Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2790351

EP2790351 - Key insulation method and device [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  09.06.2017
Database last updated on 19.10.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  25.01.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip09.06.2017Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 12.07.2017  [2017/28]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd.
Huawei Administration Building
Bantian
Longgang District
Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN
[N/P]
Former [2014/42]For all designated states
Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd.
Huawei Administration Building
Bantian, Longgang District
Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN
Inventor(s)01 / Cheng, Xiangguo
Huawei Administration Building
Bantian, Longgang District
518129 Shenzhen / CN
02 / Yu, Jia
Huawei Administration Building
Bantian, Longgang District
518129 Shenzhen / CN
03 / Yang, Qinqin
Huawei Administration Building, Bantian, Longgang
District
518129 Shenzhen / CN
 [2014/42]
Representative(s)Goddar, Heinz J.
Boehmert & Boehmert
Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB
Pettenkoferstrasse 22
80336 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2014/42]Goddar, Heinz J.
Boehmert & Boehmert
Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB
Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte
Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22
80336 München / DE
Application number, filing date14162594.731.03.2014
[2014/42]
Priority number, dateCN2013111934208.04.2013         Original published format: CN201310119342
[2014/42]
Filing languageZH
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2790351
Date:15.10.2014
Language:EN
[2014/42]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP2790351
Date:15.04.2015
Language:EN
[2015/16]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP16.03.2015
ClassificationInternational:H04L9/08
[2014/42]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/42]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:Schlüsselisolierungsverfahren und Vorrichtung[2014/42]
English:Key insulation method and device[2014/42]
French:Dispositif et procédé d'isolation de clé[2014/42]
Examination procedure31.03.2014Examination requested  [2014/42]
15.10.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
28.01.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
07.06.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
12.09.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
23.01.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
31.05.2017Application withdrawn by applicant  [2017/28]
06.06.2017Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 07.12.2017
07.12.2017Date of oral proceedings (cancelled)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  28.01.2016
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.03.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
13.03.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[XI]  - JIAN WENG ET AL, "Parallel key-insulated signature: Framework and construction", JOURNAL OF SHANGHAI JIAOTONG UNIVERSITY (SCIENCE), (20080201), vol. 13, no. 1, doi:10.1007/s12204-008-0006-y, ISSN 1007-1172, pages 6 - 11, XP055173420 [X] 1,4,8,11,14,18 * introduction; section 3.1 * [I] 2,3,5-7,9,10,12,13,15-17,19,20

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s12204-008-0006-y
 [XI]  - JIAN-XIN ZHU ET AL, "Improved identity-based key-insulation signature scheme", COMPUTER APPLICATIONS, (20080501), vol. 28, no. 5, pages 1128 - 1132, XP055174190 [X] 1,4,8,11,18 * section 2.1 * [I] 2,3,5-7,9,10,12-17,19,20

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.3724/SP.J.1087.2008.01128
 [XI]  - JIAN WENG ET AL, Identity-Based Key-Insulated Signature with Secure Key-Updates, INFORMATION SECURITY AND CRYPTOLOGY LECTURE NOTES IN COMPUTER SCIENCE;;LNCS, SPRINGER, BERLIN, DE, PAGE(S) 13 - 26, (20060101), ISBN 978-3-540-49608-3, XP019051615 [X] 1,4,8,11,18 * section 4.2 * [I] 2,3,5-7,9,10,12-17,19,20
 [T]  - DODIS Y ET AL, "Key-insulated public key cryptosystems", LECTURE NOTES IN COMPUTER SCIENCE, SPRINGER VERLAG, BERLIN; DE, (20020101), vol. 2332, doi:10.1007/3-540-46035-7_5, pages 65 - 82, XP002491476 [T] * section 1 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/3-540-46035-7_5