Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2784896

EP2784896 - System for managing electricity production and consumption [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  07.12.2018
Database last updated on 07.12.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  29.12.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  10.08.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip22.02.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): SI
published on 27.03.2019  [2019/13]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Comwatt
CAP OMEGA - CS39521
Rond point Benjamin Franklin
34960 Montpellier / FR
[2014/40]
Inventor(s)01 / Lamotte, Grégory, Gustave
34
5, Impasse Roucher
34170 Castelnau le Lez / FR
 [2014/40]
Representative(s)Rhein, Alain
Cabinet BREV&SUD
55 Avenue Clément Ader
34170 Castelnau le Lez / FR
[2014/40]
Application number, filing date14162064.127.03.2014
[2014/40]
Priority number, dateFR2013005280828.03.2013         Original published format: FR 1352808
FR2013005681911.07.2013         Original published format: FR 1356819
[2014/40]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2784896
Date:01.10.2014
Language:FR
[2014/40]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2784896
Date:31.01.2018
Language:FR
[2018/05]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP21.07.2014
ClassificationInternational:H02J3/14, H02J7/00, // H02J3/38, H02J3/00
[2014/40]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/19]
Former [2014/40]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:System zur Steuerung der Stromerzeugung und des Stromverbrauchs[2014/40]
English:System for managing electricity production and consumption[2014/40]
French:Système de gestion de la production et de la consommation d'électricité[2014/40]
Examination procedure30.03.2015Examination requested  [2015/19]
17.07.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
04.12.2015Invitation to indicate the basis for amendments (Time limit: M01)
15.01.2016Reply to an invitation to indicate the basis for amendments
29.01.2016Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
10.03.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
14.09.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
03.07.2017Date of oral proceedings
07.08.2017Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
11.08.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
12.12.2017Fee for grant paid
12.12.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
12.12.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  10.03.2016
Opposition(s)02.11.2018No opposition filed within time limit [2019/02]
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report
13.02.2016Request for further processing filed
13.02.2016Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
02.03.2016Decision despatched
The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report
17.07.2015Request for further processing filed
17.07.2015Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
10.08.2015Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
24.03.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
27.03.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL31.01.2018
AT31.01.2018
CZ31.01.2018
DK31.01.2018
EE31.01.2018
ES31.01.2018
FI31.01.2018
HR31.01.2018
IT31.01.2018
LT31.01.2018
LV31.01.2018
MC31.01.2018
MT31.01.2018
NL31.01.2018
PL31.01.2018
RO31.01.2018
RS31.01.2018
SE31.01.2018
SI31.01.2018
SK31.01.2018
SM31.01.2018
IE27.03.2018
LU27.03.2018
BG30.04.2018
