Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2792615

EP2792615 - Pouch with metering handle for dispensing flowable products [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  09.09.2016
Database last updated on 19.10.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip09.09.2016Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 12.10.2016  [2016/41]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Cryovac, Inc.
100 Rogers Bridge Road
Duncan, SC 29334 / US
[2014/43]
Inventor(s)01 / Owensby, Joseph E.
335 Seven Oaks Lane
Spartanburg, SC South Carolina 29301 / US
02 / Connor, Howard Dean
112 Old Bridges Road
Mauldin, SC South Carolina 29662 / US
03 / Austin, Billy Wayne
551 East Victor Hill Road
Duncan, SC South Carolina 29334 / US
 [2014/43]
Representative(s)Uexküll & Stolberg
Partnerschaft von
Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB
Beselerstrasse 4
22607 Hamburg / DE
[N/P]
Former [2014/43]UEXKÜLL & STOLBERG
Patentanwälte
Beselerstrasse 4
22607 Hamburg / DE
Application number, filing date14162225.828.03.2014
[2014/43]
Priority number, dateUS20131386432317.04.2013         Original published format: US201313864323
[2014/43]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2792615
Date:22.10.2014
Language:EN
[2014/43]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP14.08.2014
ClassificationInternational:B65D75/00, B65D33/00, B65D75/58, B65D81/32
[2014/43]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/23]
Former [2014/43]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:Beutel mit Messgriff zur Abgabe fliessfähiger Produkte[2014/43]
English:Pouch with metering handle for dispensing flowable products[2014/43]
French:Poche à poignée de dosage destinée à distribuer des produits fluides[2014/43]
Examination procedure22.04.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
22.04.2015Examination requested  [2015/23]
09.12.2015Communication of intention to grant the patent
20.04.2016Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2016/41]
27.05.2016Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time  [2016/41]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  09.12.2015
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.03.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
Documents cited:Search[X]US2010054636  (OWENSBY JOSEPH E [US] ET AL) [X] 1-15 * paragraphs [0071] - [0076]; figures 1-11 *;
 [X]US2005006404  (HARPER WILLIAM ANTHONY [US]) [X] 1-5,7-11,13-15 * figures 1-8; example 1 *
by applicantUS6857779
 US7144159
 US6997858
 US6375037