Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2787455

EP2787455 - Device and method for processing history data [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  16.09.2016
Database last updated on 16.10.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip16.09.2016Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 19.10.2016  [2016/42]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
LSIS Co., Ltd.
1026-6, Hogye-Dong
Dongan-gu, Anyang
Gyeonggi-do 431-080 / KR
[2014/41]
Inventor(s)01 / Myung, Jin Hei
c/o LSIS Co., Ltd.
1026-6, Hogye-Dong, Dongan-Gu
431-080 Anyang-si, Gyeonggi-Do / KR
 [2014/41]
Representative(s)Lang, Johannes
Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB
Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte
Prinzregentenplatz 7
81675 München / DE
[2014/41]
Application number, filing date14162406.428.03.2014
[2014/41]
Priority number, dateKR2013003513601.04.2013         Original published format: KR 20130035136
[2014/41]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2787455
Date:08.10.2014
Language:EN
[2014/41]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP23.07.2014
ClassificationInternational:G06F17/40, G06F17/30
[2014/41]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/41]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:Vorrichtung und Verfahren zur Verarbeitung von historischen Daten[2014/41]
English:Device and method for processing history data[2014/41]
French:Dispositif et procédé de traitement de données d'historique[2014/41]
Examination proceduredeletedCommunication of intention to grant the patent
26.11.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
26.11.2014Examination requested  [2015/02]
04.12.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
14.04.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.09.2016Application withdrawn by applicant  [2016/42]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  04.12.2015
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.03.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
Documents cited:Search[I]US5754449  (HOSHAL GREGORY D [US] ET AL) [I] 1-12 * column 8; claim 1 *;
 [A]US6272445  (CHEALE GRAHAM RUSSELL [GB] ET AL) [A] 1-12 * the whole document *;
 [A]US2005240359  (FREDERICK JESSE R [US]) [A] 1-12 * the whole document *;
 [A]US2012011178  (PFEIFLE MARTIN [DE] ET AL) [A] 1-12 * the whole document *