Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2754740

EP2754740 - Carbon particles provided with carbon nanotubes and/or nanofibres [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  26.08.2016
Database last updated on 19.10.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip17.08.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): BG
published on 19.09.2018  [2018/38]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
BASF Corporation
100 Park Avenue
Florham Park, NJ 07932 / US
[N/P]
Former [2014/29]For all designated states
BASF Corporation
100 Park Avenue
Florham Park, NJ 07932 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Hoekstra, Jacobus
c/o Strijkviertel 67
3454 PK De Meern / NL
02 / Geus, John Wilhelm
c/o Strijkviertel 67
3454 PK De Meern / NL
03 / Jenneskens, Leonardus Wijnand
c/o Strijkviertel 67
3454 PK De Meern / NL
 [2014/29]
Representative(s)V.O.
P.O. Box 87930
2508 DH Den Haag / NL
[N/P]
Former [2014/29]Jansen, Cornelis Marinus
V.O.
Johan de Wittlaan 7
2517 JR Den Haag / NL
Application number, filing date14163756.101.03.2010
[2014/29]
Priority number, dateEP2009015395827.02.2009         Original published format: EP 09153958
[2014/29]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2754740
Date:16.07.2014
Language:EN
[2014/29]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2754740
Date:21.10.2015
Language:EN
[2015/43]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP11.06.2014
ClassificationInternational:D01F9/127, D01F9/16, C01B31/02, B01J37/08, B01J21/18
[2014/29]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/43]
Former [2014/29]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:Mit Kohlenstoffnanofasern und/oder Kohlenstoffnanoröhrchen ausgerüstete Kohlenstoffteilchen[2015/25]
English:Carbon particles provided with carbon nanotubes and/or nanofibres[2014/29]
French:Particules de carbone dotées de nanofibres et/ou de nanotubes de carbone[2015/25]
Former [2014/29]Verfahren zur Herstellung von Kohlennanofasern und/oder Kohlennanoröhrchen
Former [2014/29]Procédé de production de nanofibres de carbone et/ou nanotubes de carbone
Examination procedure16.01.2015Examination requested  [2015/09]
10.06.2015Communication of intention to grant the patent
11.09.2015Fee for grant paid
11.09.2015Fee for publishing/printing paid
11.09.2015Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP10706795.1  / EP2401426
Opposition(s)22.07.2016No opposition filed within time limit [2016/39]
Fees paidRenewal fee
07.08.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
07.08.2014Renewal fee patent year 04
07.08.2014Renewal fee patent year 05
31.03.2015Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU01.03.2010
AT21.10.2015
BE21.10.2015
BG21.10.2015
CY21.10.2015
CZ21.10.2015
DK21.10.2015
EE21.10.2015
ES21.10.2015
FI21.10.2015
HR21.10.2015
