Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2787412

EP2787412 - Receiver, mobile terminal device having the same, and method of manufacturing the mobile terminal device [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  24.08.2018
Database last updated on 21.10.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip03.05.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.
129, Samsung-ro
Yeongtong-gu
Suwon-si
Gyeonggi-do 443-742 / KR
[N/P]
Former [2014/41]For all designated states
Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd
129, Samsung-ro
Yeongtong-gu
Suwon-si
Gyeonggi-do 443-742 / KR
Inventor(s)01 / Lee, Sangho
C/O 129, Samsung-ro, Yeongtong-gu, Suwon-si
443-742 Gyeonggi-do / KR
 [2014/41]
Representative(s)Nederlandsch Octrooibureau
P.O. Box 29720
2502 LS The Hague / NL
[2014/41]
Application number, filing date14163408.903.04.2014
[2014/41]
Priority number, dateKR2013003694204.04.2013         Original published format: KR 20130036942
[2014/41]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2787412
Date:08.10.2014
Language:EN
[2014/41]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP2787412
Date:05.11.2014
[2014/45]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP02.10.2014
ClassificationInternational:G06F1/16, H04M1/03, H04R1/02, H04R1/06, // H04R9/10
[2014/45]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/24]
Former [2014/41]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:Empfänger, mobiles Endgerät damit und Verfahren zur Herstellung des mobilen Endgerätes[2014/41]
English:Receiver, mobile terminal device having the same, and method of manufacturing the mobile terminal device[2014/41]
French:Récepteur, terminal mobile ayant celui-ci, et procédé de fabrication du terminal mobile[2014/41]
Examination procedure01.05.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
01.05.2015Examination requested  [2015/24]
27.08.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
24.12.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.03.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
08.03.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
23.04.2018Renewal fee patent year 05
26.04.2019Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[Y]US2012106774  (SAIKI SHUJI [JP]) [Y] 1-15 * paragraphs [0001] - [0003] - [0059] - [0066] - [0095]; figures 1-3,6 *;
 [Y]US2002131615  (KOMIYAMA TAKEHIKO [JP] ET AL) [Y] 1-15 * paragraphs [0032] - [0038]; figures 1-3 *;
 [A]WO2011015236  (NOKIA CORP [FI]; KVIST PREBEN [DK]; LUNDIN CLAES [SE]) [A] 1-15 * column 2, line 19 - column 3, line 10 * * column 13, lines 5-9; figure 2 *;
 [A]US2006098838  (YOO OK-JUNG [KR]) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0001] , [0031] , [0032]; figure 2b *;
 [A]US2008037770  (EMMERT STEVE C [US]) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0002] , [0024] , [0029] , [0043] - [0045] - [0047] , [0070]; figures 1-3,9 *