Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2796815

EP2796815 - Refrigerator and operating method thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  30.08.2019
Database last updated on 19.10.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  21.09.2018
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  08.05.2018
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  20.03.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip30.08.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): SK
published on 02.10.2019  [2019/40]
30.08.2019No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 02.10.2019  [2019/40]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
LG Electronics Inc.
128, Yeoui-daero, Yeongdeungpo-gu
Seoul, 07336 / KR
[2018/28]
Former [2014/44]For all designated states
LG Electronics, Inc.
128, Yeoui-daero
Yeongdeungpo-gu
Seoul 150-721 / KR
Inventor(s)01 / KIM, Kwanhyung
c/o LG Electronics Inc.
19, Yangjae-daero 11gil, Seocho-gu
137-893 Seoul / KR
 [2014/44]
Representative(s)Ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner
Patentanwälte mbB
Nymphenburger Straße 4
80335 München / DE
[2018/43]
Former [2014/44]Urner, Peter
Ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner
Mauerkircherstrasse 45
81679 München / DE
Application number, filing date14164934.316.04.2014
[2014/44]
Priority number, dateKR2013004452823.04.2013         Original published format: KR 20130044528
[2014/44]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2796815
Date:29.10.2014
Language:EN
[2014/44]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2796815
Date:24.10.2018
Language:EN
[2018/43]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP02.09.2014
ClassificationInternational:F25D29/00
[2014/44]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2018/43]
Former [2014/44]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:Kühlschrank und Betriebsverfahren dafür[2014/44]
English:Refrigerator and operating method thereof[2014/44]
French:Réfrigérateur et son procédé de fonctionnement[2014/44]
Examination procedure24.02.2015Examination requested  [2015/14]
27.04.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
17.03.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
19.07.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
09.05.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
11.09.2018Fee for grant paid
11.09.2018Fee for publishing/printing paid
11.09.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Opposition(s)25.07.2019No opposition filed within time limit [2019/40]
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.03.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
21.04.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
23.04.2018Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL24.10.2018
AT24.10.2018
CZ24.10.2018
DK24.10.2018
EE24.10.2018
ES24.10.2018
FI24.10.2018
HR24.10.2018
IT24.10.2018
LT24.10.2018
LV24.10.2018
NL24.10.2018
PL24.10.2018
RO24.10.2018
RS24.10.2018
SE24.10.2018
SK24.10.2018
SM24.10.2018
BG24.01.2019
NO24.01.2019
GR25.01.2019
IS24.02.2019
PT24.02.2019
[2019/40]
Former [2019/37]AL24.10.2018
AT24.10.2018
CZ24.10.2018
DK24.10.2018
EE24.10.2018
ES24.10.2018
FI24.10.2018
HR24.10.2018
IT24.10.2018
LT24.10.2018
LV24.10.2018
NL24.10.2018
PL24.10.2018
RO24.10.2018
RS24.10.2018
SE24.10.2018
SM24.10.2018
BG24.01.2019
NO24.01.2019
GR25.01.2019
IS24.02.2019
PT24.02.2019
Former [2019/35]AL24.10.2018
AT24.10.2018
CZ24.10.2018
DK24.10.2018
ES24.10.2018
FI24.10.2018
HR24.10.2018
IT24.10.2018
LT24.10.2018
LV24.10.2018
NL24.10.2018
PL24.10.2018
RS24.10.2018
SE24.10.2018
BG24.01.2019
NO24.01.2019
GR25.01.2019
IS24.02.2019
PT24.02.2019
Former [2019/34]AL24.10.2018
AT24.10.2018
DK24.10.2018
ES24.10.2018
FI24.10.2018
HR24.10.2018
IT24.10.2018
LT24.10.2018
LV24.10.2018
NL24.10.2018
PL24.10.2018
RS24.10.2018
SE24.10.2018
BG24.01.2019
NO24.01.2019
GR25.01.2019
IS24.02.2019
PT24.02.2019
Former [2019/26]AL24.10.2018
AT24.10.2018
ES24.10.2018
FI24.10.2018
HR24.10.2018
LT24.10.2018
LV24.10.2018
NL24.10.2018
PL24.10.2018
RS24.10.2018
SE24.10.2018
BG24.01.2019
NO24.01.2019
GR25.01.2019
IS24.02.2019
PT24.02.2019
Former [2019/25]AT24.10.2018
ES24.10.2018
FI24.10.2018
HR24.10.2018
LT24.10.2018
LV24.10.2018
NL24.10.2018
PL24.10.2018
RS24.10.2018
SE24.10.2018
BG24.01.2019
NO24.01.2019
GR25.01.2019
IS24.02.2019
Former [2019/24]AT24.10.2018
ES24.10.2018
FI24.10.2018
HR24.10.2018
LT24.10.2018
LV24.10.2018
NL24.10.2018
PL24.10.2018
SE24.10.2018
BG24.01.2019
NO24.01.2019
GR25.01.2019
IS24.02.2019
Former [2019/23]AT24.10.2018
ES24.10.2018
FI24.10.2018
HR24.10.2018
LT24.10.2018
LV24.10.2018
NL24.10.2018
PL24.10.2018
BG24.01.2019
NO24.01.2019
IS24.02.2019
Former [2019/22]FI24.10.2018
LT24.10.2018
NL24.10.2018
PL24.10.2018
BG24.01.2019
NO24.01.2019
IS24.02.2019
Former [2019/21]FI24.10.2018
LT24.10.2018
NL24.10.2018
NO24.01.2019
IS24.02.2019
Former [2019/20]LT24.10.2018
NL24.10.2018
NO24.01.2019
Former [2019/17]NL24.10.2018
Documents cited:Search[X]JP2002267337  (MATSUSHITA REFRIGERATION) [X] 1,7,12 * paragraph [0081]; figures 5-6, 19-22 *;
 [X]JP2003042626  (TOSHIBA CORP) [X] 1,7,12 * paragraphs [0009] - [0011]; figures 1-5 *;
 [A]US2013070090  (BUFALINI BRIAN [US] ET AL) [A] 1-20 * paragraphs [0006] - [0007]; claims 1-3 *