Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2800065


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
18.10.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  20.11.2019 [2019/47]
28.06.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  31.07.2019  [2019/31]
01.02.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  06.03.2019  [2019/10]
05.10.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  07.11.2018  [2018/45]
24.08.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  26.09.2018  [2018/39]
03.08.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  05.09.2018  [2018/36]
15.06.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  18.07.2018  [2018/29]
18.05.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  20.06.2018  [2018/25]
16.03.2018 No opposition filed within time limit published on  18.04.2018  [2018/16]
09.03.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  11.04.2018  [2018/15]
09.02.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  14.03.2018  [2018/11]
02.02.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  07.03.2018  [2018/10]
26.01.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  28.02.2018  [2018/09]
08.12.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  10.01.2018  [2018/02]
01.12.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  03.01.2018  [2018/01]
24.11.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  27.12.2017  [2017/52]
17.11.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  20.12.2017  [2017/51]
10.11.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  13.12.2017  [2017/50]
03.11.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  06.12.2017  [2017/49]
07.04.2017 (Expected) grant published on  10.05.2017  [2017/19]
04.04.2017 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
04.04.2017 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
03.04.2017 New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
01.12.2016 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
04.11.2016 New entry: Renewal fee paid
21.10.2016 Change - French title published on  23.11.2016  [2016/47]
29.08.2016 New entry: Reply to examination report
28.06.2016 Change - representative
18.04.2016 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
30.01.2016 New entry: Reply to examination report
04.11.2015 New entry: Renewal fee paid
24.09.2015 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
11.09.2015 First examination report
27.05.2015 Amendment by applicant
15.05.2015 Change - designated states published on  17.06.2015  [2015/25]
15.05.2015 Change - request for examination published on  17.06.2015  [2015/25]
06.11.2014 New entry: Renewal fee paid
04.11.2014 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  05.11.2014  [2014/45]
03.10.2014 Request for examination filed published on  05.11.2014  [2014/45]
14.08.2014 New entry: Renewal fee paid