Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2793533

EP2793533 - Method of transmitting signals [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  01.02.2019
Database last updated on 18.06.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  25.11.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip01.02.2019Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 06.03.2019  [2019/10]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Hep Tech Co. Ltd.
No. 20, Jingke 7th Rd., Nantun Dist.
Nantun Dist.
408 Taichung City / TW
For all designated states
Lin, Ming-Feng
13A, No. 32-1, Chaoma 7th St.
Xitun Dist.
407 Taichung City / TW
[2014/43]
Inventor(s)01 / Lin, Ming-Feng
13A, No.32-1, Chaoma 7th St., Xitun Dist.
407 Taichung City / TW
 [2014/43]
Representative(s)Viering, Jentschura & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Kennedydamm 55 / Roßstrasse
40476 Düsseldorf / DE
[N/P]
Former [2014/43]Viering, Jentschura & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Kennedydamm 55 / Roßstrasse
40476 Düsseldorf / DE
Application number, filing date14162618.431.03.2014
[2014/43]
Priority number, dateTW2013011401219.04.2013         Original published format: TW 102114012
[2014/43]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2793533
Date:22.10.2014
Language:EN
[2014/43]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP02.09.2014
ClassificationInternational:H05B33/08
[2014/43]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/22]
Former [2014/43]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Übertragung von Signalen[2014/43]
English:Method of transmitting signals[2014/43]
French:Procédé de transmission de signaux[2014/43]
Examination procedure20.04.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
20.04.2015Examination requested  [2015/22]
27.07.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
24.11.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.05.2018Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 30.07.2018
30.07.2018Date of oral proceedings (cancelled)
02.10.2018Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2019/10]
24.10.2018Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 21.11.2018
30.10.2018Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2019/10]
21.11.2018Date of oral proceedings (cancelled)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  27.07.2016
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.03.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
30.03.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.03.201805   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[XY]WO2011114250  (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [X] 1-4,9,10 * paragraphs [0043] , [0046] , [0047]; figures 1,2,5 * [Y] 5-8;
 [Y]US2011095703  (WILSON STEPHEN CHRISTIAN [CA], et al) [Y] 1-10 * figures 1,4,8,9 *;
 [Y]WO2011048214  (TRIDONIC GMBH & CO KG [AT], et al) [Y] 1-10 * page 6, line 16 - page 7, line 25; figures 1,5 *;
 [XY]WO2007026170  (MOOD CONCEPTS LTD [GB], et al) [X] 1-4,9,10 * figure 1; claims 1,40 * [Y] 5-8