EP2796963 - Display control method and device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 29.03.2019 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 23.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.03.2019 | Refusal of application | published on 01.05.2019 [2019/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FUJITSU LIMITED 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | [2014/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Koga, Susumu c/o FUJITSU LIMITED 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa, 211-8588 / JP | [2014/44] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2014/44] | Application number, filing date | 14163837.9 | 08.04.2014 | [2014/44] | Priority number, date | JP20130089856 | 22.04.2013 Original published format: JP 2013089856 | [2014/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2796963 | Date: | 29.10.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.09.2014 | Classification | IPC: | G06F3/01, G06F3/0481 | [2014/44] | CPC: |
G06F3/011 (EP,US);
G09G5/377 (US);
G06F3/017 (EP,US);
G06F3/04815 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/44] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Anzeigesteuerverfahren und -Vorrichtung | [2014/44] | English: | Display control method and device | [2014/44] | French: | Procédé et dispositif de commande d'affichage | [2014/44] | Examination procedure | 26.02.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.02.2015 | Examination requested [2015/15] | 23.12.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.03.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.11.2018 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2019/18] | 22.11.2018 | Date of oral proceedings | 12.12.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2019/18] | 12.12.2018 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 05.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2008024392 (GUSTAFSSON TORBJORN [SE], et al) [X] 1-7,14,15 * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0007] * * paragraph [0036] - paragraph [0048] * [I] 8-13; | [XI] - TAPIO SALONEN ET AL, "Demonstration of assembly work using augmented reality", 6TH ACM INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON IMAGE AND VIDEO RETRIEVAL (CIVR 2007), New York, NY, USA, (20070709), doi:10.1145/1282280.1282301, ISBN 978-1-59-593733-9, pages 120 - 123, XP055136773 [X] 1-7,14,15 * section 2.1 - section 2.3, section 3 * [I] 8-13 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1145/1282280.1282301 | [A] - ROHS M, "Marker-Based Interaction Techniques for Camera-Phones", (20050101), pages 1 - 2, 2ND WORKSHOP ON MULTI-USER AND UBIQUITOUS USER INTERFACES (MU3I) AT IUI, SAN DIEGO, CALIFORNIA, USA, URL: http://www.vs.inf.ethz.ch/res/proj/visualcodes/rohs-mu3i-final.pdf, (20090701), XP002534869 [A] 9-13 * the whole document * | [A] - ROHS M, "Marker-Based Embodied Interaction for Handheld Augmented Reality Games", JOURNAL OF VIRTUAL REALITY AND BROADCASTING, (20070508), vol. 4, no. 5, ISSN 1860-2037, XP055136655 [A] 9-13 * Sections 3, 5, 7 * | [A] - GUN A. LEE ET AL, "Occlusion based interaction methods for tangible augmented reality environments", PROCEEDINGS OF THE 2004 ACM SIGGRAPH INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON VIRTUAL REALITY CONTINUUM AND ITS APPLICATIONS IN INDUSTRY, VRCAI '04, New York, New York, USA, (20040101), doi:10.1145/1044588.1044680, ISBN 978-1-58-113884-9, page 419, XP055005457 [A] 9-13 * section 1 - section 3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1145/1044588.1044680 | by applicant | JP2012215989 |