Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2808767

EP2808767 - Electronic device with a projected virtual control object and control method thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  01.02.2019
Database last updated on 16.11.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  11.10.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip08.11.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): AL, CZ, EE, RO, SK
published on 11.12.2019 [2019/50]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
LG Electronics Inc.
128, Yeoui-daero, Yeongdeungpo-gu
SEOUL, 07336 / KR
[2018/48]
Former [2014/49]For all designated states
LG Electronics, Inc.
128, Yeoui-daero
Yeongdeungpo-gu
Seoul 150-721 / KR
Inventor(s)01 / Kim, Seho
c/o LG Electronics Inc. R&D Campus
19, Yangjae-daero 11gil, Seocho-gu
137-893 Seoul / KR
 [2014/49]
Representative(s)Ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner
Patentanwälte mbB
Nymphenburger Straße 4
80335 München / DE
[2019/10]
Former [2014/49]Urner, Peter
Ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner
Mauerkircherstrasse 45
81679 München / DE
Application number, filing date14165379.022.04.2014
[2014/49]
Priority number, dateKR2013006243231.05.2013         Original published format: KR 20130062432
[2014/49]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2808767
Date:03.12.2014
Language:EN
[2014/49]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2808767
Date:06.03.2019
Language:EN
[2019/10]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP09.10.2014
ClassificationInternational:G06F3/042, G06F3/01, G06F3/0488
[2018/43]
Former International [2014/49]G06F3/042, G06F3/0488
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/27]
Former [2014/49]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:Elektronische Vorrichtung mit einem virtuellen Steuerungsobjekt und Steuerverfahren dafür[2014/49]
English:Electronic device with a projected virtual control object and control method thereof[2014/49]
French:Dispositif électronique avec un objet virtuel de contrôle et son procédé de commande[2014/49]
Examination procedure22.05.2015Examination requested  [2015/27]
02.06.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
06.04.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
02.08.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.09.2018Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 19.09.2018
19.09.2018Date of oral proceedings (cancelled)
12.10.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
23.01.2019Fee for grant paid
23.01.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
23.01.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.03.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
21.04.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
23.04.2018Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL06.03.2019
CZ06.03.2019
EE06.03.2019
ES06.03.2019
FI06.03.2019
HR06.03.2019
IT06.03.2019
LT06.03.2019
LV06.03.2019
NL06.03.2019
RO06.03.2019
RS06.03.2019
SE06.03.2019
SK06.03.2019
BG06.06.2019
NO06.06.2019
GR07.06.2019
PT06.07.2019
[2019/49]
Former [2019/48]ES06.03.2019
FI06.03.2019
HR06.03.2019
IT06.03.2019
LT06.03.2019
LV06.03.2019
NL06.03.2019
RS06.03.2019
SE06.03.2019
BG06.06.2019
NO06.06.2019
GR07.06.2019
PT06.07.2019
Former [2019/47]ES06.03.2019
FI06.03.2019
HR06.03.2019
IT06.03.2019
LT06.03.2019
LV06.03.2019
NL06.03.2019
RS06.03.2019
SE06.03.2019
BG06.06.2019
NO06.06.2019
GR07.06.2019
Former [2019/46]FI06.03.2019
HR06.03.2019
IT06.03.2019
LT06.03.2019
LV06.03.2019
NL06.03.2019
RS06.03.2019
SE06.03.2019
BG06.06.2019
NO06.06.2019
GR07.06.2019
Former [2019/39]FI06.03.2019
HR06.03.2019
LT06.03.2019
LV06.03.2019
NL06.03.2019
RS06.03.2019
SE06.03.2019
BG06.06.2019
NO06.06.2019
GR07.06.2019
Former [2019/38]FI06.03.2019
LT06.03.2019
SE06.03.2019
BG06.06.2019
NO06.06.2019
GR07.06.2019
Former [2019/37]FI06.03.2019
LT06.03.2019
SE06.03.2019
NO06.06.2019
GR07.06.2019
Former [2019/34]FI06.03.2019
LT06.03.2019
SE06.03.2019
NO06.06.2019
Former [2019/33]FI06.03.2019
LT06.03.2019
NO06.06.2019
Documents cited:Search[XYI]GB2470653  (ZIENON L L C [US]) [X] 1,2,5-8,10,13,15 * paragraphs [0008] - [0018] * * paragraphs [0023] - [0025] * * paragraphs [0030] - [0039] * * figures 2,3,8 * [Y] 9,11,12,14 [I] 3,4;
 [Y]US2012038592  (SHYU JYH-HORNG [TW] ET AL) [Y] 9,11,12,14 * paragraphs [0029] - [0035] * * figure 2 *;
 [A]US2012249409  (TONEY AARON [US] ET AL) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0004] - [0011] * * paragraphs [0023] - [0065] * * figures 1-5 *;
 [A]US2008018591  (PITTEL ARKADY [US] ET AL) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0003] - [0014] * * paragraphs [0025] - [0062] * * figures 1,5,6A,6B,6C,10A,10B,10C *