Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2787112

EP2787112 - Control panel, control method thereof and clothes treating apparatus having the same [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  28.09.2018
Database last updated on 19.10.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip17.04.2019New entry: Reply to examination report 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
LG Electronics, Inc.
128, Yeoui-daero
Yeongdeungpo-gu
Seoul 150-721 / KR
[2014/41]
Inventor(s)01 / Park, Youngbae
51 Gasan digital 1-ro, Geumcheon-gu
Seoul 153-802 / KR
02 / Jung, Noran
51 Gasan digital 1-ro, Geumcheon-gu
Seoul 153-802 / KR
03 / Kim, Jimaeng
51 Gasan digital 1-ro, Geumcheon-gu
Seoul 153-802 / KR
04 / Jang, Yongwoon
51 Gasan digital 1-ro, Geumcheon-gu
Seoul 153-802 / KR
 [2014/41]
Representative(s)Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB
Siebertstrasse 3
81675 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2014/41]Vossius & Partner
Siebertstrasse 4
81675 München / DE
Application number, filing date14162354.628.03.2014
[2014/41]
Priority number, dateKR2013003710504.04.2013         Original published format: KR 20130037105
[2014/41]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2787112
Date:08.10.2014
Language:EN
[2014/41]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP2787112
Date:26.08.2015
Language:EN
[2015/35]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP24.07.2015
ClassificationInternational:D06F39/00, D06F33/02, H05B33/08
[2015/35]
Former International [2014/41]D06F39/00, D06F33/02
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/14]
Former [2014/41]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:Steuertafel, Steuerverfahren dafür und Kleiderbehandlungsvorrichtung damit[2014/41]
English:Control panel, control method thereof and clothes treating apparatus having the same[2014/41]
French:Panneau de commande, procédé de commande de celui-ci et appareil de traitement pour vêtements ayant le même[2014/41]
Examination procedure28.03.2014Examination requested  [2014/41]
26.02.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
05.10.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
15.04.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  05.10.2018
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.03.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
24.03.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
23.03.2018Renewal fee patent year 05
26.03.2019Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[I]US2013057165  (IDE MASAHIRO [JP] ET AL) [I] 1-15 * paragraphs [0009] - [0012] - [0051] - [0066]; figures 2,5 * * paragraph [0051] - paragraph [0066] *;
 [I]US5698826  (CRACRAFT MARK A [US] ET AL) [I] 1-15 * abstract * * column 1, line 55 - column 5, line 7; figures 1-5 *;
 [I]US2003019734  (SATO DAI [JP] ET AL) [I] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0066] - [0076]; figures 4,5 *;
 [I]US2004118872  (ROMANYSZYN ADRIAN M [US] ET AL) [I] 1-15 * paragraphs [0006] , [0010] , [0049] , [0075] - [0087]; figures 9,11 *;
 [A]US2002116959  (OHTA YOSHIHIRO [JP] ET AL) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0059] - [0064] - [0072] - [0111]; figures 1-34 *;
 [A]DE102008030365  (CONTINENTAL AUTOMOTIVE GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *