Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2807976

EP2807976 - Hand-held direct digital image sensor device with protective cover [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  08.09.2017
Database last updated on 09.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip22.11.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MK
published on 25.12.2019 [2019/52]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Densmart Dental Co., Ltd.
2F., 40 Tszhu Road
Tashi Town
Taoyuan Hsien 33542 / TW
[2014/49]
Inventor(s)01 / Yao, Yin Chao
C/O DENSMART DENTAL CO., LTD.
40 Tszhu Rd., Tashi Town
33542 Taoyuan Hsien / TW
 [2014/49]
Representative(s)Chaillot, Geneviève
Cabinet Chaillot
16-20 Avenue de l'Agent Sarre
B.P. 74
92703 Colombes Cedex / FR
[N/P]
Former [2014/49]Chaillot, Geneviève
Cabinet Chaillot 16-20 Avenue de l'Agent Sarre B.P. 74
92703 Colombes Cedex / FR
Application number, filing date14162896.631.03.2014
[2014/49]
Priority number, dateTW2013011928831.05.2013         Original published format: TW 102119288
[2014/49]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2807976
Date:03.12.2014
Language:EN
[2014/49]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2807976
Date:02.11.2016
Language:EN
[2016/44]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP10.10.2014
ClassificationInternational:A61B6/14, A61B6/08
[2014/49]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/49]
TitleGerman:Tragbare direkte digitale Bildsensorvorrichtung mit Schutzhülle[2014/49]
English:Hand-held direct digital image sensor device with protective cover[2014/49]
French:Capteur d'image numérique direct manuel avec couvercle de protection de dispositif[2014/49]
Examination procedure31.03.2014Examination requested  [2014/49]
02.06.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
23.05.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
20.09.2016Fee for grant paid
20.09.2016Fee for publishing/printing paid
20.09.2016Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  23.05.2016
Opposition(s)03.08.2017No opposition filed within time limit [2017/41]
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.03.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU31.03.2014
AT02.11.2016
BE02.11.2016
CY02.11.2016
CZ02.11.2016
DK02.11.2016
EE02.11.2016
ES02.11.2016
FI02.11.2016
HR02.11.2016
LT02.11.2016
LV02.11.2016
MC02.11.2016
MK02.11.2016
NL02.11.2016
PL02.11.2016
RO02.11.2016
RS02.11.2016
SE02.11.2016
SI02.11.2016
SK02.11.2016
SM02.11.2016
BG02.02.2017
NO02.02.2017
GR03.02.2017
IS02.03.2017
PT02.03.2017
CH31.03.2017
IE31.03.2017
LI31.03.2017
LU31.03.2017
MT31.03.2017
[2019/52]
Former [2019/47]HU31.03.2014
AT02.11.2016
BE02.11.2016
CY02.11.2016
CZ02.11.2016
DK02.11.2016
EE02.11.2016
ES02.11.2016
FI02.11.2016
HR02.11.2016
LT02.11.2016
LV02.11.2016
MC02.11.2016
NL02.11.2016
PL02.11.2016
RO02.11.2016
RS02.11.2016
SE02.11.2016
SI02.11.2016
SK02.11.2016
SM02.11.2016
BG02.02.2017
NO02.02.2017
GR03.02.2017
IS02.03.2017
PT02.03.2017
CH31.03.2017
IE31.03.2017
LI31.03.2017
LU31.03.2017
MT31.03.2017
Former [2019/31]HU31.03.2014
AT02.11.2016
BE02.11.2016
CZ02.11.2016
DK02.11.2016
EE02.11.2016
ES02.11.2016
FI02.11.2016
HR02.11.2016
LT02.11.2016
LV02.11.2016
MC02.11.2016
NL02.11.2016
PL02.11.2016
RO02.11.2016
RS02.11.2016
SE02.11.2016
SI02.11.2016
SK02.11.2016
SM02.11.2016
BG02.02.2017
NO02.02.2017
GR03.02.2017
IS02.03.2017
PT02.03.2017
CH31.03.2017
IE31.03.2017
LI31.03.2017
LU31.03.2017
MT31.03.2017
Former [2018/43]AT02.11.2016
BE02.11.2016
CZ02.11.2016
DK02.11.2016
EE02.11.2016
ES02.11.2016
FI02.11.2016
HR02.11.2016
LT02.11.2016
LV02.11.2016
MC02.11.2016
NL02.11.2016
PL02.11.2016
RO02.11.2016
RS02.11.2016
SE02.11.2016
SI02.11.2016
SK02.11.2016
SM02.11.2016
BG02.02.2017
NO02.02.2017
GR03.02.2017
IS02.03.2017
PT02.03.2017
CH31.03.2017
