Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2797293

EP2797293 - Terminal device and content displaying method thereof, server and controlling method thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  14.12.2018
Database last updated on 16.10.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip27.08.2019New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.
129, Samsung-ro
Yeongtong-gu
Suwon-si
Gyeonggi-do 443-742 / KR
[N/P]
Former [2014/44]For all designated states
Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd
129, Samsung-ro
Yeongtong-gu
Suwon-si
Gyeonggi-do 443-742 / KR
Inventor(s)01 / Seo, Ju-hee
625-1301, 51, Dongtanjungang-ro,
Hwaseong-si
Gyeonggi-do / KR
02 / Kwak, Han-tak
102-1902, 32, Taejang-ro 82beon-gil,
Yeongtong-gu
Suwon-si
Gyeonggi-do / KR
03 / Nam, Hyun-woo
301, 5, Sinwon-ro 211beon-gil,
Yeongtong-gu
Suwon-si
Gyeonggi-do / KR
04 / Park, Sung-bum
112-402, 219, Buljeong-ro, Bundang-gu
Seongnam-si
Gyeonggi-do / KR
05 / Shim, Woo-sung
116-606, 4-27, Yeongtong-ro 90beon-gil
Yeongtong-gu, Suwon-si
Gyeonggi-do / KR
06 / Lee, Seo-young
508-1504, 35, Dongtanwoncheon-ro 881beon-gil
Yeongtong-gu, Suwon-si
Gyeonggi-do / KR
07 / Kim, Se-hoon
3-901, 8, Samsung-ro 268beon-gil,
Yeongtong-gu
Suwon-si
Gyeonggi-do / KR
 [2014/44]
Representative(s)Taor, Simon Edward William , et al
Venner Shipley LLP
200 Aldersgate
London EC1A 4HD / GB
[2014/44]
Application number, filing date14165843.524.04.2014
[2014/44]
Priority number, dateKR2013004565724.04.2013         Original published format: KR 20130045657
KR2013013285504.11.2013         Original published format: KR 20130132855
[2014/44]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2797293
Date:29.10.2014
Language:EN
[2014/44]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP2797293
Date:15.04.2015
Language:EN
[2015/16]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP18.03.2015
ClassificationInternational:H04L29/08, G06F17/30, G06F3/0482, G06F3/0488
[2015/16]
Former International [2014/48]H04L29/08, G06F17/30
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/48]
Former [2014/44]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:Endgerätevorrichtung und Inhaltsanzeigeverfahren dafür, Server und Steuerungsverfahren dafür[2014/44]
English:Terminal device and content displaying method thereof, server and controlling method thereof[2014/44]
French:Dispositif de terminal et son procédé d'affichage de contenu, serveur et procédé de commande de celui-ci[2014/44]
Examination procedure15.10.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
15.10.2015Examination requested  [2015/48]
17.12.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
29.04.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
30.08.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
Fees paidRenewal fee
18.04.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
18.04.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
23.04.2018Renewal fee patent year 05
26.04.2019Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[X]US2012209839  (ANDREWS ANTON O A [US], et al) [X] 1-7,12,13 * abstract * * paragraph [0002] - paragraph [0007] * * paragraph [0039] - paragraph [0054]; figures 1,2 * * paragraph [0079] - paragraph [0127]; figures 5-8 *;
 [X]US2009124241  (KRISHNASWAMY DILIP [US], et al) [X] 1-7,12,13 * paragraph [0074] - paragraph [0097] * * paragraph [0120] - paragraph [0206]; figures 3-19 * * paragraph [0284] - paragraph [0351]; figures 27-32 *;
 [XA]US2009235312  (MORAD AMIR [IL], et al) [X] 1,7,12,13 * paragraph [0006] - paragraph [0050] * * paragraph [0080] - paragraph [0105]; figure 1 * [A] 2-6;
 [A]US2009063372  (LU TUNG-HUNG [TW], et al) [A] 1-7,12,13 * abstract * * paragraph [0009] - paragraph [0021] * * paragraph [0032] - paragraph [0067]; figures 1-4 *;
 [X]US2011288913  (WAYLONIS DAN [US], et al) [X] 8-11,14,15 * paragraph [0005] - paragraph [0008] * * paragraph [0015] - paragraph [0026]; figure 1 * * paragraph [0029] - paragraph [0064]; figures 2,3 *;
 [X]US2013019173  (KOTLER MATTHEW [US], et al) [X] 8-11,14,15 * paragraphs [0005] , [0017] - paragraph [0028]; figures 1A,1B,2 * * paragraph [0034] - paragraph [0044]; figures 3,4A,4B * * paragraph [0049] - paragraph [0065]; figures 6-8 * * paragraph [0069] - paragraph [0075]; figures 9,10 *