LT21.10.2015
LV21.10.2015
MC21.10.2015
MK21.10.2015
PL21.10.2015
RO21.10.2015
SE21.10.2015
SI21.10.2015
SK21.10.2015
SM21.10.2015
TR21.10.2015
NO21.01.2016
GR22.01.2016
IS21.02.2016
PT22.02.2016
IE01.03.2016
LU01.03.2016
CH31.03.2016
LI31.03.2016
MT31.03.2016
[2018/38]
Former [2018/31]HU01.03.2010
AT21.10.2015
BE21.10.2015
CY21.10.2015
CZ21.10.2015
DK21.10.2015
EE21.10.2015
ES21.10.2015
FI21.10.2015
HR21.10.2015
LT21.10.2015
LV21.10.2015
MC21.10.2015
MK21.10.2015
PL21.10.2015
RO21.10.2015
SE21.10.2015
SI21.10.2015
SK21.10.2015
SM21.10.2015
TR21.10.2015
NO21.01.2016
GR22.01.2016
IS21.02.2016
PT22.02.2016
IE01.03.2016
LU01.03.2016
CH31.03.2016
LI31.03.2016
MT31.03.2016
Former [2018/29]HU01.03.2010
AT21.10.2015
BE21.10.2015
CY21.10.2015
CZ21.10.2015
DK21.10.2015
EE21.10.2015
ES21.10.2015
FI21.10.2015
HR21.10.2015
LT21.10.2015
LV21.10.2015
MC21.10.2015
MK21.10.2015
MT21.10.2015
PL21.10.2015
RO21.10.2015
SE21.10.2015
SI21.10.2015
SK21.10.2015
SM21.10.2015
TR21.10.2015
NO21.01.2016
GR22.01.2016
IS21.02.2016
PT22.02.2016
IE01.03.2016
LU01.03.2016
CH31.03.2016
LI31.03.2016
Former [2018/28]HU01.03.2010
AT21.10.2015
BE21.10.2015
CY21.10.2015
CZ21.10.2015
DK21.10.2015
EE21.10.2015
ES21.10.2015
FI21.10.2015
HR21.10.2015
LT21.10.2015
LV21.10.2015
MC21.10.2015
MK21.10.2015
MT21.10.2015
PL21.10.2015
RO21.10.2015
SE21.10.2015
SI21.10.2015
SK21.10.2015
SM21.10.2015
NO21.01.2016
GR22.01.2016
IS21.02.2016
PT22.02.2016
IE01.03.2016
LU01.03.2016
CH31.03.2016
LI31.03.2016
Former [2017/40]AT21.10.2015
BE21.10.2015
CZ21.10.2015
DK21.10.2015
EE21.10.2015
ES21.10.2015
FI21.10.2015
HR21.10.2015
LT21.10.2015
LV21.10.2015
MC21.10.2015
MT21.10.2015
PL21.10.2015
RO21.10.2015
SE21.10.2015
SI21.10.2015
SK21.10.2015
SM21.10.2015
NO21.01.2016
GR22.01.2016
IS21.02.2016
PT22.02.2016
IE01.03.2016
LU01.03.2016
CH31.03.2016
LI31.03.2016
Former [2017/07]AT21.10.2015
BE21.10.2015
CZ21.10.2015
DK21.10.2015
EE21.10.2015
ES21.10.2015
FI21.10.2015
HR21.10.2015
LT21.10.2015
LV21.10.2015
MC21.10.2015
PL21.10.2015
RO21.10.2015
SE21.10.2015
SI21.10.2015
SK21.10.2015
SM21.10.2015
NO21.01.2016
GR22.01.2016
IS21.02.2016
PT22.02.2016
IE01.03.2016
LU01.03.2016
CH31.03.2016
LI31.03.2016
Former [2017/03]AT21.10.2015
BE21.10.2015
CZ21.10.2015
DK21.10.2015
EE21.10.2015
ES21.10.2015
FI21.10.2015
HR21.10.2015
LT21.10.2015
LV21.10.2015
MC21.10.2015
PL21.10.2015
RO21.10.2015
SE21.10.2015
SI21.10.2015
SK21.10.2015
SM21.10.2015
NO21.01.2016
GR22.01.2016
IS21.02.2016
PT22.02.2016
LU01.03.2016
Former [2016/49]AT21.10.2015
CZ21.10.2015
DK21.10.2015
EE21.10.2015
ES21.10.2015
FI21.10.2015
HR21.10.2015
LT21.10.2015
LV21.10.2015
MC21.10.2015
PL21.10.2015
RO21.10.2015
SE21.10.2015
SI21.10.2015
SK21.10.2015
SM21.10.2015
NO21.01.2016
GR22.01.2016
IS21.02.2016
PT22.02.2016
LU01.03.2016
BE31.03.2016
Former [2016/47]AT21.10.2015
CZ21.10.2015
DK21.10.2015
EE21.10.2015
