Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2783640

EP2783640 - Fastener cartridge assemblies [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  05.04.2019
Database last updated on 16.10.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  27.04.2018
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  12.12.2017
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  23.06.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip11.10.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MC
published on 13.11.2019 [2019/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Ethicon LLC
475 Street C, Suite 401
Los Frailes Industrial Park
00969 Guaynabo / PR
[2018/11]
Former [2014/40]For all designated states
Ethicon Endo-Surgery, Inc.
4545 Creek Road
Cincinnati, OH 45242 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Weaner, Lauren S.
7985 Quebec Court
Cincinnati, OH Ohio 45241 / US
02 / Aronhalt, Taylor W.
306 Beech Road
Loveland, OH Ohio 45140 / US
03 / Vendely, Michael J.
1505 Shaker Run Boulevard
Lebanon, OH Ohio 45036 / US
04 / Schellin, Emily A.
11919 Snider Road
Cincinnati, OH Ohio 45249 / US
05 / Shelton, IV, Frederick E.
245 East Main Street
Hillsboro, OH Ohio 45133 / US
 [2014/40]
Representative(s)Carpmaels & Ransford LLP
One Southampton Row
London WC1B 5HA / GB
[2014/40]
Application number, filing date14162082.327.03.2014
[2014/40]
Priority number, dateUS20131385169327.03.2013         Original published format: US201313851693
[2014/40]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2783640
Date:01.10.2014
Language:EN
[2014/40]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP2783640
Date:10.12.2014
Language:EN
[2014/50]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2783640
Date:30.05.2018
Language:EN
[2018/22]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP10.11.2014
ClassificationInternational:A61B17/072
[2014/40]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/30]
Former [2014/40]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:Befestigungskartuschenanordnungen[2014/40]
English:Fastener cartridge assemblies[2014/40]
French:Ensembles cartouche de fixation[2014/40]
Examination procedure10.06.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
10.06.2015Examination requested  [2015/30]
27.06.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
27.10.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
13.12.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
13.04.2018Fee for grant paid
13.04.2018Fee for publishing/printing paid
13.04.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  27.06.2017
Opposition(s)01.03.2019No opposition filed within time limit [2019/19]
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.03.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
10.03.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
13.03.2018Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT30.05.2018
CY30.05.2018
CZ30.05.2018
DK30.05.2018
EE30.05.2018
ES30.05.2018
FI30.05.2018
HR30.05.2018
LT30.05.2018
LV30.05.2018
MC30.05.2018
NL30.05.2018
PL30.05.2018
RO30.05.2018
RS30.05.2018
SE30.05.2018
SI30.05.2018
SK30.05.2018
SM30.05.2018
BG30.08.2018
NO30.08.2018
GR31.08.2018
[2019/46]
Former [2019/26]AT30.05.2018
CY30.05.2018
CZ30.05.2018
DK30.05.2018
EE30.05.2018
ES30.05.2018
FI30.05.2018
HR30.05.2018
LT30.05.2018
LV30.05.2018
NL30.05.2018
PL30.05.2018
RO30.05.2018
RS30.05.2018
SE30.05.2018
SI30.05.2018
SK30.05.2018
SM30.05.2018
BG30.08.2018
NO30.08.2018
GR31.08.2018
Former [2019/11]AT30.05.2018
CY30.05.2018
CZ30.05.2018
DK30.05.2018
EE30.05.2018
ES30.05.2018
FI30.05.2018
HR30.05.2018
LT30.05.2018
LV30.05.2018
NL30.05.2018
PL30.05.2018
RO30.05.2018
RS30.05.2018
SE30.05.2018
SK30.05.2018
SM30.05.2018
BG30.08.2018
NO30.08.2018
GR31.08.2018
Former [2019/10]AT30.05.2018
CY30.05.2018
CZ30.05.2018
DK30.05.2018
EE30.05.2018
ES30.05.2018
FI30.05.2018
HR30.05.2018
LT30.05.2018
LV30.05.2018
NL30.05.2018
PL30.05.2018
RO30.05.2018
RS30.05.2018
SE30.05.2018
SK30.05.2018
BG30.08.2018
NO30.08.2018
GR31.08.2018
Former [2019/09]CY30.05.2018
DK30.05.2018
EE30.05.2018
ES30.05.2018
FI30.05.2018
HR30.05.2018
LT30.05.2018
LV30.05.2018
NL30.05.2018
RS30.05.2018
SE30.05.2018
BG30.08.2018
NO30.08.2018
GR31.08.2018
Former [2019/08]CY30.05.2018
DK30.05.2018
ES30.05.2018
FI30.05.2018
HR30.05.2018
LT30.05.2018
LV30.05.2018
NL30.05.2018
RS30.05.2018
SE30.05.2018
BG30.08.2018
NO30.08.2018
GR31.08.2018
Former [2019/03]CY30.05.2018
ES30.05.2018
FI30.05.2018
HR30.05.2018
LT30.05.2018
LV30.05.2018
NL30.05.2018
RS30.05.2018
SE30.05.2018
BG30.08.2018
NO30.08.2018
GR31.08.2018
Former [2018/52]CY30.05.2018
ES30.05.2018
FI30.05.2018
HR30.05.2018
LT30.05.2018
LV30.05.2018
RS30.05.2018
SE30.05.2018
BG30.08.2018
NO30.08.2018
GR31.08.2018
Former [2018/51]CY30.05.2018
ES30.05.2018
FI30.05.2018
HR30.05.2018
LT30.05.2018
LV30.05.2018
RS30.05.2018
SE30.05.2018
BG30.08.2018
NO30.08.2018
Former [2018/50]CY30.05.2018
ES30.05.2018
FI30.05.2018
HR30.05.2018
LT30.05.2018
SE30.05.2018
BG30.08.2018
NO30.08.2018
Former [2018/49]CY30.05.2018
ES30.05.2018
FI30.05.2018
LT30.05.2018
SE30.05.2018
BG30.08.2018
NO30.08.2018
Former [2018/47]ES30.05.2018
FI30.05.2018
LT30.05.2018
NO30.08.2018
Documents cited:Search[XDA]US2012080493  (SHELTON IV FREDERICK E [US], et al) [XD] 1,2,4,5,11-18 * figures 245,246,251 * * paragraphs [0573] - [0576] - [0579] * [A] 3,6-10;
 [XPL]US2013256375  (SHELTON IV FREDERICK E [US], et al) [XP] 1,3,6-11,15,16 * figures 283-285 * * paragraph [0903] * [L] 1-20
by applicantUS7780685
 US7083075
 US7380696
 US5468253
 US6325810
 US5285945
 US2012074198
 US2011226837
 US2008169329
 US7980443
 US20060541123
 US20030441632