EP2933719 - Digital methods and devices for generating true random numbers [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2015/43] | A digital method and device for generating true random numbers | ||
[2020/01] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.04.2021 Database last updated on 19.04.2025 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 01.05.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 18.12.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 09.03.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rambus Inc. 1050 Enterprise Way Suite 700 Sunnyvale, CA 94089 / US | [2020/18] |
Former [2019/48] | For all designated states VERIMATRIX Rond Point du Canet Impasse des Carrés de l'Arc 13590 Meyreuil / FR | ||
Former [2019/44] | For all designated states VERIMATRIX Rue de la Carrière de Bachasson CS 70025 Arteparc Bachasson, Bât. A 13590 Meyreuil / FR | ||
Former [2015/43] | For all designated states Inside Secure Rue de la Carrière de Bachasson, CS 70025 Arteparc Bachasson, Bât. A 13590 Meyreuil / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Van Loon, Marcel INSIDE SECURE Geurdenhof 43 5345 BA Oss / NL | 02 /
Verschueren, Ad INSIDE SECURE Westpoint 73 5038 KG Tilburg / NL | [2015/43] | Representative(s) | de Roquemaurel, Bruno, et al OMNIPAT 24 Place des Martyrs de la Résistance 13100 Aix en Provence / FR | [2015/43] | Application number, filing date | 14165296.6 | 18.04.2014 | [2015/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2933719 | Date: | 21.10.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2933719 | Date: | 03.06.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.10.2014 | Classification | IPC: | G06F7/58 | [2015/43] | CPC: |
G06F7/588 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/43] | Title | German: | Digitale Verfahren und Vorrichtungen zur Erzeugung echter Zufallszahlen | [2020/01] | English: | Digital methods and devices for generating true random numbers | [2020/01] | French: | Procédés numériques et dispositifs pour générer de vrais nombres aléatoires | [2020/01] |
Former [2015/43] | Digitales Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Erzeugung echter Zufallszahlen | ||
Former [2015/43] | A digital method and device for generating true random numbers | ||
Former [2015/43] | Procédé numérique et dispositif pour générer de vrais nombres aléatoires | Examination procedure | 18.04.2014 | Examination requested [2015/43] | 20.04.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.03.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.06.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.11.2019 | Date of oral proceedings | 11.12.2019 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 19.12.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.04.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 15.04.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 15.04.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 04.03.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.04.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.04.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.04.