Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2797115

EP2797115 - Organic light emitting diode display and mask unit [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  14.08.2019
Database last updated on 19.10.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip16.08.2019First examination report 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Samsung Display Co., Ltd.
17113, 1, Samsung-ro
Giheung-Gu
Yongin-si
Gyeonggi-do / KR
[2015/40]
Former [2014/44]For all designated states
Samsung Display Co., Ltd.
95, Samsung 2 Ro
Giheung-Gu
Yongin-City
Gyeonggi-Do / KR
Inventor(s)01 / Kwon, Oh-Seob
501-603, Pureun Maeul Ssangyong Apt.
Sunae 3-dong
Bundang-gu
Seongnam-si
Gyeonggi-do / KR
 [2014/44]
Representative(s)Mounteney, Simon James
Marks & Clerk LLP
15 Fetter Lane
London EC4A 1BW / GB
[N/P]
Former [2014/44]Mounteney, Simon James
Marks & Clerk LLP
90 Long Acre
London
WC2E 9RA / GB
Application number, filing date14165873.224.04.2014
[2014/44]
Priority number, dateKR2013004636225.04.2013         Original published format: KR 20130046362
[2014/44]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2797115
Date:29.10.2014
Language:EN
[2014/44]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP2797115
Date:28.01.2015
Language:EN
[2015/05]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP07.01.2015
ClassificationInternational:H01L27/32, H01L51/52
[2015/05]
Former International [2014/44]H01L27/32
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/36]
Former [2014/44]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:Organische Leuchtdiodenanzeige und Maskeneinheit[2014/44]
English:Organic light emitting diode display and mask unit[2014/44]
French:Affichage à diode électroluminescente organique et unité de masque[2014/44]
Examination procedure15.07.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
27.07.2015Examination requested  [2015/36]
20.08.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.04.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
10.04.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
26.04.2018Renewal fee patent year 05
15.05.2019Renewal fee patent year 06
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.04.201906   M06   Fee paid on   15.05.2019
Documents cited:Search[XI]US2009309109  (CHANG SEUNG WOOK [KR], et al) [X] 1-13,16-18,20,22,25 * paragraphs [0036] - [0073]; figures 3-7 * [I] 14,15,19,21,23,24,26;
 [XAI]US2013002118  (KO JUNG-WOO [KR]) [X] 1-7,9-11,13,14,26 * figures 1-6 * [A] 8,12,16-25 [I] 15;
 [XI]US2013057521  (KIM GUN-SHIK [KR]) [X] 1,3-7,9-11,13,14,16,17,19,20,22,25,26 * paragraphs [0049] - [0095]; figures 1-7,9-12 * * paragraphs [0034] - [0040] * [I] 2,8,12,15,18,21,23,24;
 [A]US2013037827  (LEVERMORE PETER [US], et al) [A] 11,15,23,24 * figures 4,5,6 *