Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2800307

EP2800307 - METHOD FOR DETECTING DEVIATIONS FROM A GIVEN STANDARD STATE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2014/45]Method for detecting deviations from a given standard state
[2016/10]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  14.04.2017
Database last updated on 22.10.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip18.10.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CY
published on 20.11.2019 [2019/47]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
AIT Austrian Institute of Technology GmbH
Donau-City-Strasse 1
1220 Wien / AT
[2014/45]
Inventor(s)01 / Skopik, Florian
Franz Schubertstrasse 43
3701 Großweikersdorf / AT
02 / Fiedler, Roman
Ungergasse 27/5
8020 Graz / AT
 [2014/45]
Representative(s)Wildhack & Jellinek
Patentanwälte Landstraßer Hauptstraße 50
1030 Wien / AT
[2014/45]
Application number, filing date14165972.225.04.2014
[2014/45]
Priority number, dateAT2013005029229.04.2013         Original published format: AT 502922013
[2014/45]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2800307
Date:05.11.2014
Language:DE
[2014/45]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2800307
Date:08.06.2016
Language:DE
[2016/23]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP17.09.2014
ClassificationInternational:H04L12/24, H04L29/06, G06F21/55
[2014/45]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/23]
Former [2014/45]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR FESTSTELLUNG VON ABWEICHUNGEN VON EINEM VORGEGEBENEN NORMALZUSTAND[2016/10]
English:METHOD FOR DETECTING DEVIATIONS FROM A GIVEN STANDARD STATE[2016/10]
French:PROCÉDÉ DE DÉTERMINATION D'ÉCARTS PAR RAPPORT À UN ÉTAT NORMAL PRÉDÉFINI[2016/10]
Former [2014/45]Verfahren zur Feststellung von Abweichungen von einem vorgegebenen Normalzustand
Former [2014/45]Method for detecting deviations from a given standard state
Former [2014/45]Procédé de détermination d'écarts par rapport à un état normal prédéfini
Examination procedure07.01.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
07.01.2015Examination requested  [2015/09]
11.02.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
02.05.2016Fee for grant paid
02.05.2016Fee for publishing/printing paid
02.05.2016Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Opposition(s)09.03.2017No opposition filed within time limit [2017/20]
Fees paidRenewal fee
18.04.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU25.04.2014
AL08.06.2016
BG08.06.2016
CY08.06.2016
CZ08.06.2016
DK08.06.2016
EE08.06.2016
ES08.06.2016
FI08.06.2016
HR08.06.2016
IT08.06.2016
LT08.06.2016
LV08.06.2016
MC08.06.2016
MT08.06.2016
NL08.06.2016
PL08.06.2016
RO08.06.2016
RS08.06.2016
SE08.06.2016
SI08.06.2016
SK08.06.2016
SM08.06.2016
NO08.09.2016
GR09.09.2016
IS08.10.2016
PT10.10.2016
[2019/47]
Former [2019/39]HU25.04.2014
AL08.06.2016
BG08.06.2016
CZ08.06.2016
DK08.06.2016
EE08.06.2016
ES08.06.2016
FI08.06.2016
HR08.06.2016
IT08.06.2016
LT08.06.2016
LV08.06.2016
MC08.06.2016
MT08.06.2016
NL08.06.2016
PL08.06.2016
RO08.06.2016
RS08.06.2016
SE08.06.2016
SI08.06.2016
SK08.06.2016
SM08.06.2016
NO08.09.2016
GR09.09.2016
IS08.10.2016
PT10.10.2016
Former [2019/31]HU25.04.2014
AL08.06.2016
CZ08.06.2016
DK08.06.2016
EE08.06.2016
ES08.06.2016
FI08.06.2016
HR08.06.2016
IT08.06.2016
LT08.06.2016
LV08.06.2016
MC08.06.2016
MT08.06.2016
NL08.06.2016
PL08.06.2016
RO08.06.2016
RS08.06.2016
SE08.06.2016
SI08.06.2016
SK08.06.2016
SM08.06.2016
NO08.09.2016
GR09.09.2016
IS08.10.2016
PT10.10.2016
Former [2018/46]AL08.06.2016
CZ08.06.2016
DK08.06.2016
EE08.06.2016
ES08.06.2016
FI08.06.2016
HR08.06.2016
IT08.06.2016
LT08.06.2016
LV08.06.2016
MC08.06.2016
MT08.06.2016
NL08.06.2016
PL08.06.2016
RO08.06.2016
RS08.06.2016
SE08.06.2016
SI08.06.2016
SK08.06.2016
SM08.06.2016
