Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2801434

EP2801434 - Method for connecting a plurality of tank elements and tank device [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  03.07.2015
Database last updated on 19.10.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip03.07.2015Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 05.08.2015  [2015/32]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Deutsches Zentrum für Luft- und Raumfahrt e.V.
Linder Höhe
51147 Köln / DE
[2014/46]
Inventor(s)01 / Schierle, Diego
Obere Strasse 7
70190 Stuttgart / DE
02 / Kobilke, Alexander
Osterbronnstrasse 39
70565 Stuttgart / DE
03 / Strassburger, Philipp
Gaussstrasse 35
70193 Stuttgart / DE
04 / Schöll, Roland
Wiesentalstrasse 8
71034 Böblingen / DE
 [2014/46]
Representative(s)Hoeger, Stellrecht & Partner Patentanwälte mbB
Uhlandstrasse 14c
70182 Stuttgart / DE
[N/P]
Former [2014/46]Hoeger, Stellrecht & Partner Patentanwälte
Uhlandstrasse 14c
70182 Stuttgart / DE
Application number, filing date14165585.223.04.2014
[2014/46]
Priority number, dateDE20131020846708.05.2013         Original published format: DE102013208467
[2014/46]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2801434
Date:12.11.2014
Language:DE
[2014/46]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP2801434
Date:17.06.2015
Language:DE
[2015/25]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP20.05.2015
ClassificationInternational:B23K33/00, B23K31/02, F16L41/03, F16L23/026, F17C1/00, B60K15/07, F02M21/02
[2015/25]
Former International [2014/46]B23K33/00, B23K31/02
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/46]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:Verfahren zum Verbinden mehrerer Tankelemente und Tankvorrichtung[2014/46]
English:Method for connecting a plurality of tank elements and tank device[2014/46]
French:Procédé destiné à relier plusieurs éléments de réservoir et dispositif de réservoir[2014/46]
Examination procedure23.04.2014Examination requested  [2014/46]
30.06.2015Application withdrawn by applicant  [2015/32]
Documents cited:Search[XI]US2003146214  (IDOGUCHI RYUICHI [JP]) [X] 1,11 * paragraphs [0049] , [0 53] - [0065]; figure 2 * [I] 2-10,12-15;
 [A]WO2009054902  (OVONIC HYDROGEN SYSTEMS LLC [US]; TAN ZHAOSHENG [US]; FETCENKO MICHAEL) [A] 1-15 * pages 5-9; figures 1-4 *;
 [A]DE202006004434U  (FUCHS KG OTTO [DE]) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0021] - [0023]; figures 1, 2 *;
 [A]WO2007144919  (SIDA ENGINEERING S R L [IT]; LUONGO NICOLANTONIO [IT]) [A] 1-15 * page 4, line 5 - page 5, line 6; figures 1-4 *