Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2793315

EP2793315 - Electrical connector having resilient latches [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  13.10.2017
Database last updated on 11.11.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  03.01.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip13.10.2017Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 15.11.2017  [2017/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Tyco Electronics Services GmbH
Rheinstrasse 20
8200 Schaffhausen / CH
[2014/43]
Inventor(s)01 / Bianca, Giuseppe
45656 Caminito Olite
Temecula, CA California 92592 / US
 [2014/43]
Representative(s)Johnstone, Douglas Ian , et al
Baron Warren Redfern
1000 Great West Road
Brentford TW8 9DW / GB
[N/P]
Former [2014/43]Johnstone, Douglas Ian , et al
Baron Warren Redfern Cambridge House 100 Cambridge Grove Hammersmith London
W6 0LE / GB
Application number, filing date14163675.307.04.2014
[2014/43]
Priority number, dateUS20131386398716.04.2013         Original published format: US201313863987
[2014/43]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2793315
Date:22.10.2014
Language:EN
[2014/43]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP07.07.2014
ClassificationInternational:H01R13/436, H01R13/506, H01R13/622, // H01R13/52
[2014/43]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/21]
Former [2014/43]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:Elektrischer Verbinder mit elastischen Verriegelungsschaltungen[2014/43]
English:Electrical connector having resilient latches[2014/43]
French:Connecteur électrique ayant des verrous élastiques[2014/43]
Examination procedure08.04.2015Examination requested  [2015/21]
17.04.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
04.05.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
05.08.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.01.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
16.05.2017Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2017/46]
21.06.2017Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time  [2017/46]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.04.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.04.201704   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[XYI]US5503569  (HUSS JR JOHN P [US] ET AL) [X] 1,4,5,8-11 * column 2, line 50 - column 4, line 40; figures 1,2,4,8 * [Y] 6,7 [I] 2,3,12;
 [Y]US2011281454  (PHILLIPS DAVID A [US] ET AL) [Y] 6,7 * paragraph [0021] - paragraph [0024]; figures 1-3 *;
 [A]EP2418742  (TYCO ELECTRONICS AMP GMBH [DE]; TYCO ELECTRONICS AMP ITALIA S P A [IT]) [A] 1-12 * figures 1, 2, 14 *;
 [A]US7922535  (JIANG HONG-LIANG [TW] ET AL) [A] 1-12 * figure 2 *;
 [A]US2011237124  (FLAHERTY THOMAS E [US] ET AL) [A] 6,7 * figures 1,2 *