Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2784377 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2784377



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 150
03.09.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
03.09.2018 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 3
03.09.2018 Claims Search / examination 3
03.09.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
03.09.2018 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 6
07.05.2018 Annex to the communication Search / examination 5
07.05.2018 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
30.04.2018 Examination started Search / examination 1
15.02.2018 Notification regarding date of start of examination with possibility to withdraw Search / examination 1
12.04.2017 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 2
06.04.2017 Request for change of address - applicant Search / examination 1
04.04.2015 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 4
04.04.2015 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 6
04.04.2015 Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 1
04.04.2015 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 4
24.03.2015 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 4
24.03.2015 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 6
24.03.2015 Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 1
24.03.2015 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 4
24.03.2015 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
24.03.2015 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
07.10.2014 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
03.09.2014 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 2
01.07.2014 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
01.07.2014 European search opinion Search / examination 5
01.07.2014 European search report Search / examination 2
30.06.2014 Confirmation of receipt of (electronically) transmitted priority document Search / examination 1
13.06.2014 Search started Search / examination 1
29.05.2014 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 33
28.03.2014 Abstract Search / examination 1
28.03.2014 Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 2
28.03.2014 Claims Search / examination 5
28.03.2014 Description Search / examination 21
28.03.2014 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
28.03.2014 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
28.03.2014 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
28.03.2014 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
28.03.2014 Drawings Search / examination 8
28.03.2014 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 4