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 18.04.2014 | AL | 03.06.2020 | AT | 03.06.2020 | CY | 03.06.2020 | CZ | 03.06.2020 | DK | 03.06.2020 | EE | 03.06.2020 | ES | 03.06.2020 | FI | 03.06.2020 | HR | 03.06.2020 | IT | 03.06.2020 | LT | 03.06.2020 | LV | 03.06.2020 | MC | 03.06.2020 | MK | 03.06.2020 | MT | 03.06.2020 | NL | 03.06.2020 | PL | 03.06.2020 | RO | 03.06.2020 | RS | 03.06.2020 | SE | 03.06.2020 | SI | 03.06.2020 | SK | 03.06.2020 | SM | 03.06.2020 | TR | 03.06.2020 | BG | 03.09.2020 | NO | 03.09.2020 | GR | 04.09.2020 | IS | 03.10.2020 | PT | 06.10.2020 | [2024/41] |
Former [2024/29] | HU | 18.04.2014 | |
AL | 03.06.2020 | ||
AT | 03.06.2020 | ||
CY | 03.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 03.06.2020 | ||
DK | 03.06.2020 | ||
EE | 03.06.2020 | ||
ES | 03.06.2020 | ||
FI | 03.06.2020 | ||
HR | 03.06.2020 | ||
IT | 03.06.2020 | ||
LT | 03.06.2020 | ||
LV | 03.06.2020 | ||
MC | 03.06.2020 | ||
MK | 03.06.2020 | ||
NL | 03.06.2020 | ||
PL | 03.06.2020 | ||
RO | 03.06.2020 | ||
RS | 03.06.2020 | ||
SE | 03.06.2020 | ||
SI | 03.06.2020 | ||
SK | 03.06.2020 | ||
SM | 03.06.2020 | ||
TR | 03.06.2020 | ||
BG | 03.09.2020 | ||
NO | 03.09.2020 | ||
GR | 04.09.2020 | ||
IS | 03.10.2020 | ||
PT | 06.10.2020 | ||
Former [2024/22] | HU | 18.04.2014 | |
AL | 03.06.2020 | ||
AT | 03.06.2020 | ||
CY | 03.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 03.06.2020 | ||
DK | 03.06.2020 | ||
EE | 03.06.2020 | ||
ES | 03.06.2020 | ||
FI | 03.06.2020 | ||
HR | 03.06.2020 | ||
IT | 03.06.2020 | ||
LT | 03.06.2020 | ||
LV | 03.06.2020 | ||
MC | 03.06.2020 | ||
MK | 03.06.2020 | ||
NL | 03.06.2020 | ||
PL | 03.06.2020 | ||
RO | 03.06.2020 | ||
RS | 03.06.2020 | ||
SE | 03.06.2020 | ||
SI | 03.06.2020 | ||
SK | 03.06.2020 | ||
SM | 03.06.2020 | ||
BG | 03.09.2020 | ||
NO | 03.09.2020 | ||
GR | 04.09.2020 | ||
IS | 03.10.2020 | ||
PT | 06.10.2020 | ||
Former [2023/30] | HU | 18.04.2014 | |
AL | 03.06.2020 | ||
AT | 03.06.2020 | ||
CY | 03.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 03.06.2020 | ||
DK | 03.06.2020 | ||
EE | 03.06.2020 | ||
ES | 03.06.2020 | ||
FI | 03.06.2020 | ||
HR | 03.06.2020 | ||
IT | 03.06.2020 | ||
LT | 03.06.2020 | ||
LV | 03.06.2020 | ||
MC | 03.06.2020 | ||
NL | 03.06.2020 | ||
PL | 03.06.2020 | ||
RO | 03.06.2020 | ||
RS | 03.06.2020 | ||
SE | 03.06.2020 | ||
SI | 03.06.2020 | ||
SK | 03.06.2020 | ||
SM | 03.06.2020 | ||
BG | 03.09.2020 | ||
NO | 03.09.2020 | ||
GR | 04.09.2020 | ||
IS | 03.10.2020 | ||
PT | 06.10.2020 | ||
Former [2023/29] | HU | 18.04.2014 | |
AL | 03.06.2020 | ||
AT | 03.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 03.06.2020 | ||
DK | 03.06.2020 | ||
EE | 03.06.2020 | ||
ES | 03.06.2020 | ||
FI | 03.06.2020 | ||
HR | 03.06.2020 | ||
IT | 03.06.2020 | ||
LT | 03.06.2020 | ||
LV | 03.06.2020 | ||
MC | 03.06.2020 | ||
NL | 03.06.2020 | ||
PL | 03.06.2020 | ||
RO | 03.06.2020 | ||
RS | 03.06.2020 | ||
SE | 03.06.2020 | ||
SI | 03.06.2020 | ||
SK | 03.06.2020 | ||
SM | 03.06.2020 | ||
BG | 03.09.2020 | ||
NO | 03.09.2020 | ||
GR | 04.09.2020 | ||
IS | 03.10.2020 | ||
