Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2829855

EP2829855 - Spectral apparatus, detection apparatus, light source apparatus, reaction apparatus, and measurement apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  05.06.2015
Database last updated on 22.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip05.06.2015Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 08.07.2015  [2015/28]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Canon Kabushiki Kaisha
30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome
Ohta-ku
Tokyo 146-8501 / JP
For all designated states
The University of Tokyo
3-1, Hongo 7-chome
Bunkyo-Ku
Tokyo 113-0033 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2015/05]For all designated states
Canon Kabushiki Kaisha
30-2 Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku
Tokyo 146-8501 / JP
For all designated states
The University of Tokyo
3-1, Hongo 7-chome
Bunkyo-Ku
Tokyo 113-0033 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Sukegawa, Takashi
c/o CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA
30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome
Ohta-ku
Tokyo 146-8501 / JP
02 / Kobayashi, Yohei
c/o THE UNIVERSITY OF TOKYO
3-1, Hongo 7-chome
Bunkyo-ku
Tokyo 113-0033 / JP
03 / Ozawa, Akira
c/o THE UNIVERSITY OF TOKYO
3-1, Hongo 7-chome
Bunkyo-ku
Tokyo 113-0033 / JP
04 / Endo, Mamoru
c/o THE UNIVERSITY OF TOKYO
3-1, Hongo 7-chome
Bunkyo-ku
Tokyo 113-0033 / JP
05 / Gonokami, Makoto
c/o THE UNIVERSITY OF TOKYO
3-1, Hongo 7-chome
Bunkyo-ku
Tokyo 113-0033 / JP
 [2015/05]
Representative(s)TBK
Bavariaring 4-6
80336 München / DE
[2015/05]
Application number, filing date14165535.723.04.2014
[2015/05]
Priority number, dateJP2013012052007.06.2013         Original published format: JP 2013120520
[2015/05]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2829855
Date:28.01.2015
Language:EN
[2015/05]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP07.01.2015
ClassificationInternational:G01J3/02, G01J3/18, G01J3/22, G01J1/04
[2015/05]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/05]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:Spektralvorrichtung, Nachweisvorrichtung, Lichtquellenvorrichtung, Reaktionsvorrichtung, und Messvorrichtung[2015/05]
English:Spectral apparatus, detection apparatus, light source apparatus, reaction apparatus, and measurement apparatus[2015/05]
French:Appareil spectral, appareil de détection, appareil à source lumineuse, appareil de réaction et appareil de mesure[2015/05]
Examination procedure23.04.2014Examination requested  [2015/05]
27.05.2015Application withdrawn by applicant  [2015/28]
Documents cited:Search[I]US6278534  (ARNS JAMES A [US]) [I] 1-5 * column 1, line 57 - column 6, line 5; figures 1,3,7 *;
 [A]US2001024275  (SUZUKI TORU [JP], et al) [A] 1 * paragraph [0059]; figure 1 *;
 [I]EP1308704  (ANDO ELECTRIC [JP]) [I] 1-5 * paragraphs [0046] - [0080]; figures 1,3,4 *;
 [A]CN103017904  (FUZHOU PHOTOP OPTICS CO LTD) [A] 2 * paragraph [0017]; figure 1 *;
 [A]WO2012033105  (UNIV OSAKA [JP], et al) [A] 6-14 * paragraphs [0020] - [0040]; figures 1,6 *;
 [A]JP2010203860  (OPTICAL COMB INC) [A] 6 * abstract *
by applicantJP2009121986
 JP2006162509
 JPH01292221
 JP2011257140
 JPS59165017