Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2787579

EP2787579 - Quick-attachment device for a two-part connector with quick disconnection [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  23.08.2019
Database last updated on 21.10.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  14.09.2018
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  28.05.2018
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  07.07.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip11.10.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MC
published on 13.11.2019 [2019/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Amphenol Air LB
29 Voie d'Yvois
08110 Blagny / FR
[2014/41]
Inventor(s)01 / Montet, Davy
2 rue au beurre
08160 Vendresse / FR
02 / Cayzac, Gaspard
22, rue de Lorraine
08370 Margut / FR
 [2014/41]
Representative(s)Casalonga
Casalonga & Partners
Bayerstraße 71/73
80335 München / DE
[2014/41]
Application number, filing date14162578.031.03.2014
[2014/41]
Priority number, dateFR2013005309405.04.2013         Original published format: FR 1353094
[2014/41]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2787579
Date:08.10.2014
Language:FR
[2014/41]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2787579
Date:17.10.2018
Language:FR
[2018/42]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP17.07.2014
ClassificationInternational:H01R13/627, H01R13/633, // H01R13/645
[2014/41]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/41]
TitleGerman:Schnellbefestigungsvorrichtung für zweiteiligen Anschluss mit Schnellentkupplung[2014/41]
English:Quick-attachment device for a two-part connector with quick disconnection[2014/41]
French:Dispositif de fixation rapide pour connecteur en deux parties à déconnexion rapide[2014/41]
Examination procedure04.03.2015Examination requested  [2015/16]
03.04.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
05.07.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
20.12.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
29.05.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
10.09.2018Fee for grant paid
10.09.2018Fee for publishing/printing paid
10.09.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  05.07.2017
Opposition(s)18.07.2019No opposition filed within time limit [2019/39]
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.12.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
28.12.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
31.12.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL17.10.2018
AT17.10.2018
CZ17.10.2018
DK17.10.2018
EE17.10.2018
ES17.10.2018
FI17.10.2018
HR17.10.2018
IT17.10.2018
LT17.10.2018
LV17.10.2018
MC17.10.2018
NL17.10.2018
PL17.10.2018
RO17.10.2018
RS17.10.2018
SE17.10.2018
SK17.10.2018
SM17.10.2018
BG17.01.2019
NO17.01.2019
GR18.01.2019
IS17.02.2019
PT17.02.2019
[2019/46]
Former [2019/40]AL17.10.2018
AT17.10.2018
CZ17.10.2018
DK17.10.2018
EE17.10.2018
ES17.10.2018
FI17.10.2018
HR17.10.2018
IT17.10.2018
LT17.10.2018
LV17.10.2018
NL17.10.2018
PL17.10.2018
RO17.10.2018
RS17.10.2018
SE17.10.2018
SK17.10.2018
SM17.10.2018
BG17.01.2019
NO17.01.2019
GR18.01.2019
IS17.02.2019
PT17.02.2019
Former [2019/37]AL17.10.2018
AT17.10.2018
CZ17.10.2018
DK17.10.2018
EE17.10.2018
ES17.10.2018
FI17.10.2018
HR17.10.2018
IT17.10.2018
LT17.10.2018
LV17.10.2018
NL17.10.2018
PL17.10.2018
RO17.10.2018
RS17.10.2018
SE17.10.2018
SM17.10.2018
BG17.01.2019
NO17.01.2019
GR18.01.2019
IS17.02.2019
PT17.02.2019
Former [2019/35]AL17.10.2018
AT17.10.2018
CZ17.10.2018
DK17.10.2018
ES17.10.2018
FI17.10.2018
HR17.10.2018
IT17.10.2018
LT17.10.2018
LV17.10.2018
NL17.10.2018
PL17.10.2018
RS17.10.2018
SE17.10.2018
BG17.01.2019
NO17.01.2019
GR18.01.2019
IS17.02.2019
PT17.02.2019
Former [2019/34]AL17.10.2018
AT17.10.2018
DK17.10.2018
ES17.10.2018
FI17.10.2018
HR17.10.2018
IT17.10.2018
LT17.10.2018
LV17.10.2018
NL17.10.2018
PL17.10.2018
RS17.10.2018
SE17.10.2018
BG17.01.2019
NO17.01.2019
GR18.01.2019
IS17.02.2019
PT17.02.2019
Former [2019/26]AL17.10.2018
AT17.10.2018
ES17.10.2018
FI17.10.2018
HR17.10.2018
LT17.10.2018
LV17.10.2018
NL17.10.2018
PL17.10.2018
RS17.10.2018
SE17.10.2018
BG17.01.2019
NO17.01.2019
GR18.01.2019
IS17.02.2019
PT17.02.2019
Former [2019/25]AT17.10.2018
ES17.10.2018
FI17.10.2018
HR17.10.2018
LT17.10.2018
LV17.10.2018
NL17.10.2018
PL17.10.2018
RS17.10.2018
SE17.10.2018
BG17.01.2019
NO17.01.2019
GR18.01.2019
IS17.02.2019
Former [2019/24]AT17.10.2018
ES17.10.2018
FI17.10.2018
HR17.10.2018
LT17.10.2018
LV17.10.2018
NL17.10.2018
PL17.10.2018
SE17.10.2018
BG17.01.2019
NO17.01.2019
GR18.01.2019
IS17.02.2019
Former [2019/23]AT17.10.2018
ES17.10.2018
FI17.10.2018
HR17.10.2018
LT17.10.2018
LV17.10.2018
NL17.10.2018
PL17.10.2018
BG17.01.2019
NO17.01.2019
IS17.02.2019
Former [2019/22]FI17.10.2018
LT17.10.2018
NL17.10.2018
PL17.10.2018
BG17.01.2019
NO17.01.2019
IS17.02.2019
Former [2019/21]FI17.10.2018
LT17.10.2018
NL17.10.2018
NO17.01.2019
IS17.02.2019
Former [2019/20]LT17.10.2018
NL17.10.2018
NO17.01.2019
Former [2019/17]NL17.10.2018
Documents cited:Search[XAI]US4163594  (AUJLA SHARANJIT S [CA]) [X] 1-3 * figures 1-4 * [A] 8,9 [I] 4-7,10;
 [XAI]US5609498  (MUZSLAY STEVEN Z [US]) [X] 1-4,9 * figures 1-6,11,12 * [A] 5-8 [I] 10;
 [XAI]EP0996201  (HIROSE ELECTRIC CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1-3 * figures 1-7 * [A] 4-9 [I] 10;
 [XAI]US3671922  (ZERLIN WILLIAM MAX ERICH ET AL) [X] 1-3 * figures 1-3 * [A] 4-9 [I] 10;
 [A]US3235834  (FRANCIS O'KEEFE MICHAEL ET AL) [A] 10 * figures 1,5 *
by applicantFR2849967
 FR2887079