IE31.03.2017
LI31.03.2017
LU31.03.2017
MT31.03.2017
Former [2018/13]AT02.11.2016
BE02.11.2016
CZ02.11.2016
DK02.11.2016
EE02.11.2016
ES02.11.2016
FI02.11.2016
HR02.11.2016
LT02.11.2016
LV02.11.2016
MC02.11.2016
NL02.11.2016
PL02.11.2016
RO02.11.2016
RS02.11.2016
SE02.11.2016
SI02.11.2016
SK02.11.2016
SM02.11.2016
BG02.02.2017
NO02.02.2017
GR03.02.2017
IS02.03.2017
PT02.03.2017
CH31.03.2017
IE31.03.2017
LI31.03.2017
LU31.03.2017
Former [2018/10]AT02.11.2016
BE02.11.2016
CZ02.11.2016
DK02.11.2016
EE02.11.2016
ES02.11.2016
FI02.11.2016
HR02.11.2016
LT02.11.2016
LV02.11.2016
MC02.11.2016
NL02.11.2016
PL02.11.2016
RO02.11.2016
RS02.11.2016
SE02.11.2016
SI02.11.2016
SK02.11.2016
SM02.11.2016
BG02.02.2017
NO02.02.2017
GR03.02.2017
IS02.03.2017
PT02.03.2017
LU31.03.2017
Former [2017/52]AT02.11.2016
BE02.11.2016
CZ02.11.2016
DK02.11.2016
EE02.11.2016
ES02.11.2016
FI02.11.2016
HR02.11.2016
LT02.11.2016
LV02.11.2016
MC02.11.2016
NL02.11.2016
PL02.11.2016
RO02.11.2016
RS02.11.2016
SE02.11.2016
SI02.11.2016
SK02.11.2016
SM02.11.2016
BG02.02.2017
NO02.02.2017
GR03.02.2017
IS02.03.2017
PT02.03.2017
Former [2017/38]AT02.11.2016
BE02.11.2016
CZ02.11.2016
DK02.11.2016
EE02.11.2016
ES02.11.2016
FI02.11.2016
HR02.11.2016
LT02.11.2016
LV02.11.2016
NL02.11.2016
PL02.11.2016
RO02.11.2016
RS02.11.2016
SE02.11.2016
SK02.11.2016
SM02.11.2016
BG02.02.2017
NO02.02.2017
GR03.02.2017
IS02.03.2017
PT02.03.2017
Former [2017/37]AT02.11.2016
BE02.11.2016
CZ02.11.2016
DK02.11.2016
EE02.11.2016
ES02.11.2016
FI02.11.2016
HR02.11.2016
LT02.11.2016
LV02.11.2016
NL02.11.2016
PL02.11.2016
RO02.11.2016
RS02.11.2016
SE02.11.2016
SK02.11.2016
SM02.11.2016
NO02.02.2017
GR03.02.2017
IS02.03.2017
PT02.03.2017
Former [2017/36]AT02.11.2016
BE02.11.2016
CZ02.11.2016
DK02.11.2016
EE02.11.2016
ES02.11.2016
FI02.11.2016
HR02.11.2016
LT02.11.2016
LV02.11.2016
NL02.11.2016
PL02.11.2016
RO02.11.2016
RS02.11.2016
SE02.11.2016
SK02.11.2016
NO02.02.2017
GR03.02.2017
IS02.03.2017
PT02.03.2017
Former [2017/35]AT02.11.2016
CZ02.11.2016
DK02.11.2016
EE02.11.2016
ES02.11.2016
FI02.11.2016
HR02.11.2016
LT02.11.2016
LV02.11.2016
NL02.11.2016
PL02.11.2016
RO02.11.2016
RS02.11.2016
SE02.11.2016
NO02.02.2017
GR03.02.2017
IS02.03.2017
PT02.03.2017
Former [2017/34]AT02.11.2016
CZ02.11.2016
DK02.11.2016
ES02.11.2016
FI02.11.2016
HR02.11.2016
LT02.11.2016
LV02.11.2016
NL02.11.2016
PL02.11.2016
RS02.11.2016
SE02.11.2016
NO02.02.2017
GR03.02.2017
IS02.03.2017
PT02.03.2017
Former [2017/33]AT02.11.2016
DK02.11.2016
ES02.11.2016
FI02.11.2016
HR02.11.2016
LT02.11.2016
LV02.11.2016
NL02.11.2016
PL02.11.2016
RS02.11.2016
SE02.11.2016
NO02.02.2017
GR03.02.2017
IS02.03.2017
PT02.03.2017
Former [2017/26]AT02.11.2016
ES02.11.2016
FI02.11.2016
HR02.11.2016
LT02.11.2016
LV02.11.2016
NL02.11.2016
PL02.11.2016
RS02.11.2016
SE02.11.2016
NO02.02.2017
GR03.02.2017
IS02.03.2017
PT02.03.2017
Former [2017/12]LV02.11.2016
Documents cited:Search[XAYI]US2013022175  (ABRAMOVICH MARK [US] ET AL) [X] 1 * (1),(7),(9),(11); paragraph [0035]; figures 5,1 * [A] 2-4,9 [Y] 5-8,10 [I] 6,7;
 [IAY]US5289522  (KANBAR MAURICE S [US] ET AL) [I] 1,6,7 * (27), (15), (12), (14), (13); column 5, lines 55-65; figures 1,3B * [A] 2-4,9 [Y] 5-8,10;
 [YA]WO0101196  (DENTSPLY INT INC [US]) [Y] 5 * figure 5 * [A] 2-4,9;
 [YA]US2011280378  (FELTZ KENT A [US] ET AL) [Y] 6 * figure 1 * [A] 2-4,9;
 [YA]US2013071809  (KIRKPATRICK STEVEN KENT [US] ET AL) [Y] 6 * paragraph [0039] * [A] 2-4,9;
 [YA]US4707847  (VAN AKEN JAN [NL]) [Y] 7 * column 2, lines 32-41; figures 1,7 * [A] 2-4,9;
 [YA]US2005013412  (CALDERWOOD MITCHELL C [US] ET AL) [Y] 8 * figures 4,5 * [A] 2-4,9;
 [YA]WO2005109094  (DIGITAL GRAPHIC PRODUCTIONS B [NL]; HOF RENE ALBERT [NL]; VAN LEEUWEN) [Y] 10 * (10); page 7, line 19; figure 1 * [A] 2-4,9;
 [A]US5799058  (WILLIS TIMOTHY G [US] ET AL) [A] 2-4 * figure 4 *