Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2800065 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2800065



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 681
16.03.2018 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
11.05.2017 Transmission of the certificate Search / examination 1
13.04.2017 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
31.03.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
31.03.2017 English translation of the claims Search / examination 5
31.03.2017 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
31.03.2017 French translation of claims Search / examination 5
31.03.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
02.12.2016 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
02.12.2016 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
02.12.2016 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
02.12.2016 Text intended for grant Search / examination 143
02.12.2016 Text intended for grant (clean copy) Search / examination 142
01.08.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
01.08.2016 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 7
01.08.2016 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 27
01.08.2016 Claims Search / examination 5
01.08.2016 Description Search / examination 27
01.08.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
01.08.2016 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 5
01.07.2016 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
17.06.2016 Request for change of applicant's representative Search / examination 1
16.06.2016 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
07.04.2016 Annex to the communication Search / examination 6
07.04.2016 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
14.01.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
14.01.2016 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 7
14.01.2016 Claims Search / examination 5
14.01.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
14.01.2016 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 7
14.09.2015 Annex to the communication Search / examination 4
14.09.2015 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
02.09.2015 Examination started Search / examination 1
04.05.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
04.05.2015 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 5
04.05.2015 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 5
04.05.2015 Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 3
04.05.2015 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 3
04.05.2015 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 9
04.05.2015 Citation for the examination procedure Search / examination 1
04.05.2015 Citation for the examination procedure Search / examination 1
04.05.2015 Citation for the examination procedure Search / examination 10
04.05.2015 Citation for the examination procedure Search / examination 38
04.05.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
12.11.2014 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
10.11.2014 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
08.10.2014 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 2
06.10.2014 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
06.10.2014 European search opinion Search / examination 6
06.10.2014 European search report Search / examination 2
26.09.2014 Modified abstract Search / examination 1
05.09.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
05.09.2014 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
05.09.2014 Letter concerning the inventor Search / examination 1
20.08.2014 Search started Search / examination 1
19.08.2014 Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor Search / examination 1
24.07.2014 Letter which had not been notified Search / examination 2
10.04.2014 Abstract Search / examination 1
10.04.2014 Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 2
10.04.2014 Claims Search / examination 4
10.04.2014 Description Search / examination 135
10.04.2014 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
10.04.2014 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
10.04.2014 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
10.04.2014 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
10.04.2014 Drawings Search / examination 5
10.04.2014 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 5