Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2798988

EP2798988 - Device for producing a milk foam [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  24.03.2017
Database last updated on 24.08.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip23.08.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): BG
published on 25.09.2019 [2019/39]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Melitta Professional Coffee Solutions GmbH & Co., KG
Zechenstrasse 60
32429 Minden / DE
[2015/02]
Former [2014/45]For all designated states
Melitta SystemService GmbH & Co., Kommanditgesellschaft
Zechenstrasse 60
32429 Minden-Dützen / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Buchholz, Bernd
Bössel 7
32369 Rahden / DE
02 / Diester, Thomas
Zu den Brücken 24d
31675 Bückeburg / DE
 [2014/45]
Representative(s)Specht, Peter , et al
Loesenbeck - Specht - Dantz
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Am Zwinger 2
33602 Bielefeld / DE
[2014/45]
Application number, filing date14164131.610.04.2014
[2014/45]
Priority number, dateDE20131010433829.04.2013         Original published format: DE102013104338
[2014/45]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2798988
Date:05.11.2014
Language:DE
[2014/45]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2798988
Date:18.05.2016
Language:DE
[2016/20]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP28.08.2014
ClassificationInternational:A47J31/44
[2014/45]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/20]
Former [2014/45]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:Vorrichtung zum Erzeugen eines Milchschaumes[2014/45]
English:Device for producing a milk foam[2014/45]
French:Dispositif de production d'une mousse de lait[2014/45]
Examination procedure16.01.2015Observations by third parties
05.03.2015Examination requested  [2015/16]
04.05.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
22.12.2015Communication of intention to grant the patent
30.03.2016Fee for grant paid
30.03.2016Fee for publishing/printing paid
30.03.2016Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Opposition(s)21.02.2017No opposition filed within time limit [2017/17]
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.03.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU10.04.2014
AL18.05.2016
BG18.05.2016
CZ18.05.2016
DK18.05.2016
EE18.05.2016
ES18.05.2016
FI18.05.2016
HR18.05.2016
IT18.05.2016
LT18.05.2016
LV18.05.2016
MC18.05.2016
MT18.05.2016
NL18.05.2016
PL18.05.2016
RO18.05.2016
RS18.05.2016
SE18.05.2016
SI18.05.2016
SK18.05.2016
SM18.05.2016
NO18.08.2016
GR19.08.2016
PT19.09.2016
[2019/39]
Former [2019/31]HU10.04.2014
AL18.05.2016
CZ18.05.2016
DK18.05.2016
EE18.05.2016
ES18.05.2016
FI18.05.2016
HR18.05.2016
IT18.05.2016
LT18.05.2016
LV18.05.2016
MC18.05.2016
MT18.05.2016
NL18.05.2016
PL18.05.2016
RO18.05.2016
RS18.05.2016
SE18.05.2016
SI18.05.2016
SK18.05.2016
SM18.05.2016
NO18.08.2016
GR19.08.2016
PT19.09.2016
Former [2018/46]AL18.05.2016
CZ18.05.2016
DK18.05.2016
EE18.05.2016
ES18.05.2016
FI18.05.2016
HR18.05.2016
IT18.05.2016
LT18.05.2016
