Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2784377

EP2784377 - Optical lens, light emitting device, and lighting device [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  04.05.2018
Database last updated on 16.11.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip26.03.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
LG Innotek Co., Ltd.
98, Huam-ro, Jung-gu
Seoul, 04637 / KR
[2017/20]
Former [2014/40]For all designated states
LG Innotek Co., Ltd.
20th Floor, Seoul Square
416 Hangang-daero
Jung-gu
Seoul 100-714 / KR
Inventor(s)01 / Lee, Chang Hyuck
c/o LG INNOTEK CO., LTD., 20th Fl., Seoul Square
416
Hangang-daero
Jung-gu
100-714 Seoul / KR
02 / Choi, Hyun Ho
c/o LG INNOTEK CO., LTD., 20th Fl., Seoul Square
416
Hangang-daero
Jung-gu
100-714 Seoul / KR
03 / Kang, Leeim
c/o LG INNOTEK CO., LTD., 20th Fl., Seoul Square
416
Hangang-daero
Jung-gu
100-714 Seoul / KR
04 / Son, Chang Gyun
c/o LG INNOTEK CO., LTD., 20th Fl., Seoul Square
416
Hangang-daero
Jung-gu
100-714 Seoul / KR
 [2014/40]
Representative(s)Zardi, Marco
M. Zardi & Co. SA
Via Pioda 6
6900 Lugano / CH
[2014/40]
Application number, filing date14162193.828.03.2014
[2014/40]
Priority number, dateKR2013003337428.03.2013         Original published format: KR 20130033374
[2014/40]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2784377
Date:01.10.2014
Language:EN
[2014/40]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP01.07.2014
ClassificationInternational:F21V5/04, F21V7/00, F21V13/04, G02F1/1335, H01L33/58, G02B19/00
[2014/40]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/19]
Former [2014/40]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:Optische Linse, lichtemittierende Vorrichtung und Beleuchtungsvorrichtung[2014/40]
English:Optical lens, light emitting device, and lighting device[2014/40]
French:Lentille optique, dispositif electroluminescent et dispositif d'eclairage[2014/40]
Examination procedure24.03.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
24.03.2015Examination requested  [2015/19]
07.05.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
03.09.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  07.05.2018
Fees paidRenewal fee
17.03.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
22.03.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
23.03.2018Renewal fee patent year 05
22.03.2019Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[XI]US2008151551  (YANG CHENG-LIN [TW], et al) [X] 1-3,7-11,13 * figures 2-4,7 * [I] 14,15;
 [Y]WO2008007492  (KOHA CO LTD [JP], et al) [Y] 1-15 * paragraph [0037] - paragraph [0040]; figures 12b,12c * * figures 1,2,3 *;
 [Y]JP2010152282  (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP) [Y] 1-15 * paragraph [0038] - paragraph [0041]; figure 6 *