ES21.10.2015
FI21.10.2015
HR21.10.2015
LT21.10.2015
LV21.10.2015
PL21.10.2015
RO21.10.2015
SE21.10.2015
SK21.10.2015
SM21.10.2015
NO21.01.2016
GR22.01.2016
IS21.02.2016
PT22.02.2016
LU01.03.2016
BE31.03.2016
Former [2016/39]AT21.10.2015
CZ21.10.2015
DK21.10.2015
EE21.10.2015
ES21.10.2015
FI21.10.2015
HR21.10.2015
LT21.10.2015
LV21.10.2015
PL21.10.2015
RO21.10.2015
SE21.10.2015
SK21.10.2015
SM21.10.2015
NO21.01.2016
GR22.01.2016
IS21.02.2016
PT22.02.2016
BE31.03.2016
Former [2016/38]AT21.10.2015
CZ21.10.2015
EE21.10.2015
ES21.10.2015
FI21.10.2015
HR21.10.2015
LT21.10.2015
LV21.10.2015
PL21.10.2015
RO21.10.2015
SE21.10.2015
SK21.10.2015
SM21.10.2015
NO21.01.2016
GR22.01.2016
IS21.02.2016
PT22.02.2016
BE31.03.2016
Former [2016/36]AT21.10.2015
CZ21.10.2015
EE21.10.2015
ES21.10.2015
FI21.10.2015
HR21.10.2015
LT21.10.2015
LV21.10.2015
PL21.10.2015
RO21.10.2015
SE21.10.2015
SK21.10.2015
NO21.01.2016
GR22.01.2016
IS21.02.2016
PT22.02.2016
BE31.03.2016
Former [2016/34]AT21.10.2015
CZ21.10.2015
ES21.10.2015
FI21.10.2015
HR21.10.2015
LT21.10.2015
LV21.10.2015
PL21.10.2015
SE21.10.2015
NO21.01.2016
GR22.01.2016
IS21.02.2016
PT22.02.2016
Former [2016/25]AT21.10.2015
ES21.10.2015
FI21.10.2015
HR21.10.2015
LT21.10.2015
LV21.10.2015
PL21.10.2015
SE21.10.2015
NO21.01.2016
GR22.01.2016
IS21.02.2016
PT22.02.2016
Former [2016/24]AT21.10.2015
ES21.10.2015
FI21.10.2015
HR21.10.2015
LT21.10.2015
PL21.10.2015
SE21.10.2015
NO21.01.2016
GR22.01.2016
IS21.02.2016
PT22.02.2016
Former [2016/23]ES21.10.2015
HR21.10.2015
LT21.10.2015
SE21.10.2015
NO21.01.2016
IS21.02.2016
Former [2016/22]ES21.10.2015
LT21.10.2015
NO21.01.2016
IS21.02.2016
Former [2016/21]ES21.10.2015
LT21.10.2015
NO21.01.2016
Former [2016/20]ES21.10.2015
LT21.10.2015
Documents cited:Search[A]WO2008006902  (BIOECON INT HOLDING NV [NL], et al) [A] 1-5 * paragraph [0012] * * paragraph [0016] - paragraph [0019] * * claims 10,14-17,21 *;
 [A]GB1398417  (CARBORUNDUM CO) [A] 1-5 * page 2, line 31 - line 75 *;
 [A]GB1132782  (FMC CORP) [A] 1-5 * page 1, line 18 - line 25 * * examples IV-VI *;
 [A]WO2007131795  (GLATT SYSTEMTECHNIK GMBH [DE], et al) [A] 1-5 * example 5 *;
 [A]US2002064495  (MIURA MASAKATSU [JP], et al) [A] 1-5 * paragraph [0018] * * claim - *
 [A]  - XIANJIN CUI ET AL., "Structural Effetcs of Iron Oxide Nanoparticles and Iron Ions on the Hydrothermal Carbonization of Starch and Rice Carbohydrates", SMALL, WILEY VCH, WEINHEIM, DE, (20060601), vol. 2, no. 6, ISSN 1613-6810, pages 756 - 759, XP002542786 [A] 1-5 * figure 5 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/smll.200600047
by applicantWO9324214
 WO2005103348
    - BO HU; SHU-HONG YU; KAN WANG; LEI LIU; XUE-WEI XU, DALTON TRANS., (2008), pages 5414 - 5423
    - BITTER, J.H.; M.K. VAN DER LEE; A.G.T. SLOTBOOM; A.J. VAN DILLEN; K.P. DE JONG, CAT. LETT., (2003), vol. 89, pages 139 - 142