO2012117426  (KOSME S R L UNIPERSONALE [IT]; CATTABRIGA DENIS [IT]) [X] 7-9 * page 5, line 1 - page 6, line 2; figures 1, 12, 13 * [A] 3;
 [A]EP2199220  (KRONES AG [DE]) [A] 5,6 * paragraph [0031]; figure 2 *;
 [A]WO2010013263  (SIDEL SPA [IT]; CAVAZZINI GAINOTTI EMILIO [IT]; MALFATTO ANNALISA [IT]) [A] 5,6 * page 2, line 25 - page 3, line 6 * * page 4, line 15 - line 23 * * figures 1, 2 *
by applicantWO2011027372
 WO2011045819