Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP2784377 Family dossiers alerts: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):  

CN201410123967 EP14162193



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated





TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
US9995461Global Dossier 12.06.2018B2
US2014293582 02.10.2014A1
Priority number Date
KR20130033374 28.03.2013
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
KR101524914BGlobal Dossier 01.06.2015B1
KR20140118092 08.10.2014A
Priority number Date
KR20130033374 28.03.2013
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
JP6286248BGlobal Dossier 28.02.2018B2
JP2014194545 09.10.2014A
Priority number Date
KR20130033374 28.03.2013
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
CN104075241Global Dossier 01.10.2014A
Priority number Date
KR20130033374 28.03.2013
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
EP2784377Global Dossier 01.10.2014A1
Priority number Date
KR20130033374 28.03.2013