Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2787738

EP2787738 - Tile-based compression and decompression for graphic applications [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  27.10.2017
Database last updated on 22.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip06.05.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Vivante Corporation
268 Santa Ana Court
Sunnyvale, CA 94085 / US
[2014/41]
Inventor(s)01 / Zhong, Lefan
268 Santa Ana Court
Sunnyvale, CA California 94085 / US
02 / Theny, Halim
268 Santa Ana Court
Sunnyvale, CA California 94085 / US
03 / Zhang, Huiming
268 Santa Ana Court
Sunnyvale, 94085 / US
 [2014/41]
Representative(s)Betten & Resch
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB
Maximiliansplatz 14
80333 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2014/41]Betten & Resch
Theatinerstrasse 8
80333 München / DE
Application number, filing date14163416.203.04.2014
[2014/41]
Priority number, dateUS20131385638903.04.2013         Original published format: US201313856389
US20131391969117.06.2013         Original published format: US201313919691
[2014/41]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2787738
Date:08.10.2014
Language:EN
[2014/41]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP30.06.2014
ClassificationInternational:H04N19/88, G09G5/39, H04N19/91, G06T9/00, H03M7/40, // H04N19/593
[2014/41]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/21]
Former [2014/41]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:Mosaikbasierte Komprimierung und Dekomprimierung für graphische Anwendungen[2014/41]
English:Tile-based compression and decompression for graphic applications[2014/41]
French:Compression et décompression de pavés pour applications graphiques[2014/41]
Examination procedure08.04.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
08.04.2015Examination requested  [2015/21]
25.10.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
23.02.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.05.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
02.05.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
30.04.2018Renewal fee patent year 05
30.04.2019Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[XI]US7342590  (DANSKIN JOHN M [US], et al) [X] 1-3,5,8,13,15 * abstract * * column 3, line 18 - column 6, line 15 * [I] 4,6,7,9-12,14;
 [A]US7039241  (VAN HOOK TIMOTHY J [US]) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * column 2, line 62 - column 3, line 2 * * column 4, line 22 - line 62 * * column 6, line 1 - column 9, line 13 *;
 [A]US2009080788  (LYNCH WILLIAM C [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0004] * * paragraph [0036] - paragraph [0040] * * paragraph [0060] - paragraph [0069] *;
 [A]WO02071622  (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * page 1, line 16 - line 20 * * page 9, line 17 - page 10, line 6 * * page 11, line 5 - page 12, line 8 *;
 [A]US2012200575  (STRÖM JACOB [SE], et al) [A] 1,4,8,15 * abstract * * paragraph [0003] - paragraph [0005] * * paragraph [0048] - paragraph [0054] * * paragraph [0075] - paragraph [0077] *