Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2790080

EP2790080 - Device and method for controlled removal of beads of viscous fluids [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  20.10.2017
Database last updated on 16.10.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  11.11.2016
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  04.11.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip28.06.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): HU
published on 31.07.2019  [2019/31]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Fives Filling & Sealing
17, Rue de la Communauté
Parc d'activités de la Forêt
44140 Le Bignon / FR
[2015/17]
Former [2014/42]For all designated states
CINETIC FILLING
Parc d'Activités de la Forêt
17 Rue de la communauté
44140 Le Bignon / FR
Inventor(s)01 / Paud, Pascal
Les Landes - La Barre Peinte
44850 Le Cellier / FR
02 / Toutain, Nicolas
17, rue du Pre long
44 760 Les Moutiers en Retz / FR
 [2014/42]
Representative(s)Lavoix
2, place d'Estienne d'Orves
75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR
[2016/50]
Former [2014/42]Blot, Philippe Robert Emile
Cabinet Lavoix
2, place d'Estienne d'Orves
75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR
Application number, filing date14164295.910.04.2014
[2014/42]
Priority number, dateFR2013005329411.04.2013         Original published format: FR 1353294
[2014/42]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2790080
Date:15.10.2014
Language:FR
[2014/42]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2790080
Date:14.12.2016
Language:FR
[2016/50]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP29.08.2014
ClassificationInternational:G05D11/13, B05C17/01, B05C11/00, // B05C11/10
[2016/31]
Former International [2014/42]G05D11/13, B05C17/01
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/50]
Former [2014/42]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:Vorrichtung und Verfahren zum kontrollierten Entfernen von Rändern aus dickflüssigen Fluiden[2014/42]
English:Device and method for controlled removal of beads of viscous fluids[2014/42]
French:Dispositif et procédé de dépose contrôlée de cordons de fluides visqueux[2014/42]
Examination procedure20.01.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
18.02.2015Examination requested  [2015/14]
14.07.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
03.11.2016Fee for grant paid
03.11.2016Fee for publishing/printing paid
03.11.2016Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Opposition(s)15.09.2017No opposition filed within time limit [2017/47]
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.04.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU10.04.2014
AT14.12.2016
CZ14.12.2016
DK14.12.2016
EE14.12.2016
ES14.12.2016
FI14.12.2016
HR14.12.2016
IT14.12.2016
LT14.12.2016
LV14.12.2016
MC14.12.2016
MT14.12.2016
NL14.12.2016
PL14.12.2016
RO14.12.2016
RS14.12.2016
SE14.12.2016
SI14.12.2016
SK14.12.2016
SM14.12.2016
BG14.03.2017
NO14.03.2017
GR15.03.2017
IE10.04.2017
LU10.04.2017
IS14.04.2017
PT14.04.2017
BE30.04.2017
CH30.04.2017
LI30.04.2017
[2019/31]
Former [2018/43]AT14.12.2016
CZ14.12.2016
DK14.12.2016
EE14.12.2016
