Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2786691 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2786691



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 542
31.07.2019 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
31.07.2019 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
31.07.2019 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
31.07.2019 Text intended for grant Search / examination 65
31.07.2019 Text intended for grant (clean copy) Search / examination 64
31.05.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
31.05.2019 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 3
31.05.2019 Claims Search / examination 3
31.05.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
31.05.2019 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
31.01.2019 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
31.01.2019 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
12.04.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
12.04.2017 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 3
12.04.2017 Claims Search / examination 3
12.04.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
12.04.2017 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
02.12.2016 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
02.12.2016 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
28.11.2016 Examination started Search / examination 1
01.08.2016 Notification regarding date of start of examination with possibility to withdraw Search / examination 1
07.07.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
07.07.2015 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 3
07.07.2015 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 3
07.07.2015 Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 2
07.07.2015 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 2
07.07.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
12.01.2015 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
04.12.2014 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
04.12.2014 European search opinion Search / examination 4
04.12.2014 European search report Search / examination 2
24.11.2014 Search started Search / examination 1
10.09.2014 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 2
28.07.2014 Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor Search / examination 1
08.07.2014 Letter which had not been notified Search / examination 4
16.06.2014 Confirmation of receipt of (electronically) transmitted priority document Search / examination 1
03.06.2014 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 78
03.06.2014 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 95
03.06.2014 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 88
31.03.2014 Abstract Search / examination 1
31.03.2014 Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 2
31.03.2014 Annex Search / examination 1
31.03.2014 Claims Search / examination 3
31.03.2014 Description Search / examination 27
31.03.2014 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
31.03.2014 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
31.03.2014 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
31.03.2014 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
31.03.2014 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
31.03.2014 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
31.03.2014 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
31.03.2014 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
31.03.2014 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
31.03.2014 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
31.03.2014 Drawings Search / examination 32
31.03.2014 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 5