Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2787425

EP2787425 - OPTICAL DETECTION OF BENDING MOTIONS OF A FLEXIBLE DISPLAY [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2014/41]Optical detection of bending motions of a flexible display
[2017/11]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  08.06.2018
Database last updated on 19.10.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  30.06.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  15.02.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip05.04.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IE
published on 08.05.2019  [2019/19]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Samsung Display Co., Ltd.
17113, 1, Samsung-ro
Giheung-Gu
Yongin-si
Gyeonggi-do / KR
[2015/40]
Former [2014/41]For all designated states
Samsung Display Co., Ltd.
95, Samsung 2 Ro
Giheung-Gu
Yongin-City
Gyeonggi-Do / KR
Inventor(s)01 / Xiong, Wei
217 Devcon Drive
San Jose, CA 95112 / US
 [2014/41]
Representative(s)Mounteney, Simon James
Marks & Clerk LLP
15 Fetter Lane
London EC4A 1BW / GB
[N/P]
Former [2014/41]Mounteney, Simon James
Marks & Clerk LLP
90 Long Acre
London
WC2E 9RA / GB
Application number, filing date14163274.502.04.2014
[2014/41]
Priority number, dateUS201361807669P02.04.2013         Original published format: US 201361807669 P
US20141422966828.03.2014         Original published format: US201414229668
[2014/41]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2787425
Date:08.10.2014
Language:EN
[2014/41]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP2787425
Date:17.12.2014
Language:EN
[2014/51]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2787425
Date:02.08.2017
Language:EN
[2017/31]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP13.11.2014
ClassificationInternational:G06F3/0487, G06F1/16, G06F3/01, G06F3/03, H04M1/02, G02F1/1333
[2014/51]
Former International [2014/41]G06F3/0487, G06F1/16, G06F3/01, G06F3/03, H04M1/02
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/31]
Former [2014/41]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:OPTISCHE DETEKTION ZUM BIEGEN VON BEWEGUNGEN EINER FLEXIBLEN ANZEIGE[2017/11]
English:OPTICAL DETECTION OF BENDING MOTIONS OF A FLEXIBLE DISPLAY[2017/11]
French:DÉTECTION OPTIQUE DE MOUVEMENTS DE FLEXION D'UN AFFICHAGE FLEXIBLE[2017/11]
Former [2014/41]Optische Detektion zum Biegen von Bewegungen einer flexiblen Anzeige
Former [2014/41]Optical detection of bending motions of a flexible display
Former [2014/41]Détection optique de mouvements de flexion d'un affichage flexible
Examination procedure17.06.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
17.06.2015Examination requested  [2015/31]
09.02.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
20.06.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.07.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
19.09.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
16.02.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
23.06.2017Fee for grant paid
23.06.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
23.06.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Opposition(s)03.05.2018No opposition filed within time limit [2018/28]
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.04.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
10.04.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT02.08.2017
CZ02.08.2017
DK02.08.2017
EE02.08.2017
ES02.08.2017
FI02.08.2017
HR02.08.2017
IT02.08.2017
LT02.08.2017
LV02.08.2017
MC02.08.2017
NL02.08.2017
PL02.08.2017
RO02.08.2017
RS02.08.2017
SE02.08.2017
SI02.08.2017
SK02.08.2017
SM02.08.2017
BG02.11.2017
NO02.11.2017
GR03.11.2017
IS02.12.2017
IE02.04.2018
LU02.04.2018
BE30.04.2018
CH30.04.2018
LI30.04.2018