PT | 06.10.2020 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AL | 03.06.2020 | |
AT | 03.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 03.06.2020 | ||
DK | 03.06.2020 | ||
EE | 03.06.2020 | ||
ES | 03.06.2020 | ||
FI | 03.06.2020 | ||
HR | 03.06.2020 | ||
IT | 03.06.2020 | ||
LT | 03.06.2020 | ||
LV | 03.06.2020 | ||
MC | 03.06.2020 | ||
NL | 03.06.2020 | ||
PL | 03.06.2020 | ||
RO | 03.06.2020 | ||
RS | 03.06.2020 | ||
SE | 03.06.2020 | ||
SI | 03.06.2020 | ||
SK | 03.06.2020 | ||
SM | 03.06.2020 | ||
BG | 03.09.2020 | ||
NO | 03.09.2020 | ||
GR | 04.09.2020 | ||
IS | 03.10.2020 | ||
PT | 06.10.2020 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AL | 03.06.2020 | |
AT | 03.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 03.06.2020 | ||
DK | 03.06.2020 | ||
EE | 03.06.2020 | ||
ES | 03.06.2020 | ||
FI | 03.06.2020 | ||
HR | 03.06.2020 | ||
IT | 03.06.2020 | ||
LT | 03.06.2020 | ||
LV | 03.06.2020 | ||
MC | 03.06.2020 | ||
NL | 03.06.2020 | ||
PL | 03.06.2020 | ||
RO | 03.06.2020 | ||
RS | 03.06.2020 | ||
SE | 03.06.2020 | ||
SI | 03.06.2020 | ||
SK | 03.06.2020 | ||
SM | 03.06.2020 | ||
BG | 03.09.2020 | ||
NO | 03.09.2020 | ||
GR | 04.09.2020 | ||
PT | 06.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/50] | AL | 03.06.2020 | |
AT | 03.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 03.06.2020 | ||
DK | 03.06.2020 | ||
EE | 03.06.2020 | ||
ES | 03.06.2020 | ||
FI | 03.06.2020 | ||
HR | 03.06.2020 | ||
IT | 03.06.2020 | ||
LT | 03.06.2020 | ||
LV | 03.06.2020 | ||
MC | 03.06.2020 | ||
NL | 03.06.2020 | ||
PL | 03.06.2020 | ||
RO | 03.06.2020 | ||
RS | 03.06.2020 | ||
SE | 03.06.2020 | ||
SI | 03.06.2020 | ||
SK | 03.06.2020 | ||
SM | 03.06.2020 | ||
BG | 03.09.2020 | ||
NO | 03.09.2020 | ||
GR | 04.09.2020 | ||
IS | 03.10.2020 | ||
PT | 06.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/24] | AL | 03.06.2020 | |
AT | 03.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 03.06.2020 | ||
DK | 03.06.2020 | ||
EE | 03.06.2020 | ||
ES | 03.06.2020 | ||
FI | 03.06.2020 | ||
HR | 03.06.2020 | ||
IT | 03.06.2020 | ||
LT | 03.06.2020 | ||
LV | 03.06.2020 | ||
NL | 03.06.2020 | ||
PL | 03.06.2020 | ||
RO | 03.06.2020 | ||
RS | 03.06.2020 | ||
SE | 03.06.2020 | ||
SI | 03.06.2020 | ||
SK | 03.06.2020 | ||
SM | 03.06.2020 | ||
BG | 03.09.2020 | ||
NO | 03.09.2020 | ||
GR | 04.09.2020 | ||
IS | 03.10.2020 | ||
PT | 06.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/21] | AL | 03.06.2020 | |
AT | 03.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 03.06.2020 | ||
DK | 03.06.2020 | ||
EE | 03.06.2020 | ||
ES | 03.06.2020 | ||
FI | 03.06.2020 | ||
HR | 03.06.2020 | ||
IT | 03.06.2020 | ||
LT | 03.06.2020 | ||
LV | 03.06.2020 | ||
NL | 03.06.2020 | ||
PL | 03.06.2020 | ||
RO | 03.06.2020 | ||
RS | 03.06.2020 | ||
SE | 03.06.2020 | ||
SK | 03.06.2020 | ||
SM | 03.06.2020 | ||
BG | 03.09.2020 | ||
NO | 03.09.2020 | ||
GR | 04.09.2020 | ||
IS | 03.10.2020 | ||
PT | 06.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AL | 03.06.2020 | |
AT | 03.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 03.06.2020 | ||
EE | 03.06.2020 | ||
ES | 03.06.2020 | ||
FI | 03.06.2020 | ||
