Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2800065

EP2800065 - Method for creating a label, computer program product and system for carrying out the method [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  16.03.2018
Database last updated on 19.10.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  07.04.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  01.12.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip18.10.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CY
published on 20.11.2019 [2019/47]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Deutsche Post AG
Charles-de-Gaulle-Strasse 20
53113 Bonn / DE
[2014/45]
Inventor(s)01 / Endruscheit, Henning
Herderstr. 13
52399 Merzenich / DE
02 / Klös, Volker
Auf der Beun 1
35428 Langgons / DE
03 / Ogilvie, Thomas
Bodenstaffstr. 7
53179 Bonn / DE
04 / Mayer, Boris
Oberer Lindweg 83
53129 Bonn / DE
 [2014/45]
Representative(s)Jostarndt Patentanwalts-AG
Philipsstrasse 8
52068 Aachen / DE
[2017/19]
Former [2014/45]Raasch, Detlef
Jostarndt Patentanwalts-AG
Brüsseler Ring 51
52074 Aachen / DE
Application number, filing date14164250.427.10.2006
[2014/45]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2800065
Date:05.11.2014
Language:DE
[2014/45]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2800065
Date:10.05.2017
Language:DE
[2017/19]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP06.10.2014
ClassificationInternational:G07B17/00
[2014/45]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2015/25]
Former [2014/45]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  NL,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:Verfahren zum Erzeugen eines Labels, Computerprogrammprodukt und System zur Durchführung des Verfahrens[2014/45]
English:Method for creating a label, computer program product and system for carrying out the method[2014/45]
French:Procédé destiné à la production d'une étiquette, produit de programme informatique et système destiné à l'exécution du procédé[2016/47]
Former [2014/45]Procédé destiné à la production d'une étiquette, d'un produit de programme informatique et système destiné à l'exécution du procédé
Examination procedure04.05.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
06.05.2015Examination requested  [2015/25]
14.09.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
14.01.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
07.04.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
01.08.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
02.12.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
31.03.2017Fee for grant paid
31.03.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
31.03.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP06022477.1  / EP1916627
Opposition(s)13.02.2018No opposition filed within time limit [2018/16]
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.08.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
11.08.2014Renewal fee patent year 04
11.08.2014Renewal fee patent year 05
11.08.2014Renewal fee patent year 06
11.08.2014Renewal fee patent year 07
11.08.2014Renewal fee patent year 08
31.10.2014Renewal fee patent year 09
02.11.2015Renewal fee patent year 10
31.10.2016Renewal fee patent year 11
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU27.10.2006
CY10.05.2017
CZ10.05.2017
DK10.05.2017
EE10.05.2017
ES10.05.2017
FI10.05.2017
IT10.05.2017
LT10.05.2017
LV10.05.2017
MC10.05.2017
NL10.05.2017
PL10.05.2017
RO10.05.2017
SE10.05.2017
SI10.05.2017
SK10.05.2017