NO30.04.2018
GR01.05.2018
IS31.05.2018
[2019/13]
Former [2019/09]AL31.01.2018
AT31.01.2018
CZ31.01.2018
DK31.01.2018
EE31.01.2018
ES31.01.2018
FI31.01.2018
HR31.01.2018
IT31.01.2018
LT31.01.2018
LV31.01.2018
MC31.01.2018
MT31.01.2018
NL31.01.2018
PL31.01.2018
RO31.01.2018
RS31.01.2018
SE31.01.2018
SK31.01.2018
SM31.01.2018
IE27.03.2018
LU27.03.2018
BG30.04.2018
NO30.04.2018
GR01.05.2018
IS31.05.2018
Former [2019/04]AL31.01.2018
AT31.01.2018
CZ31.01.2018
DK31.01.2018
EE31.01.2018
ES31.01.2018
FI31.01.2018
HR31.01.2018
IT31.01.2018
LT31.01.2018
LV31.01.2018
MC31.01.2018
MT31.01.2018
NL31.01.2018
PL31.01.2018
RO31.01.2018
RS31.01.2018
SE31.01.2018
SK31.01.2018
SM31.01.2018
LU27.03.2018
BG30.04.2018
NO30.04.2018
GR01.05.2018
IS31.05.2018
Former [2018/52]AL31.01.2018
AT31.01.2018
CZ31.01.2018
DK31.01.2018
EE31.01.2018
ES31.01.2018
FI31.01.2018
HR31.01.2018
IT31.01.2018
LT31.01.2018
LV31.01.2018
MC31.01.2018
MT31.01.2018
NL31.01.2018
PL31.01.2018
RO31.01.2018
RS31.01.2018
SE31.01.2018
SK31.01.2018
SM31.01.2018
BG30.04.2018
NO30.04.2018
GR01.05.2018
IS31.05.2018
Former [2018/51]AL31.01.2018
AT31.01.2018
CZ31.01.2018
DK31.01.2018
EE31.01.2018
ES31.01.2018
FI31.01.2018
HR31.01.2018
IT31.01.2018
LT31.01.2018
LV31.01.2018
MT31.01.2018
NL31.01.2018
PL31.01.2018
RO31.01.2018
RS31.01.2018
SE31.01.2018
SK31.01.2018
BG30.04.2018
NO30.04.2018
GR01.05.2018
IS31.05.2018
Former [2018/50]AL31.01.2018
AT31.01.2018
CZ31.01.2018
EE31.01.2018
ES31.01.2018
FI31.01.2018
HR31.01.2018
IT31.01.2018
LT31.01.2018
LV31.01.2018
MT31.01.2018
NL31.01.2018
PL31.01.2018
RO31.01.2018
RS31.01.2018
SE31.01.2018
SK31.01.2018
BG30.04.2018
NO30.04.2018
GR01.05.2018
IS31.05.2018
Former [2018/47]AL31.01.2018
AT31.01.2018
ES31.01.2018
FI31.01.2018
HR31.01.2018
IT31.01.2018
LT31.01.2018
LV31.01.2018
MT31.01.2018
NL31.01.2018
PL31.01.2018
RS31.01.2018
SE31.01.2018
BG30.04.2018
NO30.04.2018
GR01.05.2018
IS31.05.2018
Former [2018/46]AL31.01.2018
AT31.01.2018
ES31.01.2018
FI31.01.2018
HR31.01.2018
LT31.01.2018
LV31.01.2018
MT31.01.2018
NL31.01.2018
PL31.01.2018
RS31.01.2018
SE31.01.2018
BG30.04.2018
NO30.04.2018
GR01.05.2018
IS31.05.2018
Former [2018/43]AT31.01.2018
ES31.01.2018
FI31.01.2018
HR31.01.2018
LT31.01.2018
LV31.01.2018
MT31.01.2018
NL31.01.2018
PL31.01.2018
RS31.01.2018
SE31.01.2018
BG30.04.2018
NO30.04.2018
GR01.05.2018
IS31.05.2018
Former [2018/40]AT31.01.2018
ES31.01.2018
FI31.01.2018
HR31.01.2018
LT31.01.2018
LV31.01.2018
NL31.01.2018
PL31.01.2018
RS31.01.2018
SE31.01.2018
BG30.04.2018
NO30.04.2018
GR01.05.2018
IS31.05.2018
Former [2018/39]AT31.01.2018
ES31.01.2018
FI31.01.2018
HR31.01.2018
LT31.01.2018
LV31.01.2018
NL31.01.2018
PL31.01.2018
RS31.01.2018
SE31.01.2018
NO30.04.2018
GR01.05.2018
IS31.05.2018
Former [2018/37]ES31.01.2018
FI31.01.2018
HR31.01.2018
LT31.01.2018
NL31.01.2018
PL31.01.2018
NO30.04.2018
GR01.05.2018
Former [2018/36]ES31.01.2018
FI31.01.2018
HR31.01.2018
LT31.01.2018
NL31.01.2018
PL31.01.2018
NO30.04.2018
Former [2018/35]FI31.01.2018
HR31.01.2018
LT31.01.2018
NL31.01.2018
NO30.04.2018
Documents cited:Search[Y]DE102011051074  (RWE EFFIZIENZ GMBH [DE]) [Y] 1-4 * the whole document *;
 [Y]DE102011082840  (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [Y] 1-4 * paragraph [0004] *;
 [Y]JP2005124341  (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [Y] 2 * claim 1 *;
 [Y]US2012101652  (SHIN JONG HYUN [KR] ET AL) [Y] 3,4 * paragraph [0090] - paragraph [0095]; claim 2 *
by applicantEP2535685
 US2011060474
 EP0727668
 DE102011051074
 WO2008006192
 EP2219278