NO08.09.2016
GR09.09.2016
IS08.10.2016
PT10.10.2016
Former [2018/43]CZ08.06.2016
DK08.06.2016
EE08.06.2016
ES08.06.2016
FI08.06.2016
HR08.06.2016
IT08.06.2016
LT08.06.2016
LV08.06.2016
MC08.06.2016
MT08.06.2016
NL08.06.2016
PL08.06.2016
RO08.06.2016
RS08.06.2016
SE08.06.2016
SI08.06.2016
SK08.06.2016
SM08.06.2016
NO08.09.2016
GR09.09.2016
IS08.10.2016
PT10.10.2016
Former [2018/06]CZ08.06.2016
DK08.06.2016
EE08.06.2016
ES08.06.2016
FI08.06.2016
HR08.06.2016
IT08.06.2016
LT08.06.2016
LV08.06.2016
MC08.06.2016
NL08.06.2016
PL08.06.2016
RO08.06.2016
RS08.06.2016
SE08.06.2016
SI08.06.2016
SK08.06.2016
SM08.06.2016
NO08.09.2016
GR09.09.2016
IS08.10.2016
PT10.10.2016
Former [2017/37]CZ08.06.2016
DK08.06.2016
EE08.06.2016
ES08.06.2016
FI08.06.2016
HR08.06.2016
IT08.06.2016
LT08.06.2016
LV08.06.2016
NL08.06.2016
PL08.06.2016
RO08.06.2016
RS08.06.2016
SE08.06.2016
SI08.06.2016
SK08.06.2016
SM08.06.2016
NO08.09.2016
GR09.09.2016
IS08.10.2016
PT10.10.2016
Former [2017/11]CZ08.06.2016
EE08.06.2016
ES08.06.2016
FI08.06.2016
HR08.06.2016
IT08.06.2016
LT08.06.2016
LV08.06.2016
NL08.06.2016
PL08.06.2016
RO08.06.2016
RS08.06.2016
SE08.06.2016
SK08.06.2016
SM08.06.2016
NO08.09.2016
GR09.09.2016
IS08.10.2016
PT10.10.2016
Former [2017/10]CZ08.06.2016
EE08.06.2016
ES08.06.2016
FI08.06.2016
HR08.06.2016
IT08.06.2016
LT08.06.2016
LV08.06.2016
NL08.06.2016
PL08.06.2016
RO08.06.2016
RS08.06.2016
SE08.06.2016
SK08.06.2016
NO08.09.2016
GR09.09.2016
IS08.10.2016
Former [2017/09]CZ08.06.2016
EE08.06.2016
ES08.06.2016
FI08.06.2016
HR08.06.2016
IT08.06.2016
LT08.06.2016
LV08.06.2016
NL08.06.2016
RO08.06.2016
RS08.06.2016
SE08.06.2016
NO08.09.2016
GR09.09.2016
Former [2016/52]ES08.06.2016
FI08.06.2016
HR08.06.2016
LT08.06.2016
LV08.06.2016
NL08.06.2016
RS08.06.2016
SE08.06.2016
NO08.09.2016
GR09.09.2016
Former [2016/51]ES08.06.2016
FI08.06.2016
HR08.06.2016
LT08.06.2016
LV08.06.2016
RS08.06.2016
NO08.09.2016
GR09.09.2016
Former [2016/50]ES08.06.2016
FI08.06.2016
HR08.06.2016
LT08.06.2016
LV08.06.2016
RS08.06.2016
NO08.09.2016
Former [2016/49]FI08.06.2016
LT08.06.2016
NO08.09.2016
Former [2016/46]LT08.06.2016
NO08.09.2016
Documents cited:Search[XI]EP2299650  (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [X] 1,3,4,13 * paragraph [0033] * * paragraph [0040] - paragraph [0047] * * figures 1, 3 * [I] 2,5,6;
 [A]  - Heikki Mannila ET AL, "Discovery Discovery of Frequent Episodes in Event Sequences", Data Mining and Knowledge Discovery, (19970901), pages 259 - 289, URL: http://rd.springer.com/content/pdf/10.1023/A:1009748302351.pdf, (20140908), XP055138753 [A] 1-13 * Abschnitt 2.1 - Abschnitt 2.2 * * Abschnitt 3.3.2 * * Algorithmen 1, 2, 5 * * Abschnitt 5.6 *
 [A]  - Jon Meek, "How to Handle a Few Hundred Million Extra Firewall Log Lines Per Day Thanks to the Latest Virus or Worm", 21st Large Installation System Administration Conference, (20071114), URL: https://www.usenix.org/legacy/event/lisa07/posters/meek.pdf, (20140909), XP055138952 [A] 1,13 * page 4 *
 [A]  - STEARLEY J, "Towards informatic analysis of syslogs", CLUSTER COMPUTING, 2004 IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON SAN DIEGO, CA, USA SEPT. 20-23, 2004, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA,IEEE, (20040920), doi:10.1109/CLUSTR.2004.1392628, ISBN 978-0-7803-8694-5, pages 309 - 318, XP010770307 [A] 2 * page 3 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/CLUSTR.2004.1392628
 [A]  - VARUN CHANDOLA ET AL, "Anomaly Detection for Discrete Sequences: A Survey", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON KNOWLEDGE AND DATA ENGINEERING, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, LOS ALAMITOS, CA, US, (20120501), vol. 24, no. 5, doi:10.1109/TKDE.2010.235, ISSN 1041-4347, pages 823 - 839, XP011440359 [A] 1-13 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/TKDE.2010.235