Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2784377


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
26.03.2019 New entry: Renewal fee paid
04.09.2018 New entry: Reply to examination report
16.05.2018 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
04.05.2018 First examination report
27.03.2018 New entry: Renewal fee paid
14.04.2017 Change - applicant published on  17.05.2017  [2017/20]
25.03.2017 New entry: Renewal fee paid
22.03.2016 New entry: Renewal fee paid
05.04.2015 Change - designated states published on  06.05.2015  [2015/19]
05.04.2015 Change - request for examination published on  06.05.2015  [2015/19]
25.03.2015 Amendment by applicant
01.10.2014 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  01.10.2014  [2014/40]
29.08.2014 Request for examination filed published on  01.10.2014  [2014/40]