Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2792476

EP2792476 - Continuous ribbon of a laminated multi-layer film for packaging of product in sacs or packages incorporating an RFID device [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  25.09.2015
Database last updated on 14.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip25.09.2015Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 28.10.2015  [2015/44]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Masterpack S.p.A.
Via Stromboli 18
20144 Milano (MI) / IT
[2014/43]
Inventor(s)01 / Binda, Claudio
Via delle Piane 14
21020 Monvalle VA / IT
 [2014/43]
Representative(s)Pellegri, Alberto , et al
Società Italiana Brevetti S.p.A.
Via Carducci, 8
IT-20123 Milano / IT
[2014/43]
Application number, filing date14164947.516.04.2014
[2014/43]
Priority number, dateIT2013MI0062417.04.2013         Original published format: IT MI20130624
[2014/43]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2792476
Date:22.10.2014
Language:EN
[2014/43]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP03.09.2014
ClassificationInternational:B31D1/02, B65D75/00, B65D33/00
[2014/43]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/43]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:Kontinuierliches Band einer laminierten, mehrschichtigen Folie zur Verpackung von Produkten in Beuteln oder Packungen mit einer RFID-Vorrichtung[2014/43]
English:Continuous ribbon of a laminated multi-layer film for packaging of product in sacs or packages incorporating an RFID device[2014/43]
French:Ruban continu d'un film multicouche stratifié pour emballage de produit dans des sacs ou des emballages comprenant un dispositif RFID[2014/43]
Examination procedure16.04.2014Examination requested  [2014/43]
23.04.2015Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2015/44]
09.06.2015Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2015/44]
Documents cited:Search[X]WO2012007982  (PRIMA S P A [IT]; CARBONE GIACOMO [IT]) [X] 1-8 * claim 1 *;
 [X]US2010177993  (CHEN YUNG-SHUN [TW]) [X] 7,8 * paragraph [0020]; figures 1,2 *;
 [A]EP2037398  (BROTHER IND LTD [JP]) [A] 1,7 * paragraphs [0072] , [0101] , [0112]; figure 2 *