BG10.08.2017
GR11.08.2017
IS10.09.2017
AT27.10.2017
IE27.10.2017
LU27.10.2017
BE31.10.2017
CH31.10.2017
LI31.10.2017
[2019/47]
Former [2019/31]HU27.10.2006
CZ10.05.2017
DK10.05.2017
EE10.05.2017
ES10.05.2017
FI10.05.2017
IT10.05.2017
LT10.05.2017
LV10.05.2017
MC10.05.2017
NL10.05.2017
PL10.05.2017
RO10.05.2017
SE10.05.2017
SI10.05.2017
SK10.05.2017
BG10.08.2017
GR11.08.2017
IS10.09.2017
AT27.10.2017
IE27.10.2017
LU27.10.2017
BE31.10.2017
CH31.10.2017
LI31.10.2017
Former [2019/10]CZ10.05.2017
DK10.05.2017
EE10.05.2017
ES10.05.2017
FI10.05.2017
IT10.05.2017
LT10.05.2017
LV10.05.2017
MC10.05.2017
NL10.05.2017
PL10.05.2017
RO10.05.2017
SE10.05.2017
SI10.05.2017
SK10.05.2017
BG10.08.2017
GR11.08.2017
IS10.09.2017
AT27.10.2017
IE27.10.2017
LU27.10.2017
BE31.10.2017
CH31.10.2017
LI31.10.2017
Former [2018/45]CZ10.05.2017
DK10.05.2017
EE10.05.2017
ES10.05.2017
FI10.05.2017
IT10.05.2017
LT10.05.2017
LV10.05.2017
MC10.05.2017
NL10.05.2017
PL10.05.2017
RO10.05.2017
SE10.05.2017
SI10.05.2017
SK10.05.2017
BG10.08.2017
GR11.08.2017
IS10.09.2017
IE27.10.2017
LU27.10.2017
BE31.10.2017
CH31.10.2017
LI31.10.2017
Former [2018/36]CZ10.05.2017
DK10.05.2017
EE10.05.2017
ES10.05.2017
FI10.05.2017
IT10.05.2017
LT10.05.2017
LV10.05.2017
MC10.05.2017
NL10.05.2017
PL10.05.2017
RO10.05.2017
SE10.05.2017
SI10.05.2017
SK10.05.2017
BG10.08.2017
GR11.08.2017
IS10.09.2017
LU27.10.2017
BE31.10.2017
CH31.10.2017
LI31.10.2017
Former [2018/29]CZ10.05.2017
DK10.05.2017
EE10.05.2017
ES10.05.2017
FI10.05.2017
IT10.05.2017
LT10.05.2017
LV10.05.2017
MC10.05.2017
NL10.05.2017
PL10.05.2017
RO10.05.2017
SE10.05.2017
SI10.05.2017
SK10.05.2017
BG10.08.2017
GR11.08.2017
IS10.09.2017
Former [2018/25]CZ10.05.2017
DK10.05.2017
EE10.05.2017
ES10.05.2017
FI10.05.2017
IT10.05.2017
LT10.05.2017
LV10.05.2017
NL10.05.2017
PL10.05.2017
RO10.05.2017
SE10.05.2017
SI10.05.2017
SK10.05.2017
BG10.08.2017
GR11.08.2017
IS10.09.2017
Former [2018/11]CZ10.05.2017
DK10.05.2017
EE10.05.2017
ES10.05.2017
FI10.05.2017
IT10.05.2017
LT10.05.2017
LV10.05.2017
NL10.05.2017
PL10.05.2017
RO10.05.2017
SE10.05.2017
SK10.05.2017
BG10.08.2017
GR11.08.2017
IS10.09.2017
Former [2018/10]CZ10.05.2017
DK10.05.2017
EE10.05.2017
ES10.05.2017
FI10.05.2017
LT10.05.2017
LV10.05.2017
NL10.05.2017
PL10.05.2017
RO10.05.2017
SE10.05.2017
SK10.05.2017
BG10.08.2017
GR11.08.2017
IS10.09.2017
Former [2018/09]DK10.05.2017
EE10.05.2017
ES10.05.2017
FI10.05.2017
LT10.05.2017
LV10.05.2017
NL10.05.2017
PL10.05.2017
SE10.05.2017
BG10.08.2017
GR11.08.2017
IS10.09.2017
Former [2017/52]ES10.05.2017
FI10.05.2017
LT10.05.2017
LV10.05.2017
NL10.05.2017
PL10.05.2017
SE10.05.2017
BG10.08.2017
GR11.08.2017
IS10.09.2017
Former [2017/50]ES10.05.2017
FI10.05.2017
LT10.05.2017
LV10.05.2017
PL10.05.2017
SE10.05.2017
BG10.08.2017
GR11.08.2017
IS10.09.2017
Former [2017/49]ES10.05.2017
FI10.05.2017
LT10.05.2017
GR11.08.2017
IS10.09.2017
Documents cited:Search[X]DE102004046051  (DEUTSCHE POST AG [DE]) [X] 1-10 * abstract * * paragraph [0043] - paragraph [0088] *;
 [X]WO0135346  (NEOPOST INC [US]; LEON J P [US]; BROWN L CARLTON JR [US]) [X] 1-10 * abstract * * page 9, line 21 - page 12, line 30 * * page 16, line 22 - page 19, line 20 * * page 37, line 16 - page 45, line 19 *;
 [X]WO2005029265  (PITNEY BOWES [US]) [X] 1-10 * abstract * * paragraph [0027] - paragraph [0035] * * paragraph [0077] *;
 [A]US2002023057  (GOODWIN JOHNATHAN DAVID [US] ET AL) [A] 1,7,9,10 * figures 6, 27 * * paragraph [0101] *;
 [A]US2003172354  (MARTINEZ PONCE RAFAEL ANTONIO [MX]) [A] 1,9,10 * abstract *