Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2786691

EP2786691 - Dish washing machine [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  30.07.2019
Database last updated on 22.10.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  02.12.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip30.07.2019New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.
129, Samsung-ro
Yeongtong-gu
Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 443-742 / KR
[2014/41]
Inventor(s)01 / Hong, Seung Gee
311-503, Hyundai Apt., 49, Segwon-ro 316beon-gil
Gwonseon-gu, Suwon-si
Gyeonggi-do / KR
02 / Kyong, Yong Soo
103-1401, Imgwang Apt., 167, Nangok-ro, Gwanak-gu
Seoul / KR
03 / Park, Chan Young
503, 52, Sinwon-ro 283 beon-gil, Yeongtong-gu
Suwon-si
Gyeonggi-do / KR
04 / Yoo, Soo Hyung
308-1301, Gyeongnam 3 Cha Apt., 76, Majang-ro
272beon-gil, Bupyeong-gu
Incheon / KR
05 / Lee, Chang Wook
0-103, 397, Olympic-ro, Songpa-gu
Seoul / KR
06 / Jung, Min Ho
343-101, Dugyeon Maeul Apt., 64, Jeongjacheon-ro
188beon-gil, Jangan-gu, Suwon-si
Gyeonggi-do / KR
07 / Kim, Hyoung Jun
307-302, Raemian Ever heim Apt., 7
Naesonsunhwan-ro, Uiwang-si
Gyeonggi-do / KR
08 / Lee, Jea Won
106-304, Jugong Apt.,35, Byeongjeom 2-ro
Hwaseong-si
Gyeonggi-do / KR
09 / Jung, Hyun Dong
105-701, Saemteo Maeul Apt., 120, Irwon-ro
Gangnam-gu
Seoul / KR
10 / Joo, Jae Man
103-1202, Seonghyeon Maeul Bando Yubora Apt., 35
Jukjeon-ro 193beon-gil, Suji-gu, Yongin-si
Gyeonggi-do / KR
 [2014/41]
Representative(s)Walaski, Jan Filip
Venner Shipley LLP
200 Aldersgate
London EC1A 4HD / GB
[N/P]
Former [2014/41]Walaski, Jan Filip
Venner Shipley LLP
200 Aldersgate
London
EC1A 4HD / GB
Application number, filing date14162736.431.03.2014
[2014/41]
Priority number, dateKR2013003777705.04.2013         Original published format: KR 20130037777
KR2013016946331.12.2013         Original published format: KR 20130169463
KR2014001695013.02.2014         Original published format: KR 20140016950
[2014/41]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2786691
Date:08.10.2014
Language:EN
[2014/41]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP2786691
Date:07.01.2015
Language:EN
[2015/02]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP04.12.2014
ClassificationInternational:A47L15/16, A47L15/42, A47L15/18
[2019/32]
Former International [2014/41]A47L15/18, A47L15/42
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/33]
Former [2014/41]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:Geschirrspülmaschine[2014/41]
English:Dish washing machine[2014/41]
French:Lave-vaisselle[2014/41]
Examination procedure07.07.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
07.07.2015Examination requested  [2015/33]
02.12.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
12.04.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
31.01.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
31.05.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
31.07.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  02.12.2016
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.03.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
20.03.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
23.03.2018Renewal fee patent year 05
22.03.2019Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[XYI]US2236791  (AUGUST FORSBERG ERIK) [X] 1,2,4,6,10,14 * page 2, column 1, line 32 - page 2, column 2, line 20; figure 2 * [Y] 3,13 [I] 5,7-9,11,12,15;
 [Y]EP0383028  (LICENTIA GMBH [DE]) [Y] 3 * abstract *;
 [Y]FR730058  (KNUT WALDEMAR HEYMAN) [Y] 13 * page 2, lines 39-44; figure 1 *;
 [A]DE1191527  (GEORGE MIKULASEK GIBSON) [A] 1,2,4,6-8 * figure 2 *;
 [A]EP2030556  (WHIRLPOOL CO [US]) [A] 1,2,6,7,13 * figures 2,3,5,6 *;
 [A]FR2627073  (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP]) [A] 1,6,7,13 * figures 3,5,6,9,10A *;
 [A]CH577302  (BOLLA LINO) [A] 1,13 * column 1, line 62 - column 2, line 4; figures 1-4 *;
 [A]US2704084  (JAMES LEWIS A, et al) [A] 1,15 * figure 1 *;
 [A]JP2008279137  (HOSHIZAKI ELECTRIC CO LTD) [A] 1 * figures 3,5,6,7,4 *