Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2783648

EP2783648 - Osteosynthesis system for the multi-directional, angularly stable treatment of fractures of long bones comprising a marrow nail and bone screws [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  27.01.2017
Database last updated on 15.07.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip12.10.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): AL
published on 14.11.2018  [2018/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Wolter, Dietmar
Viehkaten 4
22955 Hoisdorf / DE
[2014/40]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
 [2014/40]
Representative(s)Hauck Patentanwaltspartnerschaft mbB
Postfach 11 31 53
20431 Hamburg / DE
[2016/12]
Former [2014/40]Hauck Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Neuer Wall 50
20354 Hamburg / DE
Application number, filing date14162296.928.03.2014
[2014/40]
Priority number, dateDE2013100541328.03.2013         Original published format: DE102013005413
[2014/40]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2783648
Date:01.10.2014
Language:DE
[2014/40]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP2783648
Date:26.11.2014
Language:DE
[2014/48]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2783648
Date:23.03.2016
Language:DE
[2016/12]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP23.10.2014
ClassificationInternational:A61B17/72
[2014/40]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/27]
Former [2014/40]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:Osteosynthesesystem für die multidirektionale, winkelstabile Versorgung von Frakturen von Röhrenknochen umfassend einen Marknagel und Knochenschrauben[2014/40]
English:Osteosynthesis system for the multi-directional, angularly stable treatment of fractures of long bones comprising a marrow nail and bone screws[2014/40]
French:Système d'ostéosynthèse pour l'alimentation multidirectionnelle à angle fixe de fractures d'os longs comprenant un clou médullaire et des vis à os[2014/40]
Examination procedure26.05.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
26.05.2015Examination requested  [2015/27]
18.11.2015Communication of intention to grant the patent
22.01.2016Fee for grant paid
22.01.2016Fee for publishing/printing paid
22.01.2016Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  18.11.2015
Opposition(s)02.01.2017No opposition filed within time limit [2017/09]
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU28.03.2014
AL23.03.2016
CY23.03.2016
CZ23.03.2016
DK23.03.2016
EE23.03.2016
FI23.03.2016
HR23.03.2016
IT23.03.2016
LT23.03.2016
LV23.03.2016
MC23.03.2016
MK23.03.2016
MT23.03.2016
NL23.03.2016
PL23.03.2016
RO23.03.2016
RS23.03.2016
SE23.03.2016
SI23.03.2016
SK23.03.2016
SM23.03.2016
TR23.03.2016
IE28.03.2016
LU28.03.2016
BE31.03.2016
BG23.06.2016
NO23.06.2016
GR24.06.2016
IS23.07.2016
PT25.07.2016
[2018/46]
Former [2018/32]HU28.03.2014
CY23.03.2016
CZ23.03.2016
DK23.03.2016
EE23.03.2016
FI23.03.2016
HR23.03.2016
IT23.03.2016
LT23.03.2016
LV23.03.2016
MC23.03.2016
MK23.03.2016
MT23.03.2016
NL23.03.2016
PL23.03.2016
RO23.03.2016
RS23.03.2016
SE23.03.2016
SI23.03.2016
SK23.03.2016
SM23.03.2016
TR23.03.2016
IE28.03.2016
LU28.03.2016
BE31.03.2016
BG23.06.2016
NO23.06.2016
GR24.06.2016
IS23.07.2016
PT25.07.2016
Former [2018/28]HU28.03.2014
CZ23.03.2016
DK23.03.2016
EE23.03.2016
FI23.03.2016
HR23.03.2016
IT23.03.2016
