Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2787412 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2787412



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 134
24.12.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
24.12.2018 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 4
24.12.2018 Claims Search / examination 2
24.12.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
24.12.2018 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
27.08.2018 Annex to the communication Search / examination 5
27.08.2018 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
20.08.2018 Examination started Search / examination 1
01.05.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
01.05.2015 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 2
01.05.2015 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 4
01.05.2015 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 3
01.05.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
10.11.2014 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
02.10.2014 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
02.10.2014 European search opinion Search / examination 6
02.10.2014 European search report Search / examination 2
11.09.2014 Search started Search / examination 1
10.09.2014 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 2
30.06.2014 Confirmation of receipt of (electronically) transmitted priority document Search / examination 1
05.06.2014 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 45
03.04.2014 Abstract Search / examination 1
03.04.2014 Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 2
03.04.2014 Claims Search / examination 4
03.04.2014 Description Search / examination 13
03.04.2014 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
03.04.2014 Drawings Search / examination 18
03.04.2014 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 5