Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2789429

EP2789429 - Robot, robot control device, and robot system [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  17.05.2019
Database last updated on 19.10.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  31.08.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip17.05.2019Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 19.06.2019  [2019/25]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Seiko Epson Corporation
4-1, Nishi-Shinjuku 2-chome Shinjuku-ku
Tokyo 163-0811 / JP
[2014/42]
Inventor(s)01 / Niu, Akio
c/o SEIKO EPSON CORPORATION
3-5, Owa 3-chome
Suwa-shi
Nagano, 392-8502 / JP
 [2014/42]
Representative(s)Hoffmann Eitle
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Arabellastraße 30
81925 München / DE
[2014/42]
Application number, filing date14162332.228.03.2014
[2014/42]
Priority number, dateJP2013008227510.04.2013         Original published format: JP 2013082275
[2014/42]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2789429
Date:15.10.2014
Language:EN
[2014/42]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP2789429
Date:09.03.2016
Language:EN
[2016/10]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP04.02.2016
ClassificationInternational:B25J9/16, B25J9/04, B25J13/08
[2016/10]
Former International [2014/42]B25J9/04, B25J13/08
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/39]
Former [2014/42]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:Roboter, Robotersteuervorrichtung und Robotersystem[2014/42]
English:Robot, robot control device, and robot system[2014/42]
French:Robot, dispositif de commande et système associés[2014/42]
Examination procedure17.08.2016Examination requested  [2016/39]
07.09.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
04.09.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
15.01.2019Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2019/25]
12.02.2019Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2019/25]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  04.09.2018
Fees paidRenewal fee
08.03.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
06.03.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
09.03.2018Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.03.201906   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[XP]EP2703130  (SEIKO EPSON CORP [JP]) [XP] 1,2,4,6,12-15 * the whole document *;
 [XP]EP2703131  (SEIKO EPSON CORP [JP]) [XP] 1,2,4,6,12-15 * the whole document *;
 [I]WO2010019310  (OCEANEERING INT INC [US]) [I] 1-3,5,7-13 * paragraph [0005] - paragraph [0015] *;
 [A]US2012296471  (INABA KIYONORI [JP] ET AL) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0028] - paragraph [0210] *
by applicantJP2011136395