Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2796177

EP2796177 - Inflatable structure for physical exercise in water [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  10.02.2017
Database last updated on 16.10.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip12.10.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): AL
published on 14.11.2018  [2018/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Massola, Mattia
Via Viviani, 75
19015 Levanto, La Spezia / IT
[2014/44]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
 [2014/44]
Representative(s)Mozzi, Matteo , et al
Jacobacci & Partners S.p.A.
Via Senato, 8
20121 Milano / IT
[2014/44]
Application number, filing date14165636.323.04.2014
[2014/44]
Priority number, dateIT2013MI0069126.04.2013         Original published format: IT MI20130691
[2014/44]
Filing languageIT
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2796177
Date:29.10.2014
Language:EN
[2014/44]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2796177
Date:06.04.2016
Language:EN
[2016/14]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP16.09.2014
ClassificationInternational:A63B69/00
[2014/44]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/22]
Former [2014/44]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:Aufblasbare Struktur für das Körpertraining im Wasser[2014/44]
English:Inflatable structure for physical exercise in water[2014/44]
French:Structure gonflable pour l'exercice physique dans l'eau[2014/44]
Examination procedure16.04.2015Examination requested  [2015/22]
27.04.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
21.10.2015Communication of intention to grant the patent
04.02.2016Fee for grant paid
04.02.2016Fee for publishing/printing paid
04.02.2016Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Opposition(s)10.01.2017No opposition filed within time limit [2017/11]
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU23.04.2014
AL06.04.2016
AT06.04.2016
BE06.04.2016
BG06.04.2016
CY06.04.2016
CZ06.04.2016
DK06.04.2016
EE06.04.2016
ES06.04.2016
FI06.04.2016
HR06.04.2016
LT06.04.2016
LV06.04.2016
MK06.04.2016
NL06.04.2016
PL06.04.2016
RO06.04.2016
RS06.04.2016
SE06.04.2016
SI06.04.2016
SK06.04.2016
SM06.04.2016
TR06.04.2016
IE23.04.2016
LU23.04.2016
MT30.04.2016
NO06.07.2016
GR07.07.2016
IS06.08.2016
PT08.08.2016
[2018/46]
Former [2018/45]HU23.04.2014
AT06.04.2016
BE06.04.2016
BG06.04.2016
CY06.04.2016
CZ06.04.2016
DK06.04.2016
EE06.04.2016
ES06.04.2016
FI06.04.2016
HR06.04.2016
LT06.04.2016
LV06.04.2016
MK06.04.2016
NL06.04.2016
PL06.04.2016
RO06.04.2016
RS06.04.2016
SE06.04.2016
SI06.04.2016
SK06.04.2016
SM06.04.2016
TR06.04.2016
IE23.04.2016
LU23.04.2016
MT30.04.2016
NO06.07.2016
GR07.07.2016
IS06.08.2016
PT08.08.2016
Former [2018/38]HU23.04.2014
AT06.04.2016
BE06.04.2016
BG06.04.2016
CY06.04.2016
CZ06.04.2016
DK06.04.2016
EE06.04.2016
ES06.04.2016
FI06.04.2016
HR06.04.2016
LT06.04.2016
LV06.04.2016
MK06.04.2016
NL06.04.2016
PL06.04.2016
RO06.04.2016
RS06.04.2016
SE06.04.2016
SI06.04.2016
SK06.04.2016
SM06.04.2016
IE23.04.2016
LU23.04.2016
MT30.04.2016
NO06.07.2016
GR07.07.2016
IS06.08.2016
PT08.08.2016
Former [2018/32]HU23.04.2014
AT06.04.2016
BE06.04.2016
CY06.04.2016
CZ06.04.2016
DK06.04.2016
EE06.04.2016
ES06.04.2016
FI06.04.2016
HR06.04.2016
LT06.04.2016
LV06.04.2016
MK06.04.2016
NL06.04.2016
PL06.04.2016
RO06.04.2016
RS06.04.2016
SE06.04.2016
SI06.04.2016
