Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2800090

EP2800090 - Sound generator for an exhaust system [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  13.07.2018
Database last updated on 18.05.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  04.08.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  10.04.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip05.04.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IE
published on 08.05.2019  [2019/19]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Eberspächer Exhaust Technology GmbH & Co. KG
Homburger Strasse 95
66539 Neunkirchen / DE
[2014/45]
Inventor(s)01 / Wirth, Georg
Eichendorffstr. 27
73230 Kirchheim/Teck / DE
02 / Sauter, Frank
Hirschstr. 27
70771 Leinfelden-Echterdingen / DE
03 / Hölsch, Ralf
Raingärtlestr. 3
78736 Epfendorf / DE
 [2014/45]
Representative(s)BRP Renaud & Partner mbB Rechtsanwälte Patentanwälte Steuerberater
Königstraße 28
70173 Stuttgart / DE
[2014/45]
Application number, filing date14165579.523.04.2014
[2014/45]
Priority number, dateDE20131020818603.05.2013         Original published format: DE102013208186
[2014/45]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2800090
Date:05.11.2014
Language:DE
[2014/45]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP2800090
Date:15.04.2015
Language:DE
[2015/16]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2800090
Date:06.09.2017
Language:DE
[2017/36]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP16.03.2015
ClassificationInternational:F01N13/08, F01N13/18, F01N1/06
[2017/17]
Former International [2014/45]G10K11/178, F01N1/06
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/47]
Former [2014/45]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:Schallerzeuger für eine Abgasanlage[2014/45]
English:Sound generator for an exhaust system[2014/45]
French:Générateur acoustique d'une installation de gaz d'échappement[2014/45]
Examination procedure07.10.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
07.10.2015Examination requested  [2015/47]
11.04.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
26.07.2017Fee for grant paid
26.07.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
26.07.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Opposition(s)07.06.2018No opposition filed within time limit [2018/33]
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.03.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
28.04.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCZ06.09.2017
DK06.09.2017
EE06.09.2017
ES06.09.2017
FI06.09.2017
HR06.09.2017
LT06.09.2017
LV06.09.2017
MC06.09.2017
MT06.09.2017
NL06.09.2017
PL06.09.2017
RO06.09.2017
RS06.09.2017
SI06.09.2017
SK06.09.2017
SM06.09.2017
BG06.12.2017
NO06.12.2017
GR07.12.2017
IS06.01.2018
IE23.04.2018
LU23.04.2018
BE30.04.2018
CH30.04.2018
LI30.04.2018
[2019/19]
Former [2019/12]CZ06.09.2017
DK06.09.2017
EE06.09.2017
ES06.09.2017
FI06.09.2017
HR06.09.2017
LT06.09.2017
LV06.09.2017
MC06.09.2017
MT06.09.2017
NL06.09.2017
PL06.09.2017
RO06.09.2017
RS06.09.2017
SI06.09.2017
