Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2799685

EP2799685 - Electrically driven valve for regulating the volumetric flow rate for a heating and/or cooling system of a motor vehicle [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been refused
Status updated on  13.09.2019
Database last updated on 21.10.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  30.06.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip13.09.2019Refusal of applicationpublished on 16.10.2019  [2019/42]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
MAHLE Behr Kornwestheim GmbH
Enzstrasse 25-33
70806 Kornwestheim / DE
[2015/49]
Former [2014/45]For all designated states
Behr Thermot-tronik GmbH
Enzstrasse 25-35
70806 Kornwestheim / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Klein, Dr. Hans-Peter
Seestraße 37
71397 Leutenbach / DE
 [2014/45]
Representative(s)Grauel, Andreas
Grauel IP
Patentanwaltskanzlei
Wartbergstrasse 14
70191 Stuttgart / DE
[N/P]
Former [2014/45]Grauel, Andreas
Grauel IP
Patentanwaltskanzlei
Presselstrasse 10
70191 Stuttgart / DE
Application number, filing date14165738.724.04.2014
[2014/45]
Priority number, dateDE20131020819303.05.2013         Original published format: DE102013208193
[2014/45]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2799685
Date:05.11.2014
Language:DE
[2014/45]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP2799685
Date:11.03.2015
Language:DE
[2015/11]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP05.02.2015
ClassificationInternational:F01P7/14
[2014/45]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/43]
Former [2014/45]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:Elektrisch antreibbares Ventil zur Regelung von Volumenströmen in einem Heiz- und/oder Kühlsystem eines Kraftfahrzeuges[2014/45]
English:Electrically driven valve for regulating the volumetric flow rate for a heating and/or cooling system of a motor vehicle[2014/45]
French:Soupape à entraînement électrique destinée au réglage des débits volumiques dans un système de chauffage et/ou de refroidissement d'un véhicule automobile[2014/45]
Examination procedure11.09.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
11.09.2015Examination requested  [2015/43]
29.06.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
09.01.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.04.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
17.08.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.05.2019Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 17.09.2019
28.05.2019Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2019/42]
07.06.2019Application refused, date of legal effect [2019/42]
17.09.2019Date of oral proceedings (cancelled)
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.05.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
02.05.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
30.04.2018Renewal fee patent year 05
30.04.2019Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[X]DE102009035349  (WAHLER GMBH & CO KG GUSTAV [DE]) [X] 1-4,9,10 * abstract * * figure 10 *;
 [X]FR2441776  (PIEMONTESE RADIATORI [IT]) [X] 1-3,5,7,10 * abstract * * figure - *;
 [X]WO03071109  (GPM GERAETE UND PUMPENBAU GMBH [DE]; PAWELLEK FRANZ [DE]; SCHMIDT ANDR) [X] 1,2,5,9,10 * abstract * * figure - *;
 [X]DE102011081183  (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [X] 1-3,5,9,10 * abstract * * figures 1, 4 *;
 [X]EP2251575  (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [X] 1-3,5,9,10 * abstract * * figure - *;
 [XP]WO2014000995  (SCHAEFFLER TECHNOLOGIES AG [DE]) [XP] 1-5,9,10 * abstract * * figure - *;
 [E]WO2014187452  (SCHAEFFLER TECHNOLOGIES GMBH [DE]) [E] 1 * abstract * * figure - *
by applicantDE102006053310
 EP0639736
 EP1108867
 DE19849492