blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP2930351

EP2930351 - A method for applying a coating to a surface of wind turbine blade [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  11.11.2016
Database last updated on 15.06.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip11.11.2016Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 14.12.2016  [2016/50]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
LM WP Patent Holding A/S
Jupitervej 6
6000 Kolding / DK
[2015/42]
Inventor(s)01 / Haag, Michael Drachmann
Søndre Fovrfeldvej 1B
6710 Esbjerg / DK
02 / Dahl, Martin
Frösleeweg 3B
24939 Flensburg / DE
03 / Rebollo, Lorenzo Réal
Jupitervej 6
6000 Kolding / DK
 [2015/42]
Representative(s)Hussey, Paul Anthony
LM Wind Power A/S
Jupitervej 6
6000 Kolding / DK
[2015/42]
Application number, filing date14164237.110.04.2014
[2015/42]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2930351
Date:14.10.2015
Language:EN
[2015/42]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP24.09.2014
ClassificationIPC:F03D1/06
[2015/42]
CPC:
F03D1/0675 (EP); F05B2230/31 (EP); F05B2230/90 (EP);
Y02E10/72 (EP); Y02P70/50 (EP)
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/42]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Aufbringung einer Beschichtung auf eine Oberfläche eines Windturbinenblatts[2015/42]
English:A method for applying a coating to a surface of wind turbine blade[2015/42]
French:Procédé pour appliquer un revêtement sur une surface d'aube d'éolienne[2015/42]
Examination procedure15.04.2016Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2016/50]
14.06.2016Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2016/50]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.04.201603   M06   Not yet paid
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[XI]US2011243751  (FRITZ PETER JAMES [US], et al) [X] 14,15 * figure 5 * * paragraphs [0031] , [0034] * [I] 1-10;
 [XY]US2013101417  (CLONINGER II JOEL RUSSELL [US], et al) [X] 14,15 * figures 3, 5 * * paragraphs [0025] , [0028] , [0034] , [0035] * [Y] 1-13;
 [Y]WO2012031602  (VESTAS WIND SYS AS [DK], et al) [Y] 1-13 * figures 3, 8E, 11-13 * * paragraphs [0039] - [0049] - [0061] *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.