Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2787157

EP2787157 - Automatic door operating device for vehicle [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  08.03.2019
Database last updated on 16.10.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  30.03.2018
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  20.11.2017
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  30.10.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  01.08.2017
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  05.12.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip11.10.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MC
published on 13.11.2019 [2019/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
AISIN SEIKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA
1, Asahi-machi, 2-chome
Kariya-shi, Aichi 448-8650 / JP
[2014/41]
Inventor(s)01 / Seki, Tomokazu
c/o AISIN SEIKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA, Intellectual
Property Department
1, Asahi-machi 2-chome
Kariya-shi, Aichi 448-8650 / JP
02 / Fukui, Norio
c/o AISIN SEIKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA, Intellectual
Property Department
1, Asahi-machi 2-chome
Kariya-shi, Aichi 448-8650 / JP
 [2014/41]
Representative(s)TBK
Bavariaring 4-6
80336 München / DE
[2014/41]
Application number, filing date14161919.727.03.2014
[2014/41]
Priority number, dateJP2013007907205.04.2013         Original published format: JP 2013079072
[2014/41]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2787157
Date:08.10.2014
Language:EN
[2014/41]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2787157
Date:02.05.2018
Language:EN
[2018/18]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP25.04.2014
ClassificationInternational:E05F15/40, E05F15/73
[2017/26]
Former International [2014/41]E05F15/00, E05F15/20
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/20]
Former [2014/41]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:automatische Türbetätigungsvorrichtung für Kraftfahrzeuge[2017/26]
English:Automatic door operating device for vehicle[2014/41]
French:Dispositif de commande automatique pour porte de véhicule.[2017/26]
Former [2014/41]Automatische Türbetätigungsvorrichtung für Kraftfahrzeuge
Former [2014/41]Dispositif de commande automatique pour porte de véhicule
Examination procedure01.04.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
01.04.2015Examination requested  [2015/20]
26.07.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
02.12.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
02.08.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
24.10.2017Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
21.11.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
19.03.2018Fee for grant paid
19.03.2018Fee for publishing/printing paid
19.03.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  26.07.2016
Opposition(s)05.02.2019No opposition filed within time limit [2019/15]
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.03.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
10.03.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
13.03.2018Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT02.05.2018
CZ02.05.2018
DK02.05.2018
EE02.05.2018
ES02.05.2018
FI02.05.2018
HR02.05.2018
IT02.05.2018
LT02.05.2018
LV02.05.2018
MC02.05.2018
NL02.05.2018
PL02.05.2018
RO02.05.2018
RS02.05.2018
SE02.05.2018
SI02.05.2018
SK02.05.2018
SM02.05.2018
BG02.08.2018
NO02.08.2018
GR03.08.2018
[2019/46]
Former [2019/26]AT02.05.2018
CZ02.05.2018
DK02.05.2018
EE02.05.2018
ES02.05.2018
FI02.05.2018
HR02.05.2018
IT02.05.2018
LT02.05.2018
LV02.05.2018
NL02.05.2018
PL02.05.2018
RO02.05.2018
RS02.05.2018
SE02.05.2018
SI02.05.2018
SK02.05.2018
SM02.05.2018
BG02.08.2018
NO02.08.2018
GR03.08.2018
Former [2019/11]AT02.05.2018
CZ02.05.2018
DK02.05.2018
EE02.05.2018
ES02.05.2018
FI02.05.2018
HR02.05.2018
IT02.05.2018
LT02.05.2018
LV02.05.2018
NL02.05.2018
PL02.05.2018
RO02.05.2018
RS02.05.2018
SE02.05.2018
SK02.05.2018
SM02.05.2018
BG02.08.2018
NO02.08.2018
GR03.08.2018
Former [2019/10]AT02.05.2018
CZ02.05.2018
DK02.05.2018
EE02.05.2018
ES02.05.2018
FI02.05.2018
HR02.05.2018
LT02.05.2018
LV02.05.2018
NL02.05.2018
PL02.05.2018
RO02.05.2018
RS02.05.2018
SE02.05.2018
SK02.05.2018
BG02.08.2018
NO02.08.2018
GR03.08.2018
Former [2019/09]DK02.05.2018
EE02.05.2018
ES02.05.2018
FI02.05.2018
HR02.05.2018
LT02.05.2018
LV02.05.2018
NL02.05.2018
RS02.05.2018
SE02.05.2018
BG02.08.2018
NO02.08.2018
GR03.08.2018
Former [2019/08]DK02.05.2018
ES02.05.2018
FI02.05.2018
HR02.05.2018
LT02.05.2018
LV02.05.2018
NL02.05.2018
RS02.05.2018
SE02.05.2018
BG02.08.2018
NO02.08.2018
GR03.08.2018
Former [2018/52]ES02.05.2018
FI02.05.2018
HR02.05.2018
LT02.05.2018
LV02.05.2018
NL02.05.2018
RS02.05.2018
SE02.05.2018
BG02.08.2018
NO02.08.2018
GR03.08.2018
Former [2018/51]ES02.05.2018
FI02.05.2018
HR02.05.2018
LT02.05.2018
LV02.05.2018
RS02.05.2018
SE02.05.2018
BG02.08.2018
NO02.08.2018
Former [2018/50]ES02.05.2018
FI02.05.2018
HR02.05.2018
LT02.05.2018
SE02.05.2018
BG02.08.2018
NO02.08.2018
Former [2018/49]ES02.05.2018
FI02.05.2018
LT02.05.2018
SE02.05.2018
BG02.08.2018
NO02.08.2018
Former [2018/47]ES02.05.2018
FI02.05.2018
LT02.05.2018
NO02.08.2018
Documents cited:Search[XI]DE102006019581  (BAYERISCHE MOTOREN WERKE AG [DE]) [X] 1-4 * paragraph [0011] * [I] 7;
 [XAI]DE102007062473  (UNIV MUENCHEN TECH [DE]) [X] 1,5 * paragraphs [0017] , [0027]; figure - * [A] 6 [I] 7;
 [XAI]FR2939167  (PEUGEOT CITROEN AUTOMOBILES SA [FR]) [X] 1,3-5 * page 4, line l - page 5, line 4; figure - * [A] 6 [I] 7
by applicantJP2010013824
 JP2006274677