HR | 03.06.2020 | ||
IT | 03.06.2020 | ||
LT | 03.06.2020 | ||
LV | 03.06.2020 | ||
NL | 03.06.2020 | ||
PL | 03.06.2020 | ||
RO | 03.06.2020 | ||
RS | 03.06.2020 | ||
SE | 03.06.2020 | ||
SK | 03.06.2020 | ||
SM | 03.06.2020 | ||
BG | 03.09.2020 | ||
NO | 03.09.2020 | ||
GR | 04.09.2020 | ||
IS | 03.10.2020 | ||
PT | 06.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/09] | AL | 03.06.2020 | |
AT | 03.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 03.06.2020 | ||
EE | 03.06.2020 | ||
ES | 03.06.2020 | ||
FI | 03.06.2020 | ||
HR | 03.06.2020 | ||
IT | 03.06.2020 | ||
LT | 03.06.2020 | ||
LV | 03.06.2020 | ||
NL | 03.06.2020 | ||
RO | 03.06.2020 | ||
RS | 03.06.2020 | ||
SE | 03.06.2020 | ||
SM | 03.06.2020 | ||
BG | 03.09.2020 | ||
NO | 03.09.2020 | ||
GR | 04.09.2020 | ||
PT | 06.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/04] | AL | 03.06.2020 | |
FI | 03.06.2020 | ||
HR | 03.06.2020 | ||
LT | 03.06.2020 | ||
LV | 03.06.2020 | ||
NL | 03.06.2020 | ||
RS | 03.06.2020 | ||
SE | 03.06.2020 | ||
BG | 03.09.2020 | ||
NO | 03.09.2020 | ||
GR | 04.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/01] | FI | 03.06.2020 | |
HR | 03.06.2020 | ||
LT | 03.06.2020 | ||
LV | 03.06.2020 | ||
RS | 03.06.2020 | ||
SE | 03.06.2020 | ||
BG | 03.09.2020 | ||
NO | 03.09.2020 | ||
GR | 04.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/51] | FI | 03.06.2020 | |
HR | 03.06.2020 | ||
LT | 03.06.2020 | ||
LV | 03.06.2020 | ||
RS | 03.06.2020 | ||
SE | 03.06.2020 | ||
NO | 03.09.2020 | ||
GR | 04.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | FI | 03.06.2020 | |
HR | 03.06.2020 | ||
LT | 03.06.2020 | ||
LV | 03.06.2020 | ||
SE | 03.06.2020 | ||
NO | 03.09.2020 | ||
GR | 04.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | FI | 03.06.2020 | |
LT | 03.06.2020 | ||
SE | 03.06.2020 | ||
NO | 03.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | LT | 03.06.2020 | |
NO | 03.09.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US2006173943 (LUZZI RAIMONDO [AT], et al) [X] 1-6,8-11,13-16 * paragraph [0058]; figures 4, 5 * [Y] 7,12; | [YA]US2009089347 (POMET ALAIN [FR], et al) [Y] 7,12 * sentence 58 - sentence 62; figures 2-4, 6; table 1 * [A] 2,8,10,11; | [A]US2007273408 (GOLIC JOVAN [IT]) [A] 13 * figures 2, 3 * | [X] - BUCCI M ET AL, "A Testable Random Bit Generator based on a High Resolution Phase Noise Detection", IEEE DESIGN AND DIAGNOSTICS OF ELECTRONIC CIRCUITS AND SYSTEMS, 2007; DDECS '07, IEEE, PISCATAWAY, USA, (20070411), ISBN 978-1-4244-1161-0, pages 1 - 5, XP031215868 [X] 1,2,4-6,8-11,13-15 * page 2, column l, paragraph 1; figure 2 * | Examination | - ABDELKARIM CHERKAOUI ET AL, "A Self-Timed Ring Based True Random Number Generator", ASYNCHRONOUS CIRCUITS AND SYSTEMS (ASYNC), 2013 IEEE 19TH INTERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM ON, IEEE, (20130519), doi:10.1109/ASYNC.2013.15, ISBN 978-1-4673-5956-6, pages 99 - 106, XP032431277 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ASYNC.2013.15 | by applicant | - ASAD A. ABIDI, "Phase Noise and Jitter in CMOS Ring Oscillators", IEEE JOURNAL OF SOLID-STATE CIRCUITS, (200608), vol. 41, no. 8 |