ES14.12.2016
FI14.12.2016
HR14.12.2016
IT14.12.2016
LT14.12.2016
LV14.12.2016
MC14.12.2016
MT14.12.2016
NL14.12.2016
PL14.12.2016
RO14.12.2016
RS14.12.2016
SE14.12.2016
SI14.12.2016
SK14.12.2016
SM14.12.2016
BG14.03.2017
NO14.03.2017
GR15.03.2017
IE10.04.2017
LU10.04.2017
IS14.04.2017
PT14.04.2017
BE30.04.2017
CH30.04.2017
LI30.04.2017
Former [2018/23]AT14.12.2016
CZ14.12.2016
DK14.12.2016
EE14.12.2016
ES14.12.2016
FI14.12.2016
HR14.12.2016
IT14.12.2016
LT14.12.2016
LV14.12.2016
MC14.12.2016
NL14.12.2016
PL14.12.2016
RO14.12.2016
RS14.12.2016
SE14.12.2016
SI14.12.2016
SK14.12.2016
SM14.12.2016
BG14.03.2017
NO14.03.2017
GR15.03.2017
IE10.04.2017
LU10.04.2017
IS14.04.2017
PT14.04.2017
BE30.04.2017
CH30.04.2017
LI30.04.2017
Former [2018/14]AT14.12.2016
CZ14.12.2016
DK14.12.2016
EE14.12.2016
ES14.12.2016
FI14.12.2016
HR14.12.2016
IT14.12.2016
LT14.12.2016
LV14.12.2016
MC14.12.2016
NL14.12.2016
PL14.12.2016
RO14.12.2016
RS14.12.2016
SE14.12.2016
SI14.12.2016
SK14.12.2016
SM14.12.2016
BG14.03.2017
NO14.03.2017
GR15.03.2017
LU10.04.2017
IS14.04.2017
PT14.04.2017
CH30.04.2017
LI30.04.2017
Former [2018/06]AT14.12.2016
CZ14.12.2016
DK14.12.2016
EE14.12.2016
ES14.12.2016
FI14.12.2016
HR14.12.2016
IT14.12.2016
LT14.12.2016
LV14.12.2016
MC14.12.2016
NL14.12.2016
PL14.12.2016
RO14.12.2016
RS14.12.2016
SE14.12.2016
SK14.12.2016
SM14.12.2016
BG14.03.2017
NO14.03.2017
GR15.03.2017
IS14.04.2017
PT14.04.2017
Former [2018/01]AT14.12.2016
CZ14.12.2016
DK14.12.2016
EE14.12.2016
ES14.12.2016
FI14.12.2016
HR14.12.2016
IT14.12.2016
LT14.12.2016
LV14.12.2016
NL14.12.2016
PL14.12.2016
RO14.12.2016
RS14.12.2016
SE14.12.2016
SK14.12.2016
SM14.12.2016
BG14.03.2017
NO14.03.2017
GR15.03.2017
IS14.04.2017
PT14.04.2017
Former [2017/41]AT14.12.2016
CZ14.12.2016
EE14.12.2016
ES14.12.2016
FI14.12.2016
HR14.12.2016
IT14.12.2016
LT14.12.2016
LV14.12.2016
NL14.12.2016
PL14.12.2016
RO14.12.2016
RS14.12.2016
SE14.12.2016
SK14.12.2016
SM14.12.2016
BG14.03.2017
NO14.03.2017
GR15.03.2017
IS14.04.2017
PT14.04.2017
Former [2017/36]CZ14.12.2016
EE14.12.2016
ES14.12.2016
FI14.12.2016
HR14.12.2016
LT14.12.2016
LV14.12.2016
NL14.12.2016
PL14.12.2016
RO14.12.2016
RS14.12.2016
SE14.12.2016
SK14.12.2016
NO14.03.2017
GR15.03.2017
IS14.04.2017
Former [2017/34]CZ14.12.2016
FI14.12.2016
HR14.12.2016
LT14.12.2016
LV14.12.2016
NL14.12.2016
RS14.12.2016
SE14.12.2016
NO14.03.2017
GR15.03.2017
Former [2017/31]FI14.12.2016
HR14.12.2016
LT14.12.2016
LV14.12.2016
NL14.12.2016
RS14.12.2016
SE14.12.2016
NO14.03.2017
GR15.03.2017
Former [2017/28]FI14.12.2016
HR14.12.2016
LT14.12.2016
LV14.12.2016
RS14.12.2016
SE14.12.2016
NO14.03.2017
GR15.03.2017
Former [2017/12]LV14.12.2016
Documents cited:Search[XAY]WO0140737  (GRACO MINNESOTA INC [US]; WERNER NEAL [US]) [X] 1,8 * the whole document * [A] 5-7,12,13 [Y] 2-4,9-11;
 [YA]DE19735622  (LENHARDT MASCHINENBAU [DE]) [Y] 2-4,9-11 * the whole document * [A] 5-7,12,13;
 [YA]FR2878911  (EXEL IND SA [FR]) [Y] 2-4,9-11 * the whole document * [A] 5-7,12,13;
 [YA]FR2597025  (SKM SA [FR]) [Y] 2-4,9-11 * the whole document * [A] 5-7,12,13;
 [YA]WO2008112423  (APPLIED MATERIALS INC [US]; MELCER CHRIS [US]; LANE JOHN [US]) [Y] 2-4,9-11 * the whole document * [A] 5-7,12,13