LT23.03.2016
LV23.03.2016
MC23.03.2016
MK23.03.2016
MT23.03.2016
NL23.03.2016
PL23.03.2016
RO23.03.2016
RS23.03.2016
SE23.03.2016
SI23.03.2016
SK23.03.2016
SM23.03.2016
IE28.03.2016
BE31.03.2016
BG23.06.2016
NO23.06.2016
GR24.06.2016
IS23.07.2016
PT25.07.2016
Former [2017/47]CZ23.03.2016
DK23.03.2016
EE23.03.2016
FI23.03.2016
HR23.03.2016
IT23.03.2016
LT23.03.2016
LV23.03.2016
MT23.03.2016
NL23.03.2016
PL23.03.2016
RO23.03.2016
RS23.03.2016
SE23.03.2016
SI23.03.2016
SK23.03.2016
SM23.03.2016
IE28.03.2016
BE31.03.2016
BG23.06.2016
NO23.06.2016
GR24.06.2016
IS23.07.2016
PT25.07.2016
Former [2017/37]CZ23.03.2016
DK23.03.2016
EE23.03.2016
FI23.03.2016
HR23.03.2016
IT23.03.2016
LT23.03.2016
LV23.03.2016
NL23.03.2016
PL23.03.2016
RO23.03.2016
RS23.03.2016
SE23.03.2016
SI23.03.2016
SK23.03.2016
SM23.03.2016
IE28.03.2016
BE31.03.2016
BG23.06.2016
NO23.06.2016
GR24.06.2016
IS23.07.2016
PT25.07.2016
Former [2017/19]CZ23.03.2016
DK23.03.2016
EE23.03.2016
FI23.03.2016
HR23.03.2016
IT23.03.2016
LT23.03.2016
LV23.03.2016
NL23.03.2016
PL23.03.2016
RO23.03.2016
RS23.03.2016
SE23.03.2016
SK23.03.2016
SM23.03.2016
IE28.03.2016
BE31.03.2016
BG23.06.2016
NO23.06.2016
GR24.06.2016
IS23.07.2016
PT25.07.2016
Former [2017/07]CZ23.03.2016
DK23.03.2016
EE23.03.2016
FI23.03.2016
HR23.03.2016
IT23.03.2016
LT23.03.2016
LV23.03.2016
NL23.03.2016
PL23.03.2016
RO23.03.2016
RS23.03.2016
SE23.03.2016
SK23.03.2016
SM23.03.2016
IE28.03.2016
BE31.03.2016
NO23.06.2016
GR24.06.2016
IS23.07.2016
PT25.07.2016
Former [2017/04]CZ23.03.2016
EE23.03.2016
FI23.03.2016
HR23.03.2016
IT23.03.2016
LT23.03.2016
LV23.03.2016
NL23.03.2016
PL23.03.2016
RO23.03.2016
RS23.03.2016
SE23.03.2016
SK23.03.2016
SM23.03.2016
BE31.03.2016
NO23.06.2016
GR24.06.2016
IS23.07.2016
PT25.07.2016
Former [2016/51]CZ23.03.2016
EE23.03.2016
FI23.03.2016
HR23.03.2016
LT23.03.2016
LV23.03.2016
NL23.03.2016
PL23.03.2016
RO23.03.2016
RS23.03.2016
SE23.03.2016
SK23.03.2016
SM23.03.2016
BE31.03.2016
NO23.06.2016
GR24.06.2016
IS23.07.2016
PT25.07.2016
Former [2016/50]CZ23.03.2016
EE23.03.2016
FI23.03.2016
HR23.03.2016
LT23.03.2016
LV23.03.2016
NL23.03.2016
PL23.03.2016
RO23.03.2016
RS23.03.2016
SE23.03.2016
SK23.03.2016
SM23.03.2016
BE31.03.2016
NO23.06.2016
GR24.06.2016
IS23.07.2016
Former [2016/49]EE23.03.2016
FI23.03.2016
HR23.03.2016
LT23.03.2016
LV23.03.2016
NL23.03.2016
PL23.03.2016
RS23.03.2016
SE23.03.2016
BE31.03.2016
NO23.06.2016
GR24.06.2016
IS23.07.2016
Former [2016/48]FI23.03.2016
HR23.03.2016
LT23.03.2016
LV23.03.2016
NL23.03.2016
RS23.03.2016
SE23.03.2016
BE31.03.2016
NO23.06.2016
GR24.06.2016
IS23.07.2016
Former [2016/40]FI23.03.2016
HR23.03.2016
LT23.03.2016
LV23.03.2016
NL23.03.2016
RS23.03.2016
SE23.03.2016
BE31.03.2016
NO23.06.2016
GR24.06.2016
Former [2016/39]FI23.03.2016
HR23.03.2016
LT23.03.2016
LV23.03.2016
RS23.03.2016
SE23.03.2016
BE31.03.2016
NO23.06.2016
GR24.06.2016
Former [2016/36]FI23.03.2016
HR23.03.2016
LT23.03.2016
BE31.03.2016
NO23.06.2016
GR24.06.2016
Former [2016/35]FI23.03.2016
HR23.03.2016
NO23.06.2016
GR24.06.2016
Documents cited:Search[XDYI]DE19629011  (WOLTER DIETMAR PROF DR MED [DE]) [XD] 1-3,7-9,13-16 * figure 1 * [Y] 4 [I] 12;
 [X]WO0061018  (DEPUY ORTHOPAEDICS INC [US], et al) [X] 1 * figures 3, 5, 17 *;
 [Y]DE202006015414U  (AESCULAP AG & CO KG [DE]) [Y] 4 * figure 3 *;
 [A]DE745873  (ERNST POHL) [A] 4 * figures 1-4 *
by applicantDE4341677
 DE19629011
 EP1143867
 DE4343117