SK06.09.2017
SM06.09.2017
BG06.12.2017
NO06.12.2017
GR07.12.2017
IS06.01.2018
LU23.04.2018
BE30.04.2018
CH30.04.2018
LI30.04.2018
Former [2019/08]CZ06.09.2017
DK06.09.2017
EE06.09.2017
ES06.09.2017
FI06.09.2017
HR06.09.2017
LT06.09.2017
LV06.09.2017
MC06.09.2017
MT06.09.2017
NL06.09.2017
PL06.09.2017
RO06.09.2017
RS06.09.2017
SI06.09.2017
SK06.09.2017
SM06.09.2017
BG06.12.2017
NO06.12.2017
GR07.12.2017
IS06.01.2018
LU23.04.2018
Former [2018/52]CZ06.09.2017
DK06.09.2017
EE06.09.2017
ES06.09.2017
FI06.09.2017
HR06.09.2017
LT06.09.2017
LV06.09.2017
MC06.09.2017
MT06.09.2017
NL06.09.2017
PL06.09.2017
RO06.09.2017
RS06.09.2017
SI06.09.2017
SK06.09.2017
SM06.09.2017
BG06.12.2017
NO06.12.2017
GR07.12.2017
IS06.01.2018
Former [2018/43]CZ06.09.2017
DK06.09.2017
EE06.09.2017
ES06.09.2017
FI06.09.2017
HR06.09.2017
LT06.09.2017
LV06.09.2017
MT06.09.2017
NL06.09.2017
PL06.09.2017
RO06.09.2017
RS06.09.2017
SI06.09.2017
SK06.09.2017
SM06.09.2017
BG06.12.2017
NO06.12.2017
GR07.12.2017
IS06.01.2018
Former [2018/39]CZ06.09.2017
DK06.09.2017
EE06.09.2017
ES06.09.2017
FI06.09.2017
HR06.09.2017
LT06.09.2017
LV06.09.2017
NL06.09.2017
PL06.09.2017
RO06.09.2017
RS06.09.2017
SI06.09.2017
SK06.09.2017
SM06.09.2017
BG06.12.2017
NO06.12.2017
GR07.12.2017
IS06.01.2018
Former [2018/35]CZ06.09.2017
DK06.09.2017
EE06.09.2017
ES06.09.2017
FI06.09.2017
HR06.09.2017
LT06.09.2017
LV06.09.2017
NL06.09.2017
PL06.09.2017
RO06.09.2017
RS06.09.2017
SK06.09.2017
SM06.09.2017
BG06.12.2017
NO06.12.2017
GR07.12.2017
IS06.01.2018
Former [2018/24]CZ06.09.2017
EE06.09.2017
ES06.09.2017
FI06.09.2017
HR06.09.2017
LT06.09.2017
LV06.09.2017
NL06.09.2017
PL06.09.2017
RO06.09.2017
RS06.09.2017
SK06.09.2017
SM06.09.2017
BG06.12.2017
NO06.12.2017
GR07.12.2017
IS06.01.2018
Former [2018/23]CZ06.09.2017
EE06.09.2017
ES06.09.2017
FI06.09.2017
HR06.09.2017
LT06.09.2017
LV06.09.2017
NL06.09.2017
PL06.09.2017
RO06.09.2017
RS06.09.2017
SK06.09.2017
BG06.12.2017
NO06.12.2017
GR07.12.2017
IS06.01.2018
Former [2018/21]CZ06.09.2017
ES06.09.2017
FI06.09.2017
HR06.09.2017
LT06.09.2017
LV06.09.2017
NL06.09.2017
RS06.09.2017
BG06.12.2017
NO06.12.2017
GR07.12.2017
Former [2018/15]ES06.09.2017
FI06.09.2017
HR06.09.2017
LT06.09.2017
LV06.09.2017
NL06.09.2017
RS06.09.2017
BG06.12.2017
NO06.12.2017
GR07.12.2017
Former [2018/12]ES06.09.2017
FI06.09.2017
HR06.09.2017
LT06.09.2017
LV06.09.2017
RS06.09.2017
BG06.12.2017
NO06.12.2017
GR07.12.2017
Former [2018/11]ES06.09.2017
FI06.09.2017
HR06.09.2017
LT06.09.2017
RS06.09.2017
BG06.12.2017
NO06.12.2017
GR07.12.2017
Former [2018/08]FI06.09.2017
LT06.09.2017
NO06.12.2017
Former [2018/07]LT06.09.2017
NO06.12.2017
Documents cited:Search[XAI]EP2581567  (EBERSPAECHER J GMBH & CO [DE]) [X] 1 * paragraph [0001]; figure 10 * * paragraph [0054] * [A] 6-14 [I] 2-5;
 [XAI]FR2803625  (ECIA EQUIP COMPOSANTS IND AUTO [FR]) [X] 1 * page 3, line 30 - line 32; figures 1,2 * [A] 6-14 [I] 2-5;
 [IPA]EP2607640  (BAYERISCHE MOTOREN WERKE AG [DE]) [IP] 1-5 * figures 4, 5; claim 4 * [A] 6-14;
 [A]EP2108791  (EBERSPAECHER J GMBH & CO [DE]) [A] 1-14 * the whole document *