Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2787224

EP2787224 - Prong type resin cage for double row roller bearing and double row roller bearing [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  16.11.2018
Database last updated on 16.10.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  13.11.2018
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  07.11.2018
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  25.06.2018
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  31.03.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip11.10.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): AT, MC
published on 13.11.2019 [2019/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
JTEKT Corporation
5-8, Minamisemba 3-chome Chuo-ku
Osaka-shi, Osaka 542-8502 / JP
[2014/41]
Inventor(s)01 / Honjo, Hayaki
c/o JTEKT Corporation
5-8, Minamisemba 3-chome, Chuo-ku
Osaka-shi, Osaka 542-8502 / JP
 [2014/41]
Representative(s)Winter, Brandl, Fürniss, Hübner, Röss, Kaiser, Polte - Partnerschaft mbB
Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei
Alois-Steinecker-Strasse 22
85354 Freising / DE
[2018/51]
Former [2014/41]Winter, Brandl, Fürniss, Hübner, Röss, Kaiser, Polte - Partnerschaft mbB
Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei
Bavariaring 10
80336 München / DE
Application number, filing date14162548.331.03.2014
[2014/41]
Priority number, dateJP2013007759803.04.2013         Original published format: JP 2013077598
[2014/41]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2787224
Date:08.10.2014
Language:EN
[2014/41]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP2787224
Date:05.11.2014
[2014/45]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2787224
Date:19.12.2018
Language:EN
[2018/51]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP06.10.2014
ClassificationInternational:F16C19/28, F16C33/46, F16C33/49, F16C33/48
[2014/45]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/23]
Former [2014/41]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:Kammartiger Harzkäfig für zweireihiges Rollenlager und zweireihiges Rollenlager[2014/41]
English:Prong type resin cage for double row roller bearing and double row roller bearing[2014/41]
French:Cage en résine de type peigne pour roulement à rouleaux à double rangée et roulement à rouleaux à double rangée[2014/41]
Examination procedure27.04.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
27.04.2015Examination requested  [2015/23]
30.03.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
25.07.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
09.11.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
14.03.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
26.06.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
31.10.2018Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
31.10.2018Fee for grant paid
31.10.2018Fee for publishing/printing paid
13.11.2018Information about intention to grant a patent
13.11.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  30.03.2017
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.03.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
10.03.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
13.03.2018Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL19.12.2018
AT19.12.2018
CZ19.12.2018
EE19.12.2018
ES19.12.2018
FI19.12.2018
HR19.12.2018
IT19.12.2018
LT19.12.2018
LV19.12.2018
MC19.12.2018
NL19.12.2018
PL19.12.2018
RO19.12.2018
RS19.12.2018
SE19.12.2018
SK19.12.2018
SM19.12.2018
BG19.03.2019
NO19.03.2019
GR20.03.2019
IS19.04.2019
PT19.04.2019
[2019/46]
Former [2019/39]AL19.12.2018
CZ19.12.2018
EE19.12.2018
ES19.12.2018
FI19.12.2018
HR19.12.2018
IT19.12.2018
LT19.12.2018
LV19.12.2018
NL19.12.2018
PL19.12.2018
RO19.12.2018
RS19.12.2018
SE19.12.2018
SK19.12.2018
SM19.12.2018
BG19.03.2019
NO19.03.2019
GR20.03.2019
IS19.04.2019
PT19.04.2019
Former [2019/37]AL19.12.2018
CZ19.12.2018
EE19.12.2018
ES19.12.2018
FI19.12.2018
HR19.12.2018
IT19.12.2018
LT19.12.2018
LV19.12.2018
NL19.12.2018
PL19.12.2018
RO19.12.2018
RS19.12.2018
SE19.12.2018
SM19.12.2018
BG19.03.2019
NO19.03.2019
GR20.03.2019
PT19.04.2019
Former [2019/35]AL19.12.2018
CZ19.12.2018
ES19.12.2018
FI19.12.2018
HR19.12.2018
IT19.12.2018
LT19.12.2018
LV19.12.2018
NL19.12.2018
PL19.12.2018
RS19.12.2018
SE19.12.2018
BG19.03.2019
NO19.03.2019
GR20.03.2019
PT19.04.2019
Former [2019/34]AL19.12.2018
FI19.12.2018
HR19.12.2018
IT19.12.2018
LT19.12.2018
LV19.12.2018
NL19.12.2018
RS19.12.2018
SE19.12.2018
BG19.03.2019
NO19.03.2019
GR20.03.2019
PT19.04.2019
Former [2019/33]AL19.12.2018
FI19.12.2018
HR19.12.2018
LT19.12.2018
LV19.12.2018
NL19.12.2018
RS19.12.2018
SE19.12.2018
BG19.03.2019
NO19.03.2019
GR20.03.2019
PT19.04.2019
Former [2019/30]AL19.12.2018
FI19.12.2018
HR19.12.2018
LT19.12.2018
LV19.12.2018
NL19.12.2018
RS19.12.2018
SE19.12.2018
BG19.03.2019
NO19.03.2019
GR20.03.2019
Former [2019/26]AL19.12.2018
FI19.12.2018
HR19.12.2018
LT19.12.2018
LV19.12.2018
RS19.12.2018
SE19.12.2018
BG19.03.2019
NO19.03.2019
GR20.03.2019
Former [2019/25]FI19.12.2018
HR19.12.2018
LT19.12.2018
LV19.12.2018
RS19.12.2018
SE19.12.2018
BG19.03.2019
NO19.03.2019
GR20.03.2019
Former [2019/23]FI19.12.2018
HR19.12.2018
LT19.12.2018
LV19.12.2018
BG19.03.2019
NO19.03.2019
Former [2019/22]FI19.12.2018
LT19.12.2018
BG19.03.2019
NO19.03.2019
Former [2019/21]FI19.12.2018
LT19.12.2018
NO19.03.2019
Former [2019/20]LT19.12.2018
NO19.03.2019
Documents cited:Search[XI]DE10262165  (NSK LTD [JP]) [X] 1-4,6 * paragraphs [0021] , [0 32] - [0034] - [ 119] - [0121] - [ 150] , [ 152] , [ 153] , [ 166] , [ 167] - [0175] * * figures 20, 22, 23 * [I] 5;
 [X]US2005069239  (YAMAMOTO NAOTA [JP] ET AL) [X] 1-3,5,6 * paragraphs [0114] , [ 148] - [0149] * * figures 18(b), 20(a), 20(b) *;
 [A]US2011229066  (MUHAMAD IBRAHIM [DE]) [A] 2,5 * paragraphs [0007] , [00 8] , [0 32] * * figures 1, 3 *;
 [A]GB2365934  (NSK LTD [JP]) [A] 3 * figures 12, 30 *
by applicantJP2012102796