LV18.05.2016
MC18.05.2016
MT18.05.2016
NL18.05.2016
PL18.05.2016
RO18.05.2016
RS18.05.2016
SE18.05.2016
SI18.05.2016
SK18.05.2016
SM18.05.2016
NO18.08.2016
GR19.08.2016
PT19.09.2016
Former [2018/43]CZ18.05.2016
DK18.05.2016
EE18.05.2016
ES18.05.2016
FI18.05.2016
HR18.05.2016
IT18.05.2016
LT18.05.2016
LV18.05.2016
MC18.05.2016
MT18.05.2016
NL18.05.2016
PL18.05.2016
RO18.05.2016
RS18.05.2016
SE18.05.2016
SI18.05.2016
SK18.05.2016
SM18.05.2016
NO18.08.2016
GR19.08.2016
PT19.09.2016
Former [2018/01]CZ18.05.2016
DK18.05.2016
EE18.05.2016
ES18.05.2016
FI18.05.2016
HR18.05.2016
IT18.05.2016
LT18.05.2016
LV18.05.2016
MC18.05.2016
NL18.05.2016
PL18.05.2016
RO18.05.2016
RS18.05.2016
SE18.05.2016
SI18.05.2016
SK18.05.2016
SM18.05.2016
NO18.08.2016
GR19.08.2016
PT19.09.2016
Former [2017/37]CZ18.05.2016
DK18.05.2016
EE18.05.2016
ES18.05.2016
FI18.05.2016
HR18.05.2016
IT18.05.2016
LT18.05.2016
LV18.05.2016
NL18.05.2016
PL18.05.2016
RO18.05.2016
RS18.05.2016
SE18.05.2016
SI18.05.2016
SK18.05.2016
SM18.05.2016
NO18.08.2016
GR19.08.2016
PT19.09.2016
Former [2017/11]CZ18.05.2016
DK18.05.2016
EE18.05.2016
ES18.05.2016
FI18.05.2016
HR18.05.2016
IT18.05.2016
LT18.05.2016
LV18.05.2016
NL18.05.2016
PL18.05.2016
RO18.05.2016
RS18.05.2016
SE18.05.2016
SK18.05.2016
SM18.05.2016
NO18.08.2016
GR19.08.2016
PT19.09.2016
Former [2017/10]CZ18.05.2016
DK18.05.2016
EE18.05.2016
ES18.05.2016
FI18.05.2016
HR18.05.2016
IT18.05.2016
LT18.05.2016
LV18.05.2016
NL18.05.2016
PL18.05.2016
RO18.05.2016
RS18.05.2016
SE18.05.2016
SK18.05.2016
NO18.08.2016
GR19.08.2016
PT19.09.2016
Former [2017/09]CZ18.05.2016
DK18.05.2016
EE18.05.2016
ES18.05.2016
FI18.05.2016
HR18.05.2016
IT18.05.2016
LT18.05.2016
LV18.05.2016
NL18.05.2016
RO18.05.2016
RS18.05.2016
SE18.05.2016
NO18.08.2016
GR19.08.2016
PT19.09.2016
Former [2017/07]DK18.05.2016
ES18.05.2016
FI18.05.2016
HR18.05.2016
IT18.05.2016
LT18.05.2016
LV18.05.2016
NL18.05.2016
RS18.05.2016
SE18.05.2016
NO18.08.2016
GR19.08.2016
PT19.09.2016
Former [2017/04]ES18.05.2016
FI18.05.2016
HR18.05.2016
IT18.05.2016
LT18.05.2016
LV18.05.2016
NL18.05.2016
RS18.05.2016
SE18.05.2016
NO18.08.2016
GR19.08.2016
PT19.09.2016
Former [2016/52]ES18.05.2016
FI18.05.2016
HR18.05.2016
LT18.05.2016
LV18.05.2016
NL18.05.2016
RS18.05.2016
SE18.05.2016
NO18.08.2016
GR19.08.2016
PT19.09.2016
Former [2016/51]ES18.05.2016
FI18.05.2016
HR18.05.2016
LT18.05.2016
LV18.05.2016
NL18.05.2016
RS18.05.2016
NO18.08.2016
GR19.08.2016
PT19.09.2016
Former [2016/50]ES18.05.2016
FI18.05.2016
HR18.05.2016
LT18.05.2016
LV18.05.2016
NL18.05.2016
RS18.05.2016
NO18.08.2016
Former [2016/49]FI18.05.2016
LT18.05.2016
NL18.05.2016
NO18.08.2016
Former [2016/46]LT18.05.2016
NO18.08.2016
Documents cited:Search[Y]EP2471423  (JURA ELEKTROAPPARATE AG [CH]) [Y] 1-15 * paragraphs [0029] , [0031]; figure 1 *;
 [Y]WO03086601  (EHRFELD MIKROTECHNIK AG [DE]; EHRFELD WOLFGANG [DE]; FREDENHAGEN ANDRE) [Y] 1-15 * the whole document *;
 [Y]DE4213895  (CROCIATI SANTE [IT]) [Y] 1-15 * column 3 *;
 [Y]EP2036472  (CAFINA AG [CH]) [Y] 1-15 * paragraph [0017] *
otherCH685597
 EP0600826
 DE2011566U