Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2787481

EP2787481 - Locator system for three-dimensional visualization [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  16.03.2018
Database last updated on 21.10.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  04.11.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip16.03.2018Change - divisional application(s)published on 18.04.2018  [2018/16]
16.03.2018Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 18.04.2018  [2018/16]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
The Boeing Company
100 North Riverside Plaza
Chicago, IL 60606-1596 / US
[N/P]
Former [2014/41]For all designated states
The Boeing Company
100 North Riverside Plaza
Chicago, IL 60606-2016 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Gass, John Carney
100 North Riverside Plaza
Chicago, IL 60606-2016 / US
02 / Troy, James J.
P.O. Box 3707
MC 7L-43
Seattle, WA Washington 98124-2207 / US
03 / Ward, William E.
100 North Riverside Plaza
Chicago, IL 60606-2016 / US
04 / Esposito, Christopher D.
P.O. Box 3707
MC 7L-70
Seattle, WA Washington 98124-2207 / US
05 / Puterbaugh, Kevin
P.O. Box 3707
MC 7L-43
Seattle, WA Washington 98124-2207 / US
06 / Prazak, Nikoli E.
P.O. Box 3707
MC 7J-41
Seattle, WA Washington 98124-2207 / US
07 / Nelson, Bruce L.
P.O. Box 3707
MC 7J-43
Seattle, WA Washington 98124-2207 / US
08 / Mcgarry, William D.
100 North Riverside Plaza
Chicago, IL 60606-2016 / US
 [2014/41]
Representative(s)Shipp, Nicholas
Kilburn & Strode LLP
Lacon London
84 Theobalds Road
London WC1X 8NL / GB
[N/P]
Former [2014/41]Shipp, Nicholas
Kilburn & Strode LLP
20 Red Lion Street
London WC1R 4PJ / GB
Application number, filing date14162481.728.03.2014
[2014/41]
Priority number, dateUS20131385510202.04.2013         Original published format: US201313855102
[2014/41]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2787481
Date:08.10.2014
Language:EN
[2014/41]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP17.07.2014
ClassificationInternational:G06Q50/04
[2014/41]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/41]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:Ortungssystem für dreidimensionale Visualisierung[2014/41]
English:Locator system for three-dimensional visualization[2014/41]
French:Système de localisation pour visualisation tridimensionnelle[2014/41]
Examination procedure28.03.2014Examination requested  [2014/41]
31.03.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
26.10.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
06.03.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.03.2018Application withdrawn by applicant  [2018/16]
14.03.2018Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 14.03.2018
14.03.2018Date of oral proceedings (cancelled)
Divisional application(s)EP18161502.2
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  26.10.2016
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.03.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
27.03.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[X]US2010175013  (KRAUTER LANCE GERARD [US] ET AL) [X] 1-16 * abstract * * paragraph [0100] *;
 [X]US5771043  (NIGAWARA SEIITSU [JP] ET AL) [X] 1-16 * abstract *;
 [X]US8027745  (FREEZE WAYNE S [US]) [X] 1-16 * abstract *