SK06.04.2016
SM06.04.2016
IE23.04.2016
LU23.04.2016
MT30.04.2016
NO06.07.2016
GR07.07.2016
IS06.08.2016
PT08.08.2016
Former [2018/30]HU23.04.2014
AT06.04.2016
BE06.04.2016
CY06.04.2016
CZ06.04.2016
DK06.04.2016
EE06.04.2016
ES06.04.2016
FI06.04.2016
HR06.04.2016
LT06.04.2016
LV06.04.2016
MK06.04.2016
NL06.04.2016
PL06.04.2016
RO06.04.2016
RS06.04.2016
SE06.04.2016
SI06.04.2016
SK06.04.2016
SM06.04.2016
IE23.04.2016
LU23.04.2016
NO06.07.2016
GR07.07.2016
IS06.08.2016
PT08.08.2016
Former [2017/37]AT06.04.2016
BE06.04.2016
CZ06.04.2016
DK06.04.2016
EE06.04.2016
ES06.04.2016
FI06.04.2016
HR06.04.2016
LT06.04.2016
LV06.04.2016
NL06.04.2016
PL06.04.2016
RO06.04.2016
RS06.04.2016
SE06.04.2016
SI06.04.2016
SK06.04.2016
SM06.04.2016
IE23.04.2016
NO06.07.2016
GR07.07.2016
IS06.08.2016
PT08.08.2016
Former [2017/11]AT06.04.2016
BE06.04.2016
CZ06.04.2016
DK06.04.2016
EE06.04.2016
ES06.04.2016
FI06.04.2016
HR06.04.2016
LT06.04.2016
LV06.04.2016
NL06.04.2016
PL06.04.2016
RO06.04.2016
RS06.04.2016
SE06.04.2016
SK06.04.2016
SM06.04.2016
NO06.07.2016
GR07.07.2016
IS06.08.2016
PT08.08.2016
Former [2017/10]AT06.04.2016
BE06.04.2016
CZ06.04.2016
DK06.04.2016
EE06.04.2016
ES06.04.2016
FI06.04.2016
HR06.04.2016
LT06.04.2016
LV06.04.2016
NL06.04.2016
PL06.04.2016
RO06.04.2016
RS06.04.2016
SE06.04.2016
SK06.04.2016
NO06.07.2016
GR07.07.2016
IS06.08.2016
PT08.08.2016
Former [2017/09]AT06.04.2016
BE06.04.2016
CZ06.04.2016
DK06.04.2016
EE06.04.2016
ES06.04.2016
FI06.04.2016
HR06.04.2016
LT06.04.2016
LV06.04.2016
NL06.04.2016
PL06.04.2016
RO06.04.2016
RS06.04.2016
SE06.04.2016
NO06.07.2016
GR07.07.2016
IS06.08.2016
PT08.08.2016
Former [2017/07]AT06.04.2016
BE06.04.2016
DK06.04.2016
ES06.04.2016
FI06.04.2016
HR06.04.2016
LT06.04.2016
LV06.04.2016
NL06.04.2016
PL06.04.2016
RS06.04.2016
SE06.04.2016
NO06.07.2016
GR07.07.2016
IS06.08.2016
PT08.08.2016
Former [2017/03]AT06.04.2016
BE06.04.2016
ES06.04.2016
FI06.04.2016
HR06.04.2016
LT06.04.2016
LV06.04.2016
NL06.04.2016
PL06.04.2016
RS06.04.2016
SE06.04.2016
NO06.07.2016
GR07.07.2016
IS06.08.2016
PT08.08.2016
Former [2016/52]AT06.04.2016
ES06.04.2016
FI06.04.2016
HR06.04.2016
LT06.04.2016
LV06.04.2016
NL06.04.2016
PL06.04.2016
RS06.04.2016
SE06.04.2016
BE30.04.2016
NO06.07.2016
GR07.07.2016
IS06.08.2016
PT08.08.2016
Former [2016/51]AT06.04.2016
ES06.04.2016
FI06.04.2016
HR06.04.2016
LT06.04.2016
LV06.04.2016
NL06.04.2016
PL06.04.2016
RS06.04.2016
BE30.04.2016
NO06.07.2016
GR07.07.2016
IS06.08.2016
PT08.08.2016
Former [2016/50]AT06.04.2016
ES06.04.2016
FI06.04.2016
HR06.04.2016
LT06.04.2016
LV06.04.2016
NL06.04.2016
PL06.04.2016
RS06.04.2016
BE30.04.2016
NO06.07.2016
IS06.08.2016
Former [2016/49]FI06.04.2016
LT06.04.2016
NL06.04.2016
PL06.04.2016
BE30.04.2016
NO06.07.2016
IS06.08.2016
Former [2016/48]LT06.04.2016
NL06.04.2016
BE30.04.2016
NO06.07.2016
IS06.08.2016
Former [2016/46]LT06.04.2016
NL06.04.2016
BE30.04.2016
NO06.07.2016
Former [2016/44]NL06.04.2016
BE30.04.2016
Former [2016/37]BE30.04.2016
Documents cited:Search[A]CA2325844  (FAUTEUX CLAUDE [CA]) [A] 1-10 * page 5, line 5 - page 11, line 22; figures 1-14 *;
 [A]US2008293546  (MOY RUSSELL [US] ET AL) [A] 1-10 * paragraph [0026] - paragraph [0061]; figures 1-17 *;
 [A]US2002010053  (PETERSON LEROY L [US]) [A] 1-10 * paragraph [0017] - paragraph [0019]; figures 1-5 *;
 [A]US2012231686  (PARR STUART [US]) [A] 1-10 * paragraph [0027] - paragraph [0038]; figures 1-9 *