EP2790001 - Method for updating a pipe network plan [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.11.2015 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.11.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.12.2015 [2015/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Niss, Karin Kalkhüttenweg 9 23701 Eutin / DE | [2014/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
* * * | [2014/42] | Representative(s) | Lobemeier, Martin Landolf Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Holtenauer Strasse 57 24105 Kiel / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/42] | Lobemeier, Martin Landolf Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Niemannsweg 133 24105 Kiel / DE | Application number, filing date | 14164149.8 | 10.04.2014 | [2014/42] | Priority number, date | DE20131006222 | 11.04.2013 Original published format: DE102013006222 | [2014/42] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2790001 | Date: | 15.10.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/42] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2790001 | Date: | 07.01.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.12.2014 | Classification | IPC: | G01M3/18, G01M3/24, F17D5/06 | [2015/02] | CPC: |
G01M3/18 (EP);
F17D5/06 (EP);
G01M3/24 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2014/42] | G01M3/18, G01M3/24 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/42] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Aktualisieren eines Rohrnetzplanes | [2014/42] | English: | Method for updating a pipe network plan | [2014/42] | French: | Procédé d'actualisation d'un plan de réseau de conduites | [2014/42] | Examination procedure | 10.04.2014 | Examination requested [2014/42] | 08.07.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/52] | 05.08.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2015/52] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ID]DE19519650 (BRANDES BERND [DE]) [ID] 1,2 * abstract * * page 2, column 1, lines 30-57 * * page 3, column 3, lines 9-15, 44-50 *; | [A]GB2269717 (MIDWESCO INC [US]) [A] 1,2 * abstract * * page 1, lines 17-28; figures 1, 2 * | by applicant | DE19519650 |