Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2787412


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
03.05.2019 New entry: Renewal fee paid
04.01.2019 New entry: Reply to examination report
05.09.2018 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
24.08.2018 First examination report
25.04.2018 New entry: Renewal fee paid
11.03.2017 New entry: Renewal fee paid
14.03.2016 New entry: Renewal fee paid
08.05.2015 Change - designated states published on  10.06.2015  [2015/24]
08.05.2015 Change - request for examination published on  10.06.2015  [2015/24]
05.05.2015 Amendment by applicant
07.10.2014 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  08.10.2014  [2014/41]
03.10.2014 Publication of search report published on  05.11.2014  [2014/45]
03.10.2014 Change - classification published on  05.11.2014  [2014/45]
03.10.2014 Change - classification published on  05.11.2014  [2014/45]
05.09.2014 Request for examination filed published on  08.10.2014  [2014/41]