[2019/19]
Former [2019/12]AT02.08.2017
CZ02.08.2017
DK02.08.2017
EE02.08.2017
ES02.08.2017
FI02.08.2017
HR02.08.2017
IT02.08.2017
LT02.08.2017
LV02.08.2017
MC02.08.2017
NL02.08.2017
PL02.08.2017
RO02.08.2017
RS02.08.2017
SE02.08.2017
SI02.08.2017
SK02.08.2017
SM02.08.2017
BG02.11.2017
NO02.11.2017
GR03.11.2017
IS02.12.2017
LU02.04.2018
BE30.04.2018
CH30.04.2018
LI30.04.2018
Former [2019/08]AT02.08.2017
CZ02.08.2017
DK02.08.2017
EE02.08.2017
ES02.08.2017
FI02.08.2017
HR02.08.2017
IT02.08.2017
LT02.08.2017
LV02.08.2017
MC02.08.2017
NL02.08.2017
PL02.08.2017
RO02.08.2017
RS02.08.2017
SE02.08.2017
SI02.08.2017
SK02.08.2017
SM02.08.2017
BG02.11.2017
NO02.11.2017
GR03.11.2017
IS02.12.2017
LU02.04.2018
Former [2018/52]AT02.08.2017
CZ02.08.2017
DK02.08.2017
EE02.08.2017
ES02.08.2017
FI02.08.2017
HR02.08.2017
IT02.08.2017
LT02.08.2017
LV02.08.2017
MC02.08.2017
NL02.08.2017
PL02.08.2017
RO02.08.2017
RS02.08.2017
SE02.08.2017
SI02.08.2017
SK02.08.2017
SM02.08.2017
BG02.11.2017
NO02.11.2017
GR03.11.2017
IS02.12.2017
Former [2018/39]AT02.08.2017
CZ02.08.2017
DK02.08.2017
EE02.08.2017
ES02.08.2017
FI02.08.2017
HR02.08.2017
IT02.08.2017
LT02.08.2017
LV02.08.2017
NL02.08.2017
PL02.08.2017
RO02.08.2017
RS02.08.2017
SE02.08.2017
SI02.08.2017
SK02.08.2017
SM02.08.2017
BG02.11.2017
NO02.11.2017
GR03.11.2017
IS02.12.2017
Former [2018/24]AT02.08.2017
CZ02.08.2017
DK02.08.2017
EE02.08.2017
ES02.08.2017
FI02.08.2017
HR02.08.2017
IT02.08.2017
LT02.08.2017
LV02.08.2017
NL02.08.2017
PL02.08.2017
RO02.08.2017
RS02.08.2017
SE02.08.2017
SK02.08.2017
SM02.08.2017
BG02.11.2017
NO02.11.2017
GR03.11.2017
IS02.12.2017
Former [2018/23]AT02.08.2017
CZ02.08.2017
DK02.08.2017
EE02.08.2017
ES02.08.2017
FI02.08.2017
HR02.08.2017
LT02.08.2017
LV02.08.2017
NL02.08.2017
PL02.08.2017
RO02.08.2017
RS02.08.2017
SE02.08.2017
SK02.08.2017
BG02.11.2017
NO02.11.2017
GR03.11.2017
IS02.12.2017
Former [2018/21]AT02.08.2017
CZ02.08.2017
DK02.08.2017
ES02.08.2017
FI02.08.2017
HR02.08.2017
LT02.08.2017
LV02.08.2017
NL02.08.2017
PL02.08.2017
RS02.08.2017
SE02.08.2017
BG02.11.2017
NO02.11.2017
GR03.11.2017
IS02.12.2017
Former [2018/12]AT02.08.2017
ES02.08.2017
FI02.08.2017
HR02.08.2017
LT02.08.2017
LV02.08.2017
NL02.08.2017
PL02.08.2017
RS02.08.2017
SE02.08.2017
BG02.11.2017
NO02.11.2017
GR03.11.2017
IS02.12.2017
Former [2018/11]AT02.08.2017
ES02.08.2017
FI02.08.2017
HR02.08.2017
LT02.08.2017
NL02.08.2017
PL02.08.2017
RS02.08.2017
SE02.08.2017
BG02.11.2017
NO02.11.2017
GR03.11.2017
IS02.12.2017
Former [2018/10]AT02.08.2017
FI02.08.2017
HR02.08.2017
LT02.08.2017
NL02.08.2017
RS02.08.2017
SE02.08.2017
NO02.11.2017
Former [2018/09]FI02.08.2017
LT02.08.2017
NL02.08.2017
SE02.08.2017
NO02.11.2017
Former [2018/08]FI02.08.2017
LT02.08.2017
NL02.08.2017
NO02.11.2017
Former [2018/07]LT02.08.2017
NO02.11.2017
Documents cited:Search[I]US2012235893  (PHILLIPS W GARLAND [US] ET AL) [I] 1-9,11-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0013] * * paragraph [0015] - paragraph [0016] * * paragraph [0019] * * paragraph [0021] * * paragraph [0027] * * figures 1, 3, 4, 5, 6, 7A, 8 *;
 [I]US2007247422  (VERTEGAAL ROEL [CA] ET AL) [I] 1-8,11-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0071] - paragraph [0073]; figures 5, 11, 12, 13; claims 1-21 *;
 [I]US2012075166  (MARTI STEFAN [US] ET AL) [I] 1,11 * abstract * * paragraph [0008] - paragraph [0011] * * paragraph [0024] - paragraph [0046] * * figures 3, 4, 8, 9, 10 *;
 [I]EP2500894  (RESEARCH IN MOTION LTD [CA]) [I] 1,11 * abstract * * paragraph [0016] * * paragraph [0019] * * figures 4, 7A *;
 [A]US2012242687  (CHOI SUNGHA [KR]) [A] 3-7,12-15 * paragraph [0150] - paragraph [0152] *;
 [A]US2012092363  (KIM JAE MIN [KR] ET AL) [A] 1-9,11-15 * the whole document *
ExaminationEP2416292