Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2785104

EP2785104 - Method and apparatus for controlling congestion in wireless communication system [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  24.05.2019
Database last updated on 21.10.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  26.05.2017
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  20.01.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip24.05.2019Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 26.06.2019  [2019/26]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.
129, Samsung-ro
Yeongtong-gu
Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 443-742 / KR
[2014/40]
Inventor(s)01 / Jeong, Sangsoo
c/o Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.
129, Samsung-ro, Yeongtong-gu
Suwon-si
443-742 Gyeonggi-do / KR
02 / Cho, Songyean
c/o Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.
129, Samsung-ro, Yeongtong-gu
Suwon-si
443-742 Gyeonggi-do / KR
03 / Bae, Beomsik
c/o Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.
129, Samsung-ro, Yeongtong-gu
Suwon-si
443-742 Gyeonggi-do / KR
 [2014/40]
Representative(s)Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB
Leopoldstraße 4
80802 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2014/40]Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser
Leopoldstrasse 4
80802 München / DE
Application number, filing date14162783.631.03.2014
[2014/40]
Priority number, dateKR2013003479529.03.2013         Original published format: KR 20130034795
KR2013005003603.05.2013         Original published format: KR 20130050036
KR2013005670620.05.2013         Original published format: KR 20130056706
KR2013007800503.07.2013         Original published format: KR 20130078005
[2014/40]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2785104
Date:01.10.2014
Language:EN
[2014/40]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP2785104
Date:05.10.2016
Language:EN
[2016/40]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP01.09.2016
ClassificationInternational:H04W28/02
[2014/40]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/08]
Former [2014/40]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:Vorrichtung und Verfahren zur Überlastungssteuerung in einem drahtlosen Kommunikationssystem[2014/40]
English:Method and apparatus for controlling congestion in wireless communication system[2014/40]
French:Procédé et appareil de contrôle de congestion dans un système de communication sans fil[2014/40]
Examination procedure03.01.2017Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
03.01.2017Examination requested  [2017/08]
29.05.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
28.09.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
16.01.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
16.05.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.09.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
22.01.2019Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2019/26]
19.02.2019Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2019/26]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  29.05.2017
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.03.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
27.03.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
23.03.2018Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.03.201906   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[X]US2012051216  (ZHANG YING [US] ET AL) [X] 1-15 * paragraph [0007] - paragraph [0010]; figures 1-3 *;
 [I]US2012201137  (LE FAUCHEUR FRANCOIS L [FR] ET AL) [I] 1-15 * paragraph [0015] * * paragraph [0021] * * paragraph [0039] * * paragraph [0042] *;
 [I]US2011176414  (DE FRANCA LIMA OCTAVIO JOSE [US] ET AL) [I] 1-15 * paragraph [0028] - paragraph [0032] *;
 [A]WO2013034663  (NEC EUROPE LTD [DE]; SCHMID STEFAN [DE]; PUNZ GOTTFRIED [DE]; TAMURA T) [A] 1-15 * figure 2; claim 1 *;
 [A]WO2010056158  (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE]; PERSSON FREDRIK F [SE]; HURD MAGNUS [SE]) [A] 1-15 * page 2, line 5 - page 3, line 3; figure 7; claim 1 *